Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBoundaoui v. Federal Bureau of Investigation et al
DistrictNorthern District of Illinois
CityChicago
Case Number1:2017cv04782
Date Filed2017-06-26
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeHonorable Thomas M. Durkin
PlaintiffAssia Boundaoui
Case DescriptionAssia Bourndaoui, a journalist and filmmaker, submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning Operation Vulgar Betrayal, an anti-terrorism operation conducted during the 1990s and 2000s targeting Arab neighborhoods in Chicago. Boundaoui also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver, both of which were denied. Boundaoui filed an administrative appeal. She was subsequently told by the FBI that her request would take three years to process. She then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Expedited processing, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFederal Bureau of Investigation
DefendantU.S. Department of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-06-261COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF filed by Assia Boundaoui; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-13318020.(Croke, Patrick) (Entered: 06/26/2017)
2017-06-262CIVIL Cover Sheet (Croke, Patrick) (Entered: 06/26/2017)
2017-06-263ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Assia Boundaoui by Patrick Edward Croke (Croke, Patrick) (Entered: 06/26/2017)
2017-06-27CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. (nsf, ) (Entered: 06/27/2017)
2017-06-274NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes the MIDP Standing Order. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (gcy, ) (Entered: 06/27/2017)
2017-06-28SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Federal Bureau of Investigation (pg, ) (Entered: 06/28/2017)
2017-07-185MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-13387847. (Poletto, Alexa) (Entered: 07/18/2017)
2017-07-196MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Application to appear pro hac vice 5 is granted; Attorney Alexa Poletto for Assia Boundaoui added. Mailed notice (srn, ) (Entered: 07/19/2017)
2017-07-207ORDER: Joint status report due by 8/10/2017. Status hearing set for 8/14/2017 at 09:00 AM. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 7/20/2017:Mailed notice(srn, ) (Entered: 07/20/2017)
2017-07-268SUMMONS Returned Executed by Assia Boundaoui as to Federal Bureau of Investigation served on 7/5/2017, answer due 9/5/2017 (Croke, Patrick) (Entered: 07/26/2017)
2017-07-269SUMMONS Returned Executed by Assia Boundaoui as to U.S. Department of Justice served on 6/30/2017, answer due 8/29/2017 (Croke, Patrick) (Entered: 07/26/2017)
2017-07-2810ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice by Marcia Kay Sowles (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 07/28/2017)
2017-07-2811MOTION by Defendants Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint 1 and for Postponement of Initial Status Conference 6 (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 07/28/2017)
2017-07-2812NOTICE of Motion by Marcia Kay Sowles for presentment of before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 8/3/2017 at 09:00 AM. (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 07/28/2017)
2017-07-2813MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Defendants' unopposed motion for extension of time to 8/14/2017 to answer or otherwise plead 11 is granted. The 8/14/2017 status date is vacated and reset for 8/28/2017 at 09:00 AM. Joint status report is to be filed by 8/23/2017. No appearance is required on 8/3/2017. Mailed notice (srn, ) (Entered: 07/28/2017)
2017-08-1214Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice(Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 08/12/2017)
2017-08-2215MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-13501285. (Mann, Michael) (Entered: 08/22/2017)
2017-08-2216MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Application to appear pro hac vice 15 is granted; Attorney Michael Mann for Assia Boundaoui added. Mailed notice (srn, ) (Entered: 08/22/2017)
2017-08-2317STATUS Report (Initial Joint Status Report) by Assia Boundaoui (Mann, Michael) (Entered: 08/23/2017)
2017-08-2818MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Status hearing held on 8/28/2017 and continued to 9/6/2017 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (srn, ) (Entered: 08/29/2017)
2017-09-0519MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Any party wishing to participate telephonically at the 9/6/2017 status hearing is directed to call 877-402-9757, access code 4410831 promptly at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice (srn, ) (Entered: 09/05/2017)
2017-09-0620MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Status hearing held on 9/6/2017 and continued to 9/13/2017 at 08:45 AM. The parties are to submit a joint status report by noon on 9/12/2017. Mailed notice (srn, ) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
2017-09-0621ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Assia Boundaoui by Christina W. Abraham (Abraham, Christina) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
2017-09-0822MOTION by Defendants Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justicefor Relief from Standing Order Regarding Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Program (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 09/08/2017)
2017-09-0823MEMORANDUM by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice in support of motion for relief from standing order regarding Mandatory Initial discovery Pilot Project 22 . (Sowles, Marcia) Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 9/11/2017 (jh, ). (Entered: 09/08/2017)
2017-09-0824NOTICE of Motion by Marcia Kay Sowles for presentment of motion for Standing Order Regarding Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project 22 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 9/13/2017 at 09:00 AM. (Sowles, Marcia) Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 9/11/2017 (jh, ). (Entered: 09/08/2017)
2017-09-1225NOTICE by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice re status hearing, set/reset hearings 20 (Attachments: # 1 Defendants' Postion on Rate of Production)(Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 09/12/2017)
2017-09-1226Second Joint Status Update by Assia Boundaoui (Attachments: # 1 Plaintiff's Addendum)(Poletto, Alexa) (Entered: 09/12/2017)
2017-09-1227NOTICE by Assia Boundaoui re Addendum to Second Joint Status Report 26 . (Poletto, Alexa) Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 9/14/2017 (jh, ). (Entered: 09/12/2017)
2017-09-1328MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Status hearing held on 9/13/2017. Status hearing set for 9/20/2017 at 08:45 AM.Mailed notice (srn, ) (Entered: 09/13/2017)
2017-09-1929MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Any party wishing to participate telephonically at the 9/20/2017 status hearing is instructed to call 877-402-9757, access code 4410831, promptly at 8:45 a.m. Mailed notice (srn, ) (Entered: 09/19/2017)
2017-09-1930MOTION by Defendants Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice to stay case pursuant to 5 U.S.C. 552(a)(6)(C) (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 09/19/2017)
2017-09-1931MEMORANDUM by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice in support of motion to stay 30 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration David M. Hardy, # 2 Exhibit Exhibits A - Q to Declaration of David M. Hardy)(Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 09/19/2017)
2017-09-1932NOTICE of Motion by Marcia Kay Sowles for presentment of motion to stay 30 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 9/27/2017 at 09:00 AM. (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 09/19/2017)
2017-09-1933MOTION by Plaintiff Assia Boundaoui to compel expedited processing of Plaintiff's Freedom of Information Act Request (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Poletto, Alexa) (Entered: 09/19/2017)
2017-09-1934NOTICE of Motion by Alexa Poletto for presentment of motion to compel 33 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 9/20/2017 at 08:45 AM. (Poletto, Alexa) (Entered: 09/19/2017)
2017-09-2035DECLARATION of David M. Hardy regarding memorandum in support of motion 31 , motion to stay 30 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Q)(Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 09/20/2017)
2017-09-2036MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Status hearing held on 9/20/2017. Responses to the motions to compel 33 and to stay 30 are due by 9/22/2017. Defense counsel is to file a supplement to their motion with a listing of cases that have been granted or denied, where the relief sought is identical to this motion. Status hearing set for 9/26/2017 at 08:45 AM. Counsel is directed to call 877-402-9757, access code 4410831 to participate in the hearing. Mailed notice (srn, ) (Entered: 09/20/2017)
2017-09-2237MEMORANDUM by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice in Opposition to motion to compel 33 (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 09/22/2017)
2017-09-2238NOTICE by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice re status hearing,, set motion and R&R deadlines/hearings, 36 , MOTION by Defendants Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice to stay case pursuant to 5 U.S.C. 552(a)(6)(C) 30 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit List of Cases in Which Government Filed a Motion for an Open America Stay)(Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 09/22/2017)
2017-09-2239RESPONSE by Assia Boundaouiin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice to stay case pursuant to 5 U.S.C. 552(a)(6)(C) 30 (Poletto, Alexa) (Entered: 09/22/2017)
2017-09-2640MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Defendants' motion for an Open America stay 30 is denied for the reasons stated in open court. Plaintiff's motion for expedited processing of her September 26, 2016 FOIA request 33 is granted for the reasons stated in open court. Defendants are ordered to: (1) produce volumes 1-5 and 5(a) of responsive documents (approximately 1,649 pages prior to applicable exemptions) on or before October 16, 2017; (2) review the approximately 33,120 pages of documents already identified by defendants as responsive to plaintiff's FOIA request on a rolling basis of 3,500 pages per month beginning the month of October 16, 2017 to November 16, 2017; and (3) give priority to the sub-files of individuals for whom plaintiff provides privacy waivers by appropriate means on or before October 16, 2017.The Court further orders that plaintiff pay the required fees on or before October 16, 2017. Any issue of whether the fees should be waived and thus reimbursed to plaintiff should be addressed on summary judgment. To the extent plaintiff seeks to challenge the FBI's search identifying 33,120 pages of relevant documents involving the Operation Vulgar Betrayal criminal investigation and seeks review of documents beyond those identified documents, that issue likewise should be addressed in the context of a motion for summary judgment. The expedited processing need not include such documents. The parties should provide monthly written status reports reporting on the compliance with this order. The first report will be due on October 20, 2017. Defendant's motion for relief from MIDP 22 is granted. Status hearing held on 9/26/2017.Mailed notice (srn, ) (Entered: 09/26/2017)
2017-09-2941TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 9/6/17 before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Telephone status. Order Number: 28391. Court Reporter Contact Information: Laura Renke, OfficialTranscript@gmail.com, 312.435.6053. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 10/20/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/30/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/28/2017. (Renke, Laura) (Entered: 09/29/2017)
2017-09-2942TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 9/20/17 before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Status hearing. Order Number: 28391. Court Reporter Contact Information: Laura Renke, OfficialTranscript@gmail.com, 312.435.6053. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 10/20/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/30/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/28/2017. (Renke, Laura) (Entered: 09/29/2017)
2017-10-0243TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 9/26/17 before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Status hearing. Order Number: 28399. Court Reporter Contact Information: Laura Renke, OfficialTranscript@gmail.com, 312.435.6053. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 10/23/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/2/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/2/2018. (Renke, Laura) (Entered: 10/02/2017)
2017-10-2044STATUS Report (Third Joint Status Report) by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 10/20/2017)
2017-11-2045STATUS Report -- Fourth Joint Report by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 11/20/2017)
2017-12-2046STATUS Report by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 12/20/2017)
2018-01-1947SIXTH JOINT STATUS Report by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice. (Sowles, Marcia) Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 1/22/2018 (jh, ). (Entered: 01/19/2018)
2018-02-2148STATUS Report (Seventh Joint Status Report) by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 02/21/2018)
2018-02-2149MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:The Court has reviewed the parties' Seventh Joint Status Report 48 . The Court advises Plaintiff that she should make herself available to receive documents that are being produced to her without the government incurring additional costs for delivery. She may want to consider having the produced documents delivered to her attorneys' offices.Mailed notice (srn, ) (Entered: 02/21/2018)
2018-03-2250STATUS Report (Eighth Joint Status Report) by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 03/22/2018)
2018-04-1851STATUS Report (Ninth Joint Status Report) by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 04/18/2018)
2018-04-2652MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-14402956. (Burke, Thomas) (Entered: 04/26/2018)
2018-04-2753MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Application to appear pro hac vice 52 is granted; Attorney Thomas R. Burke for Assia Boundaoui added. Mailed notice (srn, ) (Entered: 04/27/2018)
2018-05-1854STATUS Report (Tenth Joint Status Report) by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 05/18/2018)
2018-06-2055STATUS Report (Joint) by Assia Boundaoui (Poletto, Alexa) (Entered: 06/20/2018)
2018-07-2056STATUS Report (12th Joint) by Assia Boundaoui (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Poletto, Alexa) (Entered: 07/20/2018)
2018-08-2057STATUS Report (Thirteenth Joint Status Report) by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 08/20/2018)
2018-09-1958STATUS Report by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 09/19/2018)
2018-10-1259NOTICE by Marcia Kay Sowles of Change of Address (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 10/12/2018)
2018-10-1960STATUS Report (Fifteenth Joint Status Report) by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 10/19/2018)
2018-11-2061STATUS Report by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 11/20/2018)
2018-12-1862STATUS Report (Seventeenth Joint Status Report) by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 12/18/2018)
2018-12-2663GENERAL ORDER 18-0028 dated 12/26/18: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, effective December 26, 2018, that all civil litigation involving as a party the United States of America, is immediately suspended, postponed and held in abeyance continuing for a period of fourteen (14) days from the date of entry of this General Order (For Further Details See Attached Order). Signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 12/26/2018: Mailed notice. (sm, ) (Entered: 12/30/2018)
2019-01-0864AMENDED GENERAL ORDER 18-0028 dated 01/08/2019: On December 26, 2018, General Order 18-0028 was entered. It appearing that the lapse of congressional appropriations funding the federal government continues, therefore General Order 18-0028 is now amended. (For Further Details See Attached Order). Signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 1/8/2019: Mailed notice. (sm, ) (Entered: 01/08/2019)
2019-01-2865GENERAL ORDER 19-0004: RESETTING OF DEADLINES IN CIVIL MATTERS INVOLVING THE UNITED STATES AS A PARTY. IT APPEARING THAT as a result of the partial federal government shutdown, this Court amended General Order 18-0028 suspending as of December 21, 2018, all civil litigation in which the United States of America, its agencies, its officers, or employees were parties, with the stated intention of clarifying schedules in such cases upon the expiration of the lapse in appropriations; and IT FURTHER APPEARING THAT appropriations having been restored to fund the Department of Justice and other Executive Branch agencies, with employees beginning to report for work beginning on January 28, 2019; accordingly IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the stay entered by General Order 18-0028 is hereby lifted, and any and all deadlines in the affected civil litigation (whether established by order, rule, or agreement.), including but not limited to any scheduled discovery and pleading dates, are extended by 42 days. (For Further Details See Attached Order). Signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 1/28/2019: Mailed notice. (mgw, ) (Entered: 01/28/2019)
2019-03-0466STATUS Report (Eighteenth Joint Report) by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 03/04/2019)
2019-03-2967STATUS Report (Nineteenth Joint Status Report) by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 03/29/2019)
2019-04-0568MOTION by Plaintiff Assia BoundaouiRequest for a Status Conference (Poletto, Alexa) (Entered: 04/05/2019)
2019-04-0569NOTICE of Motion by Alexa Poletto for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief 68 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 5/15/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Poletto, Alexa) (Entered: 04/05/2019)
2019-04-0870MOTION by Plaintiff Assia BoundaouiFor Status Conference And To Clarify Court's Order Directing Defendants To Respond To Plaintiff's September 26, 2016 FOIA Request (AMENDED) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Poletto, Alexa) (Entered: 04/08/2019)
2019-04-0871AMENDED NOTICE of Motion by Alexa Poletto for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief, 70 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 4/29/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Poletto, Alexa) (Entered: 04/08/2019)
2019-04-2272MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Any party that would like to participate telephonically at the 4/29/2019 motion hearing is directed to call 877-402-9757, access code 4410831 promptly at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (srn, ) (Entered: 04/22/2019)
2019-04-2573MEMORANDUM by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice in Opposition to motion for miscellaneous relief, 70 (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 04/25/2019)
2019-04-2974MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Plaintiff's motions for a status hearing 68 70 are granted. The parties are directed to meet and confer and submit a status report by 5/6/2019 in accordance with this Court's oral ruling. Motion hearing held on 4/29/2019. Status hearing set for 5/8/2019 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (srn, ) (Entered: 04/29/2019)
2019-05-0675STATUS Report (Twentieth Joint Status Report) by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 05/06/2019)
2019-05-0776MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Status hearing reset for 5/8/2019 at 09:30 AM. Note: time change only. Counsel is directed to call 877-402-9757, access code 4410831 promptly at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (srn, ) (Entered: 05/07/2019)
2019-05-0877MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Status hearing held on 5/8/2019.Status hearing set for 6/20/2019 at 09:00 AM.By June 7, 2019 an affidavit is to be submitted by a representative of the government that sets forth the requirements stated by this Court. Additionally, all agencies must have completed their review of documents for exemptions by June 7, 2019. Mailed notice (srn, ) (Entered: 05/08/2019)
2019-05-1378TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 5/8/19 before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Status hearing. Order Number: 34682. Court Reporter Contact Information: Laura Renke, OfficialTranscript@gmail.com, 312.435.6053. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 6/3/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/13/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/12/2019. (Renke, Laura) (Entered: 05/13/2019)
2019-06-0779MOTION by Defendants Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice for summary judgment (partial summary judgment) (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 06/07/2019)
2019-06-0780MEMORANDUM by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice in support of motion for summary judgment 79 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Daniel R. William, Supervisory Special Agent, FBI, # 2 Declaration David M. Hardy, Section Chief, Record/Information Dissemination Section)(Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 06/07/2019)
2019-06-0781RULE 56 (a) Statement by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice regarding motion for summary judgment 79 (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 06/07/2019)
2019-06-0782NOTICE of Motion by Marcia Kay Sowles for presentment of motion for summary judgment 79 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 6/20/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 06/07/2019)
2019-06-1383Letter by Assia Boundaoui Re. Defendants Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Poletto, Alexa) (Entered: 06/13/2019)
2019-06-1484MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:The Court is in receipt of plaintiff's letter regarding defendants' partial motion for summary judgment, R. 83 , and will address the issues it raises at the status hearing set for June 20, 2019.Mailed notice (srn, ) (Entered: 06/14/2019)
2019-06-2085MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Status hearing held on 6/20/2019. Counsel is to contact this Court's courtroom deputy to provide a briefing schedule on the partial motion for summary judgment. Mailed notice (srn, ) (Entered: 06/20/2019)
2019-06-2786STATUS Report filed on behalf of Plaintiff and Defendants by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 06/27/2019)
2019-06-2787MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Plaintiff's response to defendants' motion for summary judgment 79 is due by 7/31/2019. Defendants' reply is due by 8/30/2019. Status hearing set for 10/9/2019 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (srn, ) (Entered: 06/27/2019)
2019-07-1688TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 6/20/19 before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Status hearing. Order Numbers: 35185, 35355. Court Reporter Contact Information: Laura Renke, OfficialTranscript@gmail.com, 312.435.6053. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 8/6/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/16/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/15/2019. (Renke, Laura) (Entered: 07/16/2019)
2019-07-3189MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16088372. (Qureshi, Zainab) (Entered: 07/31/2019)
2019-07-3190MOTION by Plaintiff Assia Boundaoui for extension of time to file response to Defendants' motion for partial summary judgment 79 (Poletto, Alexa) (Entered: 07/31/2019)
2019-07-3191NOTICE of Motion by Alexa Poletto for presentment of motion for extension of time to file 90 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 8/6/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Poletto, Alexa) (Entered: 07/31/2019)
2019-08-0192MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Plaintiff's unopposed motion for extension of time to file a response to defendant's motion for summary judgment 90 is granted. Plaintiff's response is due by 8/7/2019. Defendant's reply is due by 9/16/2019. No appearance is required on 8/6/2019. Mailed notice (srn, ) (Entered: 08/01/2019)
2019-08-0293MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Motion to appear pro hac vice 89 is granted; Attorney Zainab Qureshi for plaintiff added.Mailed notice (srn, ) (Entered: 08/02/2019)
2019-08-0594NOTICE by All Defendants re memorandum in support of motion, 80 Errata to Exhibit 2 (ECF No. 80-2) (Attachments: # 1 Errata Corrected Copy of Declaration of David Hardy (ECF No. 80-2))(Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 08/05/2019)
2019-08-0795RESPONSE by Assia Boundaouiin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice for summary judgment (partial summary judgment) 79 (Poletto, Alexa) (Entered: 08/07/2019)
2019-08-0796RESPONSE by Plaintiff Assia Boundaoui to Rule 56 statement 81 Of Material Facts Not In Dispute And Plaintiff's L.R. 56.1(b)(3)(C) Statement Of Additional Facts Requiring The Denial Of Defendants' Motion For Partial Summary Judgment (Poletto, Alexa) (Entered: 08/07/2019)
2019-08-0797DECLARATION of Assia Boundaoui regarding response in opposition to motion 95 For Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O)(Poletto, Alexa) (Entered: 08/07/2019)
2019-08-0798DECLARATION of Alexa Poletto regarding response in opposition to motion 95 For Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Poletto, Alexa) (Entered: 08/07/2019)
2019-08-0799MOTION by Plaintiff Assia Boundaoui for order to show cause (Poletto, Alexa) (Entered: 08/07/2019)
2019-08-07100MEMORANDUM by Assia Boundaoui in support of motion for order to show cause 99 (Poletto, Alexa) (Entered: 08/07/2019)
2019-08-07101DECLARATION of Assia Boundaoui regarding motion for order to show cause 99 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O)(Poletto, Alexa) (Entered: 08/07/2019)
2019-08-07102DECLARATION of Alexa Poletto regarding motion for order to show cause 99 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Poletto, Alexa) (Entered: 08/07/2019)
2019-08-07103EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Assia Boundaoui Exhibit "1" regarding memorandum in support of motion 100 (Poletto, Alexa) (Entered: 08/07/2019)
2019-08-07104NOTICE of Motion by Alexa Poletto for presentment of motion for order to show cause 99 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 8/20/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Poletto, Alexa) (Entered: 08/07/2019)
2019-08-13105MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:By agreement of the parties, defendant's response to plaintiff's motion for order to show cause 99 is due by 9/16/2019. Plaintiff's reply is due by 10/11/2019. No appearance is required on 8/20/2019. Mailed notice (srn, ) (Entered: 08/13/2019)
2019-08-22106EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: GENERAL ORDER 19-0024 Pursuant to the Executive Committee Order entered on August 9, 2019 the civil cases on the attached list have been randomly selected for reassignment to form the initial calendar of the Honorable Mary M. Rowland; therefore IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the attached list of 342 cases be reassigned to the Honorable Mary M. Rowland; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all parties affected by this Order must review the Honorable Mary M. Rowland's webpage on the Court's website for the purpose of reviewing instructions regarding scheduling and case management procedures; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any civil case that has been reassigned pursuant to this Order shall not be randomly reassigned to create the initial calendar of a new district judge for twelve months from the date of this Order; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to add the Honorable Mary M. Rowland to the Court's civil case assignment system during the next business day, so that she shall receive a full share of such cases; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to add the Honorable Mary M. Rowland to the Court's criminal case assignment system thirty days from the entry of this Order, so that she shall receive a full share of such cases. Case reassigned to the Honorable Mary M. Rowland for all further proceedings. Honorable Thomas M. Durkin no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 8/22/2019.(rp, ) (Entered: 08/22/2019)
2019-08-26107MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: This case was reassigned to form the initial calendar of District Judge Mary M. Rowland pursuant to General Order 19-0024. Due to a personal conflict in this matter, Judge Rowland hereby recuses herself from this case. Reassignment order to follow. Mailed notice. (dm, ) (Entered: 08/26/2019)
2019-08-27108EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman for all further proceedings. Honorable Mary M. Rowland no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/27/2019. Mailed notice.(las, ) (Entered: 08/28/2019)
2019-09-09109EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER:It appearing that General Order 19-0024 was entered on August 22, 2019, identifying cases to form the initial calendar of the Hon. Mary M. Rowland; and It further appearing that the Hon. Mary M. Rowland recused herself from 17 CV 04782, Boundaoui v. Federal Bureau of Investigation et al., previously pending before the Hon. Thomas M. Durkin; and It further appearing that pursuant to Internal Operating Procedure 16(i) provided for 17 CV 04782, Boundaoui v. Federal Bureau of Investigation et al., to be reassigned back to the calendar of Judge Durkin; and It further appearing that 17 CV 04782, Boundaoui v. Federal Bureau of Investigation et al., was reassigned in error to the Hon. Sharon Johnson Coleman; and It further appearing that 17 CV 02902, Nally Jr. v. Obaisi et al., was reassigned in error to the Hon. Mary M. Rowland as a replacement for 17 CV 04782; therefore It is hereby ordered that the Clerk shall reassign 17 CV 04782, Boundaoui v. Federal Bureau of Investigation et al., from Judge Coleman to Judge Durkin and 17 CV 02902, Nally Jr. v. Obaisi et al., from Judge Rowland to Judge Coleman. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/9/2019.(las, ) (Entered: 09/09/2019)
2019-09-16110REPLY by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice to response in opposition to motion 95 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Third Declaration of David Hardy)(Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 09/16/2019)
2019-09-16111RULE 56 (c) (response to Plaintiff's statement of additional facts) Statement by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice regarding motion for summary judgment 79 (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 09/16/2019)
2019-09-16112MEMORANDUM by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice in Opposition to motion for order to show cause 99 (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 09/16/2019)
2019-10-03113MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:On the Court's own motion, the 10/9/2019 status hearing is vacated and reset for 10/10/2019 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (srn, ) (Entered: 10/03/2019)
2019-10-07114MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:The 10/10/2019 status hearing is vacated and reset for 11/12/2019 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (srn, ) (Entered: 10/07/2019)
2019-10-11115REPLY by Assia Boundaoui to MOTION by Plaintiff Assia Boundaoui for order to show cause 99 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Poletto, Alexa) (Entered: 10/11/2019)
2019-10-30116ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Assia Boundaoui by Kevin M Fee, Jr (Fee, Kevin) (Entered: 10/30/2019)
2019-10-30117WITHDRAWING Patrick E. Croke as counsel for Plaintiff Assia Boundaoui and substituting Kevin M Fee, Jr as counsel of record (Fee, Kevin) (Entered: 10/30/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar