Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleValencia v. United States Social Security Administration
DistrictWestern District of Michigan
CitySouthern Division
Case Number1:2017cv00581
Date Filed2017-06-26
Date Closed2017-09-25
JudgeJudge Gordon J. Quist
PlaintiffFelipe Valencia
Case DescriptionFelipe Valencia submitted a FOIA request to the Social Security Administration for records concerning his application for social security benefits. He also requested information about contacts between the agency and the Department of Homeland Security concerning Valencia's visit to the SSA's Holland, Michigan office. The agency responded to the first part of Valencia's request, but not the second part. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Valencia filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Social Security Administration
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-06-261COMPLAINT against United States Social Security Administration filed by Felipe Valencia (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4) (Alvarez, Robert) (Entered: 06/26/2017)
2017-06-262APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (Alvarez, Robert) (Entered: 06/26/2017)
2017-06-26COMPLAINT RECEIVED; IFP Decision Pending (ems) (Entered: 06/28/2017)
2017-06-283Memorandum regarding potentially related case returned to Clerk from Magistrate Judge Green indicating that this case is not related to 1:17-cv-580 (mkc) (Entered: 06/28/2017)
2017-06-284NOTICE that this case has been assigned Robert J. Jonker (ems) (Entered: 06/28/2017)
2017-06-285ORDER granting plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green, jkw) (Entered: 06/28/2017)
2017-06-29SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendant United States Social Security Administration (none provided) (ems) (Entered: 06/29/2017)
2017-06-296ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER No. 17-CA-072 that this case is reassigned to Judge Gordon J. Quist for all further proceedings ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (mg) (Entered: 06/30/2017)
2017-08-157PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re 1 (Alvarez, Robert) (Entered: 08/15/2017)
2017-08-16SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendant United States Social Security Administration (please refer to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(i) regarding service on the United States and Its Agencies, Corporations, Officers, or Employees) (ems) (Entered: 08/16/2017)
2017-08-178PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re 1 (Alvarez, Robert) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
2017-08-18SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendant United States Social Security Administration regarding 8 , attorney notified as to what is needed and they will re-file proposed summons (slk) (Entered: 08/18/2017)
2017-08-21(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Victoria Lynn Smalley on behalf of plaintiff Felipe Valencia (Smalley, Victoria) (Entered: 08/21/2017)
2017-08-229PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re 1 (Alvarez, Robert) (Entered: 08/22/2017)
2017-08-22SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and delivered to US Marshal for service (ems) (Entered: 08/22/2017)
2017-09-0710SUMMONS returned executed by US Marshal on United States Social Security Administration, US Attorney and US Attorney General; service upon defendant, United States Social Security Administration complete on 8/24/2017, answer due 10/23/2017 (ems) (Entered: 09/07/2017)
2017-09-2011UNOPPOSED MOTION for extension of time to file a response or otherwise plead by defendant United States Social Security Administration; (Long, Jeanne) (Entered: 09/20/2017)
2017-09-2012BRIEF in support of UNOPPOSED MOTION for extension of time to file a response or otherwise plead 11 filed by United States Social Security Administration (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Long, Jeanne) (Entered: 09/20/2017)
2017-09-2013CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re UNOPPOSED MOTION for extension of time to file a response or otherwise plead 11 filed by United States Social Security Administration (Long, Jeanne) (Entered: 09/20/2017)
2017-09-2114ORDER granting 11 motion for extension of time to file; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) (Entered: 09/21/2017)
2017-09-2515NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL of case filed by plaintiff Felipe Valencia (Alvarez, Robert) (Entered: 09/25/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff