Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFREEDOM WATCH, INC. v. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01212
Date Filed2017-06-20
Date Closed2017-07-26
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffFREEDOM WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionFreedom Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice and the FBI for records written or prepared by former FBI Director James Comey concerning Barack Obama, Hillary Clinton, Bill Clinton, Michael Flynn, and Donald Trump. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and asked Freedom Watch to clarify the request. Freedom Watch declined to do so. Freedom Watch then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Adequacy - Search, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantFBI
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-06-201COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FBI ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4999418) filed by FREEDOM WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons)(Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 06/20/2017)
2017-06-20Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (sth) (Entered: 06/21/2017)
2017-06-212ENTERED IN ERROR.....SUMMONS (3)Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FBI and U.S. Attorney (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(sth) Modified on 6/23/2017 (zsth). (Entered: 06/21/2017)
2017-06-233REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by FREEDOM WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons)(Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 06/23/2017)
2017-06-234SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FBI, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(sth) (Entered: 06/23/2017)
2017-07-105NOTICE of Appearance by Carol Federighi on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FBI (Federighi, Carol) (Entered: 07/10/2017)
2017-07-216ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FBI.(Federighi, Carol) (Entered: 07/21/2017)
2017-07-21MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a proposed briefing schedule by August 4, 2017. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/21/17. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 07/21/2017)
2017-07-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Brief due by 8/4/2017. (nbn) (Entered: 07/24/2017)
2017-07-257Unopposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FBI (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Federighi, Carol) (Entered: 07/25/2017)
2017-07-26Cases Consolidated Gannett Satellite Information Network LLC v. Department of Justice, No. 17-1175; Judicial Watch, Inc., v. Department of Justice, No. 17-1189; and Freedom Watch, Inc., v. Department of Justice, No. 17-1212. ALL FILINGS IN THESE CONSOLIDATED CASES SHALL ONLY BE MADE IN LEAD CASE NO. 17-1167, pursuant to Minute Order filed 7/26/17. The parties are advised NOT to elect to SPREAD text when filing in ECF, as this will result in repetitive docketing and emails.(td) (Entered: 07/26/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff