Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01227
Date Filed2017-06-22
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted a FOIA request to the EPA for records concerning communications with agricultural or business groups pertaining to a variety of pesticides. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told American Oversight that it was currently processing a similar request and asked if American Oversight would accept the results of that search as responsive to its request. American Oversight responded that it was willing to accept the results of the earlier search, but the agency would need to search further in relation to other parts of its request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-06-221COMPLAINT against U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5001564) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - FOIA Request, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons to USAO, # 4 Summons to AG, # 5 Summons to EPA)(Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 06/22/2017)
2017-06-222LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 06/22/2017)
2017-06-26Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (md) (Entered: 06/26/2017)
2017-06-263STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 6/26/2017. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 06/26/2017)
2017-06-264SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (md) (Entered: 06/26/2017)
2017-07-055NOTICE of Appearance by Johnny Hillary Walker, III on behalf of U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 07/05/2017)
2017-07-066RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/3/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/2/2017.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY served on 6/30/2017, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 07/03/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 07/06/2017)
2017-08-027ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY.(Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 08/02/2017)
2017-08-03MINUTE ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to appear for a status conference on August 22, 2017, at 10:45 a.m., to discuss the schedule for further proceedings in this matter. The parties shall confer in advance of the status conference to narrow the issues for discussion. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 8/3/2017. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 08/03/2017)
2017-08-03Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 8/22/2017, at 10:45 AM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt) (Entered: 08/03/2017)
2017-08-038Consent MOTION to Continue Status Conference by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 08/03/2017)
2017-08-03MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiff's Consent Motion to Continue Status Conference 8 , the motion is hereby GRANTED. It is ORDERED that the status conference currently set for August 22, 2017, be VACATED and RESCHEDULED for August 29, 2017, at 9:45 a.m. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 8/3/2017. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 08/03/2017)
2017-08-04Set/Reset Hearings: The Status Conference set for 8/22/2017 is VACATED and RESCHEDULED to 8/29/2017, at 9:45 AM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt) (Entered: 08/04/2017)
2017-08-29Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Status Conference held on 8/29/2017. Joint Status Report due by 10/13/2017. The Defendant is to endeavor to complete, or substantially comply, within 45 days, the document search and production. (Court Reporter: Jeff Hook.) (kt) (Entered: 08/29/2017)
2017-10-139Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 10/13/2017)
2017-10-15MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' Joint Status Report 9 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties submit a joint status report on or before November 1, 2017. That report shall inform the Court whether any issues remain to be litigated, and, if necessary, propose a briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/15/17. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 10/15/2017)
2017-10-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/1/2017. (kt) (Entered: 10/16/2017)
2017-11-0110Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 11/01/2017)
2017-11-04MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' Joint Status Report 10 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit a joint status report including, if necessary, a jointly proposed briefing schedule on or before December 1, 2017. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 11/4/17. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 11/04/2017)
2017-11-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/1/2017. (kt) (Entered: 11/06/2017)
2017-12-0111Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 12/01/2017)
2017-12-04MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' Joint Status Report 11 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties file a joint status report on or before January 30, 2018. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/4/17. (lcrdm3, ) Modified on 12/4/2017 to correct the date/year (kt). (Entered: 12/04/2017)
2017-12-04Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/30/2018. (kt) (Entered: 12/04/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff