Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAlexander v. Federal Aviation Administration
DistrictNorthern District of Georgia
CityAtlanta
Case Number1:2017cv02387
Date Filed2017-06-26
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Leigh Martin May
PlaintiffTimothy Alexander
Case DescriptionTimothy Alexander submitted a FOIA request to the Federal Aviation Administration for records concerning a complaint he filed against Piedmont Airlines in 2003. Alexander had made several unsuccessful FOIA requests for the records, the most recent of which was submitted in 2010. He filed suit claiming the agency had failed to respond to his 2010 request.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFederal Aviation Administration
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-06-261COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Timothy Alexander. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113E-7229852.) (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Affidavit Verification)(bnw) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 06/27/2017)
2017-06-262Electronic Summons Issued as to Federal Aviation Administration. (bnw) (Entered: 06/27/2017)
2017-06-273STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 6/27/17. (hfm) (Entered: 06/27/2017)
2017-08-024MOTION to Dismiss with Brief In Support by Federal Aviation Administration. (Attachments: # 1 Brief)(Johnson, Tiffany) (Entered: 08/02/2017)
2017-08-165RESPONSE in Opposition re 4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Timothy Alexander. (Begnaud, Mark) (Entered: 08/16/2017)
2017-08-306REPLY BRIEF re 4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Federal Aviation Administration. (Johnson, Tiffany) (Entered: 08/30/2017)
2017-08-31Submission of 4 MOTION to Dismiss , submitted to District Judge Leigh Martin May. (hfm) (Entered: 08/31/2017)
2017-09-257ORDER granting 4 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 9/25/17. (hfm) (Entered: 09/25/2017)
2017-09-258CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered for defendant and against plaintiff. (hfm)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist-- (Entered: 09/25/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff