Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFriends of Animals v. United States Fish and Wildlife Service, The
DistrictDistrict of Colorado
CityDenver
Case Number1:2017cv01519
Date Filed2017-06-22
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe
PlaintiffFriends of Animals
Case DescriptionFriends of Animals submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service for records concerning the endangered status of Panthera leo melanochaita. The agency took a 10-day extension due to the voluminous nature of the request. The agency disclosed records in installments, but after Friends of Animals was unable to determine if the agency had provided all the records, it filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Fish and Wildlife Service, The an agency of the United States
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-06-221COMPLAINT against United States Fish and Wildlife Service (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-5581635)Attorney Michael Ray Harris added to party Friends of Animals(pty:pla), filed by Friends of Animals. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Summons for the USFWS, # 3 Summons Summons for the US Attorney, # 4 Summons Summons for the US Attorney General)(Harris, Michael) (Entered: 06/22/2017)
2017-06-222Exhibits in Support of 1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Friends of Animals. (Harris, Michael) (Entered: 06/22/2017)
2017-06-223Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Text Only Entry. (rvill, ) (Entered: 06/23/2017)
2017-06-234SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rvill, ) (Entered: 06/23/2017)
2017-06-235ORDER Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference And Setting Deadline For Filing Of Consent/Non-Consent Form by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 6/23/2017. Consent Form due by 8/8/2017. Scheduling Conference set for 8/22/2017 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. (tsher, ) Modified on 6/23/2017 to show correct document title (tsher, ). (Entered: 06/23/2017)
2017-07-076NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Marisela Desire Sandoval on behalf of United States Fish and Wildlife Service, TheAttorney Marisela Desire Sandoval added to party United States Fish and Wildlife Service, The(pty:dft) (Sandoval, Marisela) (Entered: 07/07/2017)
2017-07-107SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant(s) United States Fish and Wildlife Service, The served on 7/5/2017, answer due 9/5/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Certified Mail Receipt and Tracking for USA)(Harris, Michael) (Entered: 07/10/2017)
2017-07-108SUMMONS Returned Executed by Friends of Animals. United States Fish and Wildlife Service, The served on 7/3/2017, answer due 9/5/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Certified Mail Receipt and Tracking for USFWS)(Harris, Michael) (Entered: 07/10/2017)
2017-07-109SUMMONS Returned Executed by Friends of Animals. (Attachments: # 1 Certified Mail Receipt and Return Receipt for the US Attorney General)(Harris, Michael) (Entered: 07/10/2017)
2017-07-1910Unopposed MOTION to Vacate 5 Minute Order, Scheduling Conference by Plaintiff Friends of Animals. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Harris, Michael) (Entered: 07/19/2017)
2017-07-1911MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 7/19/2017 granting 10 Unopposed Motion to Vacate Scheduling Conference and for a Stay. The Scheduling Conference set for August 22, 2017 at 10:30 a.m. is VACATED. This matter is STAYED for a period of 90 days. The parties shall file dismissal papers or a status report by 10/17/2017. (tsher, ) (Entered: 07/19/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff