Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePoulsen v. Department of Defense et al
DistrictNorthern District of California
CityOakland
Case Number4:2017cv03531
Date Filed2017-06-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore
PlaintiffKevin Poulsen
Case DescriptionJournalist Kevin Poulsen submitted a FOIA request to the National Security Agency, the FBI, and several other intelligence agencies for records concerning Donald Trump's allegations that he had been wiretapped by the Obama administration. Several agencies invoked a Glomar response neither confirming nor denying the existence of records. Other agencies granted or denied Poulsen's request for expedited processing and a fee waiver. Poulsen appealed the agencies' responses. The NSA denied his appeal. The Office of Information Policy at the Justice Department denied his appeal in regard to his request to the FBI, but had not acted on his appeal concerning the National Security Division. After hearing nothing further from the agencies, Poulsen filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Expedited processing, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDepartment of Defense
DefendantOffice of the Director of National Intelligence
DefendantDepartment of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-06-191COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-11483479.). Filed byKevin Poulsen. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kaupp, William) (Filed on 6/19/2017) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
2017-06-192Proposed Summons. (Kaupp, William) (Filed on 6/19/2017) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
2017-06-203Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/5/2017. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2017) (Entered: 06/20/2017)
2017-06-234Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/12/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/19/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2017) (Entered: 06/23/2017)
2017-06-23Electronic filing error. Only one summons may be issued. Please re-file one summons listing all defendants and in its entirety. Re: 2 Proposed Summons filed by Kevin Poulsen (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2017) (Entered: 06/23/2017)
2017-06-235Proposed Summons. (Kaupp, William) (Filed on 6/23/2017) (Entered: 06/23/2017)
2017-06-236Summons Issued as to Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2017) (Entered: 06/23/2017)
2017-06-267CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kevin Poulsen.. (Kaupp, William) (Filed on 6/26/2017) (Entered: 06/26/2017)
2017-06-268Certificate of Interested Entities by Kevin Poulsen (Kaupp, William) (Filed on 6/26/2017) (Entered: 06/26/2017)
2017-06-269CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kevin Poulsen of Summons, Complaint and other documents on the Defendants (Kaupp, William) (Filed on 6/26/2017) (Entered: 06/26/2017)
2017-07-1310NOTICE of Change of Address by William Gordon Kaupp (Kaupp, William) (Filed on 7/13/2017) (Entered: 07/13/2017)
2017-07-1811NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Powell (Powell, Amy) (Filed on 7/18/2017) (Entered: 07/18/2017)
2017-07-1812STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to the Complaint filed by Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Powell, Amy) (Filed on 7/18/2017) (Entered: 07/18/2017)
2017-07-1813NOTICE of Appearance by Colleen Flynn (Flynn, Colleen) (Filed on 7/18/2017) (Entered: 07/18/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff