Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSoutheastern Legal Foundation, Inc. v. United States Environmental Protection Agency
DistrictNorthern District of Georgia
CityAtlanta
Case Number1:2017cv02365
Date Filed2017-06-23
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Totenberg
PlaintiffSoutheastern Legal Foundation, Inc.
Case DescriptionThe Southeastern Legal Foundation submitted a FOIA request to the EPA for records concerning the EPA's Office of Environmental Justice and the potential influence of outside advocacy groups. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency subsequently told SLF that it had nearly completed its review of more than 500 documents. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency, Southeastern Legal Foundation filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Environmental Protection Agency
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-06-231COMPLAINT, filed by Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113E-7227280.) (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O)(bnw) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 06/26/2017)
2017-06-232Electronic Summons Issued as to United States Environmental Protection Agency. (Attachments: # 1 Summons United States Attorney's Office, # 2 Summons US EPA)(bnw) (Entered: 06/26/2017)
2017-06-233Certificate of Interested Persons by Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc. (bnw) (Entered: 06/26/2017)
2017-06-284STANDING ORDER: Guidelines to Parties and Counsel in Cases Proceeding Before The Honorable Amy Totenberg. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 6/28/2017. (sap) (Entered: 06/28/2017)
2017-07-265REDOCKETED AT 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement , as to U.S. EPA, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorney NDGA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proof of Service - U.S. EPA, # 2 Exhibit Proof of Service - U.S. Attorney General, # 3 Exhibit Proof of Service - U.S. Attorney NDGA)(Hermann, Kimberly) (Entered: 07/26/2017)
2017-07-266Return of Service Executed by Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc. United States Environmental Protection Agency served on 6/26/2017, answer due 7/26/2017. (jtj) Modified on 7/26/2017 to edit answer due date. (jtj) (Entered: 07/26/2017)
2017-07-26Notification of Docket Correction re 6 Return of Service Executed as to USA. Defendant's answer due date is 7/26/2017. (jtj) (Entered: 07/26/2017)
2017-07-287ANSWER to 1 COMPLAINT by United States Environmental Protection Agency. Discovery ends on 12/26/2017.(Shingler, Emily) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 07/28/2017)
2017-08-158JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc.. (Hermann, Kimberly) (Entered: 08/15/2017)
2017-08-15Submission of 8 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan, submitted to District Judge Amy Totenberg. (jtj) (Entered: 08/15/2017)
2017-08-159SCHEDULING ORDER APPROVING 8 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. The Court ORDERS that the time limits for adding parties, amending the pleadings, filing motions, completing discovery, and discussing settlement are as stated in JPRDP. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 8/15/2017. (jtj) (Entered: 08/15/2017)
2017-12-1810ORDER DIRECTING the parties to file a status update and proposed briefing schedule for resolving the case NO LATER THAN JANUARY 5, 2018. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 12/18/2017. (jtj) (Entered: 12/18/2017)
2018-01-0511Joint MOTION for Extension of Summary Judgment Deadline and Joint Status Report with Brief In Support, by Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hermann, Kimberly) (Entered: 01/05/2018)
2018-01-05Submission of 11 Joint MOTION for Extension of Summary Judgment Deadline, submitted to District Judge Amy Totenberg. (jtj) (Entered: 01/05/2018)
2018-01-0512ORDER GRANTING 11 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for filing motions for summary judgment shall be extended through April 2, 2018. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 1/05/2018. (jtj) (Entered: 01/05/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff