Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleValencia v. United States Transportation Security Administration
DistrictWestern District of Michigan
CitySouthern Division
Case Number1:2017cv00580
Date Filed2017-06-26
Date Closed2017-09-20
JudgeJudge Gordon J. Quist
PlaintiffFelipe Valencia
Case DescriptionFelipe Valencia submitted a FOIA request to the Transportation Security Administration for records concerning a random screening of him by the agency in 2013. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Valencia filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Transportation Security Administration
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-06-261COMPLAINT against United States Transportation Security Administration filed by Felipe Valencia (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit FOIA Request) (Alvarez, Robert) (Entered: 06/26/2017)
2017-06-262APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (Alvarez, Robert) (Entered: 06/26/2017)
2017-06-263NOTICE that this case has been assigned Gordon J. Quist (ns) (Entered: 06/26/2017)
2017-06-26COMPLAINT RECEIVED; IFP Decision Pending (ns) (Entered: 06/26/2017)
2017-06-274ORDER granting plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green, jkw) (Entered: 06/27/2017)
2017-06-29SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to United States Transportation Security Administration none provided (anm) Modified text on 6/30/2017 (anm). (Entered: 06/29/2017)
2017-06-295ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER No. 17-CA-072 reassigning cognate case 1:17-cv-581 to Judge Gordon J. Quist for all further proceedings; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (jlg) (Entered: 06/30/2017)
2017-08-156PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re 1 (Alvarez, Robert) (Entered: 08/15/2017)
2017-08-16SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendant United States Transportation Security Administration please refer to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(i) regarding service on the United States and Its Agencies, Corporations, Officers, or Employees. (mg) (Entered: 08/16/2017)
2017-08-177PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re 1 (Alvarez, Robert) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
2017-08-18SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Transportation Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and delivered to US Marshal for service (cep) (Entered: 08/18/2017)
2017-08-21(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Victoria Lynn Smalley on behalf of plaintiff Felipe Valencia (Smalley, Victoria) (Entered: 08/21/2017)
2017-09-148ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE on behalf of United States Transportation Security Administration served on 8/24/2017, answer due 10/23/2017 (ns) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
2017-09-209NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL of case filed by plaintiff Felipe Valencia (Alvarez, Robert) (Entered: 09/20/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff