Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01217
Date Filed2017-06-21
Date Closed2017-08-04
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the EPA for records concerning claims that the Clean Power Plan would prevent between 2,700 and 6,600 premature deaths. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-06-211COMPLAINT against ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5000206) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons EPA)(Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 06/21/2017)
2017-06-212LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 06/21/2017)
2017-06-21Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (md) (Entered: 06/21/2017)
2017-06-233ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 6/23/2017.(DM) (Entered: 06/23/2017)
2017-06-234SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 06/23/2017)
2017-07-065RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/30/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/30/2017.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 6/30/2017., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY served on 6/29/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 07/06/2017)
2017-07-266NOTICE of Appearance by Marina Utgoff Braswell on behalf of ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 07/26/2017)
2017-07-317ANSWER to Complaint by ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY.(Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 07/31/2017)
2017-08-018ORDER. The parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report by no later than August 22, 2017. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 8/1/2017. (lcckk3) (Entered: 08/01/2017)
2017-08-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Meet & Confer Statement due by 8/22/2017. (dot) (Entered: 08/01/2017)
2017-08-049STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joint) by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 08/04/2017)
2017-08-0410Dismissal Order. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 8/4/2017. (lcckk3) (Entered: 08/04/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff