Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT v. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01203
Date Filed2017-06-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge John D. Bates
PlaintiffENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT
Case DescriptionThe Environmental Integrity Project submitted a FOIA request to the EPA for records concerning EPA Administrator Scott Pruitt's meetings with outside parties, as well as his travel expenses. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. EIP contacted the agency to inquire about the status of its request. After the agency could not provide any further information, EIP filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-06-191COMPLAINT against ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Filing fee $ 400) filed by ENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet, # 6 Summons EPA, # 7 Summons USAO, # 8 Summons USDOJ)(Schaeffer, Eric) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
2017-06-192Corporate Disclosure Statement by ENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT. (Schaeffer, Eric) (Main Document 2 replaced on 6/20/2017) (td). (Entered: 06/19/2017)
2017-06-19Case Assigned to Judge John D. Bates. (jd) (Entered: 06/20/2017)
2017-06-20Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 4616085466 (jd) (Entered: 06/20/2017)
2017-06-213SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Forms)(jd) (Entered: 06/21/2017)
2017-06-284NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua L. Rogers on behalf of All Defendants (Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 06/28/2017)
2017-07-145RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/21/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/21/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Schaeffer, Eric) (Entered: 07/14/2017)
2017-07-146RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 7/3/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certified Return Receipt, # 2 Exhibit Electronic Confirmation)(Schaeffer, Eric) (Entered: 07/14/2017)
2017-07-147RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY served on 6/26/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certified Return Receipt, # 2 Exhibit Electronic Confirmation)(Schaeffer, Eric) (Entered: 07/14/2017)
2017-07-208ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY.(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 07/20/2017)
2017-07-219ORDER directing parties to confer and to submit a proposed briefing schedule for the filing of dispositive motions by not later than August 21, 2017. See text of order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 7/21/2017. (lcjdb3) (Entered: 07/21/2017)
2017-07-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed briefing Schedule for filing Dispositive Motions due by 8/21/2017. (tb) Modified on 8/3/2017 (tb). (Entered: 07/21/2017)
2017-08-0110PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE by ENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Schaeffer, Eric) (Entered: 08/01/2017)
2017-08-2111PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE by ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 08/21/2017)
2017-08-21MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 10 and 11 the parties' proposed briefing schedules, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file any motions for summary judgment by not later than September 13, 2017; any corresponding oppositions by not later than October 4, 2017; and any corresponding replies by not later than October 11, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 8/21/2017. (lcjdb3) (Entered: 08/21/2017)
2017-08-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motion due by 9/13/2017. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 10/4/2017. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 10/11/2017. (tb) (Entered: 08/23/2017)
2017-09-0812MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment by ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 09/08/2017)
2017-09-11MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff has notified the Court that it intends to oppose 12 the government's motion to extend the briefing schedule. Any opposition to the government's motion to extend the briefing schedule shall be filed by not later than the close of business on September 12, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 9/11/2017. (lcjdb3) (Entered: 09/11/2017)
2017-09-11Set/Reset Deadlines: Any opposition by Plaintiff to the Government's motion to extend the briefing schedule shall be filed by not later than the close of business on 9/12/2017. (jth) (Entered: 09/11/2017)
2017-09-1113ERRATA by ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment filed by ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 09/11/2017)
2017-09-1114Memorandum in opposition to re 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment filed by ENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Schaeffer, Eric) (Entered: 09/11/2017)
2017-09-11MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 12 the government's motion to extend the briefing schedule, 14 plaintiff's opposition thereto, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the government's motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED as follows: the parties shall file any motions for summary judgment by not later than October 13, 2017; any corresponding oppositions by not later than November 3, 2017; and any corresponding replies by not later than November 13, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 9/11/2017. (lcjdb3) (Entered: 09/11/2017)
2017-09-12Set/Reset Deadlines: The parties shall file any Summary Judgment Motions by 10/13/2017; Oppositions by 11/3/2017; any Replies by 11/13/2017. (jth) (Entered: 09/12/2017)
2017-10-1215MOTION for Leave to File Amended and Supplemented Complaint by ENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Amended and Supplemented Complaint, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaeffer, Eric) (Entered: 10/12/2017)
2017-10-12MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 15 plaintiff's motion for leave to amend the complaint, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is granted; it is further ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall docket [15-1] as plaintiff's First Amended Complaint; and it is further ORDERED that defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by not later than November 2, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 10/12/2017. (lcjdb3) (Entered: 10/12/2017)
2017-10-1217AMENDED COMPLAINT against ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY filed by ENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(znmw) (Entered: 10/13/2017)
2017-10-1316Consent MOTION to Vacate by ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 10/13/2017)
2017-10-13MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 16 the government's consent motion to vacate the briefing schedule set forth in the Minute Order of September 11, 2017, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; it is further ORDERED that the briefing schedule set forth in the Minute Order of September 11, 2017 is VACATED; and it is further ORDERED as follows: the government shall answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by not later than November 2, 2017; the parties shall file any motions for summary judgment by not later than November 22, 2017; any corresponding oppositions shall be filed by not later than December 13, 2017; and any corresponding replies shall be filed by not later than December 20, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 10/13/2017. (lcjdb3) (Entered: 10/13/2017)
2017-10-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 11/2/2017. (tb) (Entered: 10/13/2017)
2017-10-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 11/2/2017. Summary Judgment motion due by 11/22/2017. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 12/13/2017. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 12/20/2017. (tb) (Entered: 10/15/2017)
2017-11-0218ANSWER to 17 Amended Complaint by ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. Related document: 17 Amended Complaint filed by ENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT.(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 11/02/2017)
2017-11-1619Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment by ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 11/16/2017)
2017-11-16MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 19 the government's consent motion to extend time, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED as follows: the parties shall file any motions for summary judgment by not later than December 15, 2017; any corresponding oppositions shall be filed by not later than January 5, 2018; and any corresponding replies shall be filed by not later than January 12, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 11/16/2017. (lcjdb3) (Entered: 11/16/2017)
2017-12-1520Joint STATUS REPORT AND MOTION TO STAY by ENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting the Parties' Joint Motion to Stay)(Schaeffer, Eric) (Entered: 12/15/2017)
2017-12-15MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 20 the parties' joint status report and motion to stay, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; it is further ORDERED that proceedings in this action are STAYED pending further order of the Court; and it is further ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report by not later than January 23, 2018, apprising the Court of the status of plaintiff's claim for an award of attorney's fees and costs. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 12/15/2017. (lcjdb3) (Entered: 12/15/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff