Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY v. U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01208
Date Filed2017-06-20
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffCENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY
Case DescriptionThe Center for Biological Diversity submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Land Management for records concerning Secretarial Order 3338, entitled "Discretionary Programmatic Environmental Impact Statement to Modernize the Federal Coal Program." The Center for Biological Diversity sent a follow-up letter inquiring about the status of its request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the Center for Biological Diversity filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Opinion/Order [43]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-06-201COMPLAINT against U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4997733) filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Atwood, Amy) (Entered: 06/20/2017)
2017-06-20Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zsb) (Entered: 06/20/2017)
2017-06-202SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Form)(zsb) (Entered: 06/20/2017)
2017-06-203STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on June 20, 2017. (lcbah3) (Entered: 06/20/2017)
2017-06-214Corporate Disclosure Statement by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Snape, William) (Entered: 06/21/2017)
2017-07-115NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Leeson Sroka on behalf of U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 07/11/2017)
2017-07-266AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY.(Snape, William) (Entered: 07/26/2017)
2017-07-287Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 6 Amended Complaint by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 07/28/2017)
2017-07-31MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the defendants' unopposed 8 Motion for Extension of Time. Accordingly, the defendants shall, by August 25, 2017, file an answer or otherwise respond to the plaintiff's 6 Amended Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on July 31, 2017. (lcbah3) (Entered: 07/31/2017)
2017-07-31Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to the Amended Complaint due by 8/25/2017. (tg) (Entered: 07/31/2017)
2017-08-258ANSWER to 6 Amended Complaint by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. Related document: 6 Amended Complaint filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY.(Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 08/25/2017)
2017-09-079JOINT STATUS REPORT (Snape, William) Modified title on 9/8/2017 (tg). (Entered: 09/07/2017)
2017-09-08MINUTE ORDER (paperless) ORDERING, in light of the parties' 9 Joint Status Report, that the parties file a Joint Meet and Confer Report by November 30, 2017. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on September 8, 2017. (lcbah3) (Entered: 09/08/2017)
2017-09-11Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Meet & Confer Statement due by 11/30/2017. (tg) (Entered: 09/11/2017)
2017-11-3010Joint STATUS REPORT. (Snape, William) Modified event title on 12/1/2017 (znmw). (Entered: 11/30/2017)
2017-11-30MINUTE ORDER (paperless) ORDERING, in light of the parties' 10 Meet and Confer Statement, that the parties file, by March 16, 2018, a joint status report informing the Court whether any issues remain between the parties, and, if so, proposing a schedule to govern further proceedings in this case. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on November 30, 2017. (lcbah3) (Entered: 11/30/2017)
2017-11-30Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/16/2018. (tg) (Entered: 11/30/2017)
2018-03-1611Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 03/16/2018)
2018-03-16MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, in light of the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, that the parties meet and confer following the defendants' final production of records, and file, by August 17, 2018, a joint status report informing the Court whether any issues remain between the parties, and, if so, proposing a schedule to govern further proceedings in this case. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 16, 2018. (lcbah3) (Entered: 03/16/2018)
2018-03-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/17/2018. (tg) (Entered: 03/16/2018)
2018-08-1512Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 08/15/2018)
2018-08-16MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, in light of the parties' 12 Joint Status Report, that the parties meet and confer following the Defendants' final production of records, and file, by November 9, 2018, a joint status report informing the Court whether any issues remain between the parties, and, if so, proposing a schedule to govern further proceedings in this case. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on August 16, 2018. (lcbah3) (Entered: 08/16/2018)
2018-08-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/9/2018. (tg) (Entered: 08/16/2018)
2018-11-0913Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 11/09/2018)
2018-11-13MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 13 Fifth Joint Status Report, the parties to file, by January 9, 2019, a joint status report advising the Court whether any disputes remain between the parties and, if so, a proposed schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on November 13, 2018. (lcbah3) (Entered: 11/13/2018)
2018-11-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/9/2019. (tg) (Entered: 11/13/2018)
2019-01-0414MOTION to Stay , MOTION for Extension of Time to in Light of Lapse of Appropriations by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hudak, Brian) (Entered: 01/04/2019)
2019-01-07MINUTE ORDER (paperless) EXTENDING, upon consideration of the defendants' 14 Motion for a Stay and Extension of Time in Light of Lapse of Appropriations, the deadline for the parties to file a joint status report set forth in the Court's November 13, 2018 Minute Order, and ORDERING the parties to file, within two business days of Congress appropriating funds for the defendants, a joint status report proposing a schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on January 7, 2019. (lcbah3) (Entered: 01/07/2019)
2019-01-2915Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 01/29/2019)
2019-01-29MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 15 Joint Status Report, the parties to file, by March 1, 2019, a joint status report advising the Court whether any disputes remain between the parties and, if so, a proposed schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on January 29, 2019. (lcbah3) (Entered: 01/29/2019)
2019-01-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/1/2019. (tg) (Entered: 01/29/2019)
2019-02-2816Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 02/28/2019)
2019-02-28MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 16 Joint Status Report, the parties to file, by April 8, 2019, a joint status report advising the Court whether any disputes remain between the parties and, if so, a proposed schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on February 28, 2019. (lcbah3) (Entered: 02/28/2019)
2019-03-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/8/2019. (tg) (Entered: 03/01/2019)
2019-04-0817Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 04/08/2019)
2019-04-09MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 17 Joint Status Report, the parties to file, by August 1, 2019, a joint status report advising the Court whether any disputes remain between the parties, and if so, a proposed schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on April 9, 2019. (lcbah3) (Entered: 04/09/2019)
2019-04-09Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/1/2019. (tg) (Entered: 04/09/2019)
2019-07-3018Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 07/30/2019)
2019-07-31MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 18 Joint Status Report, the parties to file, by August 26, 2019, a joint status report advising the Court whether any disputes remain between the parties, and if so, a proposed schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on July 31, 2019. (lcbah3) (Entered: 07/31/2019)
2019-07-31Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/26/2019. (tg) (Entered: 07/31/2019)
2019-08-2619Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Delay by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Snape, William) (Entered: 08/26/2019)
2019-08-27MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 19 Joint Status Report, the parties to file, by October 1, 2019, a joint status report advising the Court whether any disputes remain between the parties, and if so, a proposed schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on August 27, 2019. (lcbah3) (Entered: 08/27/2019)
2019-08-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/1/2019. (hmc) (Entered: 08/28/2019)
2019-10-0120Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 10/01/2019)
2019-10-01MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 20 Joint Status Report, the parties to file, by November 1, 2019, a joint status report advising the Court whether any disputes remain between the parties, and if so, a proposed schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on October 1, 2019. (lcbah3) (Entered: 10/01/2019)
2019-10-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/1/2019. (hmc) (Entered: 10/01/2019)
2019-10-3121Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 10/31/2019)
2019-11-01MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 21 Joint Status Report, the parties to file, by December 2, 2019, a joint status report advising the Court whether any disputes remain between the parties, and if so, a proposed schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on November 1, 2019. (lcbah3) (Entered: 11/01/2019)
2019-11-04Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/2/2019. (tg) (Entered: 11/04/2019)
2019-12-0222Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 12/02/2019)
2019-12-02MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 22 Joint Status Report, the parties to file, by January 6, 2020, a joint status report advising the Court whether any disputes remain between the parties, and if so, a proposed schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on December 2, 2019. (lcbah3) (Entered: 12/02/2019)
2019-12-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/6/2020. (tg) (Entered: 12/03/2019)
2020-01-0623Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 01/06/2020)
2020-01-06MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 23 Joint Status Report, the parties to file, by March 2, 2020, a joint status report advising the Court whether any disputes remain between the parties, and if so, a proposed schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on January 6, 2020. (lcbah3) (Entered: 01/06/2020)
2020-01-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/2/2020. (tg) (Entered: 01/06/2020)
2020-03-0224NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Darrell C. Valdez on behalf of U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR Substituting for attorney Scott Leeson Sroka (Valdez, Darrell) (Entered: 03/02/2020)
2020-03-0225Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Valdez, Darrell) (Entered: 03/02/2020)
2020-03-02MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 25 Joint Status Report, the parties to file, by June 8, 2020, a joint status report advising whether any disputes remain between the parties, and if so, a proposed schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 2, 2020. (lcbah3) (Entered: 03/02/2020)
2020-03-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/8/2020. (tg) (Entered: 03/02/2020)
2020-06-0826Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Valdez, Darrell) (Entered: 06/08/2020)
2020-06-09MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 26 Joint Status Report, the parties to file, by August 10, 2020, a joint status report advising whether any disputes remain between the parties, and if so, proposing a schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on June 9, 2020. (lcbah3) (Entered: 06/09/2020)
2020-06-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/10/2020. (ztg) (Entered: 06/10/2020)
2020-08-1027Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Snape, William) (Entered: 08/10/2020)
2020-08-10MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 27 Joint Status Report, the parties to file, by September 11, 2020, a joint status report advising whether any disputes remain between the parties, and if so, proposing a schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on August 10, 2020. (lcbah3) (Entered: 08/10/2020)
2020-08-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/11/2020. (hmc) (Entered: 08/10/2020)
2020-09-1128Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Valdez, Darrell) (Entered: 09/11/2020)
2020-09-14MINUTE ORDER (paperless) ISSUING, upon consideration of the parties' 28 Joint Status Report, the following Scheduling Order to govern the timing of further proceedings in this matter: (1) by October 26, 2020, defendants shall file any motion for summary judgment and Vaughn index; (2) by November 25, 2020, plaintiff shall file any opposition and any cross-motion for summary judgment; (3) by December 11, 2020, defendants shall file any reply and cross-opposition; and (4) by January 5, 2021, plaintiff shall file any cross-reply. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on September 14, 2020. (lcbah3) (Entered: 09/14/2020)
2020-09-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Vaughn Index due by 10/26/2020; Summary Judgment motion due by 10/26/2020; cross-motion and opposition to motion for summary judgment due by 11/25/2020; opposition to cross-motion and reply to opposition to motion for summary judgment due by 12/11/2020; reply to opposition to cross-motion due by 1/5/2021. (ztg) (Entered: 09/15/2020)
2020-10-2629MOTION for Summary Judgment by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Declaration Fairman, # 3 Declaration Alspach, # 4 Exhibit A, # 5 Exhibit B, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Valdez, Darrell) (Entered: 10/26/2020)
2020-11-2530MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendants' Motion by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support and In Opposition to Defendants' Motion, # 2 Statement of Facts and Reply to Defendants' Statement of Facts, # 3 Declaration William Snape, # 4 Declaration Amy Atwood, # 5 Text of Proposed Order, # 6 Exhibit One, # 7 Exhibit Two, # 8 Exhibit Three, # 9 Exhibit Four, # 10 Exhibit Five, # 11 Exhibit Six, # 12 Exhibit Seven, # 13 Exhibit Eight, # 14 Exhibit Nine, # 15 Exhibit Ten, # 16 Exhibit Eleven, # 17 Exhibit Twelve)(Snape, William) Modified on 12/2/2020 (znmw). (Entered: 11/25/2020)
2020-11-2531Memorandum in opposition to re 29 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (See Docket Entry 30 to view document). (znmw) (Entered: 12/02/2020)
2020-12-1132Memorandum in opposition to re 30 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Declaration Myrick, # 3 Exhibit Myrick Decl. Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Valdez, Darrell) (Entered: 12/11/2020)
2020-12-1133REPLY to opposition to motion re 29 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Myrick, # 2 Exhibit Myrick Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit C)(Valdez, Darrell) (Entered: 12/11/2020)
2021-01-0534REPLY to opposition to motion re 29 MOTION for Summary Judgment And Surreply in Support of Its Motion for Partial S.J. filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Thirteen, # 2 Exhibit Fourteen, # 3 Exhibit Fifteen, # 4 Exhibit Sixteen)(Snape, William) (Entered: 01/05/2021)
2021-01-0535SURREPLY to re 30 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment And Reply in Opposition to Defendants' Motion filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 13, # 2 Exhibit 14, # 3 Exhibit 15, # 4 Exhibit 16)(Snape, William) (Entered: 01/05/2021)
2021-01-1436Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Sur-Reply)(Valdez, Darrell) (Entered: 01/14/2021)
2021-01-15MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING defendants' 36 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply and DIRECTING the Clerk to docket defendants' Sur-Reply, attached as Exhibit 2 to defendants' motion. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on January 15, 2021. (lcbah3) (Entered: 01/15/2021)
2021-01-1537SURREPLY to re 29 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (eg) (Entered: 01/15/2021)
2021-01-2138NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Seventeen - Pence Transition Memo)(Snape, William) (Entered: 01/21/2021)
2021-02-09MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 29 30 cross-motions for summary judgment, which raise no disputed issue as to whether defendant U.S. Bureau of Land Management ("BLM") is entitled to summary judgment on Counts I-VI of the 7 Amended Complaint and whether defendant U.S. Department of Interior ("DOI") is entitled to summary judgment on Counts I, II, IV, V, and VI of the 7 Amended Complaint, that plaintiff submit, by February 16, 2021, supplemental briefing as to why summary judgment should be denied to BLM and DOI on those counts, with any response by defendants due by February 23, 2021. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on February 9, 2021. (lcbah3) (Entered: 02/09/2021)
2021-02-11Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's supplemental briefing due by 2/16/2021; defendant's response due by 2/23/2021. (ztg) (Entered: 02/11/2021)
2021-02-1639SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM re 30 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Snape, William) Modified event title and added link on 2/18/2021 (znmw). (Entered: 02/16/2021)
2021-02-2240RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order,, for Supplemental Briefing filed by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Valdez, Darrell) (Entered: 02/22/2021)
2021-03-01MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SHOW CAUSE by noon on March 4, 2021, why Counts I-VI of the 6 Amended Complaint against defendant Bureau of Land Management ("BLM") and Counts I, V, and VI against defendant U.S. Department of the Interior ("DOI"), which claims have been not been briefed by the parties in their pending 29 30 cross-motions for summary judgment, should not be summarily dismissed, particularly given the representations in plaintiff's 39 Supplemental Memorandum of Law and Facts that "[p]laintiff possesses no further claims against" BLM and that "[p]laintiffs remaining claims are against co-defendant [DOI] on Counts II, III, and IV of its Amended Complaint," id. at 1. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 1, 2021. (lcbah3) (Entered: 03/01/2021)
2021-03-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Show Cause due by noon on 3/4/2021. (ztg) (Entered: 03/01/2021)
2021-03-0341Joint MOTION to Dismiss and Joint Stipulation by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Snape, William) (Entered: 03/03/2021)
2021-03-03MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the parties' 41 Joint Motion of Dismissal, DISMISSING with prejudice, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), Counts I-VI of plaintiff's 6 Amended Complaint against defendant Bureau of Land Management and Counts I, V, and VI of the Amended Complaint against defendant U.S. Department of the Interior, and VACATING the deadline for the submission of plaintiff's response to the Order to Show Cause, see Min. Order (Mar. 1, 2021), originally set for noon on March 4, 2021. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 3, 2021. (lcbah3) (Entered: 03/03/2021)
2021-03-0942ORDER DENYING the defendant U.S. Department of the Interior's 29 Motion for Summary Judgment and DENYING the plaintiff's 30 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. See Order for further details. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 9, 2021. (lcbah3) (Entered: 03/09/2021)
2021-03-0943MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding the defendant U.S. Department of the Interior's 29 Motion for Summary Judgment and the plaintiff's 30 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 9, 2021. (lcbah3) (Entered: 03/09/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar