Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCouncil on American-Islamic Relations - Connecticut et al v. US Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
DistrictDistrict of Connecticut
CityNew Haven
Case Number3:2017cv01061
Date Filed2017-06-27
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Robert M. Spector
PlaintiffCouncil on American-Islamic Relations - Connecticut
PlaintiffMake the Road New York
Case DescriptionThe Council on American-Islamic Relations-Connecticut and Make the Road New York submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Homeland Security and U.S. Customs and Border Protection for records concerning policies regarding screening of individuals at ports of entry. The organizations also submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services for records concerning the criteria used in considering visa applications. The organizations also submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning criteria used in considering visa applications. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from any of the agencies, the Council on American-Islamic Relations-Connecticut and Make the Road New York filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUS Citizenship and Immigration Services
DefendantU.S. Customs and Border Protection
DefendantU.S. Department of State
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-06-271COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0205-4448842.), filed by Council on American-Islamic Relations - Connecticut, Make the Road New York.(Ahmad, Muneer) Modified on 6/27/2017 (Walker, A). (Entered: 06/27/2017)
2017-06-27Judge Alfred V. Covello added. (Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 06/27/2017)
2017-06-272ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 6/27/2017.(Hushin, Z.) (Entered: 06/28/2017)
2017-06-283NOTICE TO COUNSEL/PRO SE PARTIES : Counsel or pro se parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of 2 Electronic Filing Order, 1 Complaint filed by Council on American-Islamic Relations - Connecticut, Make the Road New York Signed by Clerk on 6/28/2017.(Hushin, Z.) (Entered: 06/28/2017)
2017-06-294EXHIBIT A-I by Council on American-Islamic Relations - Connecticut, Make the Road New York re 1 Complaint. (Ahmad, Muneer) (Entered: 06/29/2017)
2017-07-12Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Ahmad, Muneer) (Entered: 07/12/2017)
2017-07-135ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of State, US Citizenship and Immigration Services* with answer to complaint due within *30* days. Attorney *Muneer I. Ahmad* *Jerome N. Frank Legal Services - Wall St - Yale Law School* *127 Wall Street* *New Haven, CT 06511*. (Hushin, Z.) (Entered: 07/13/2017)
2017-07-146NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Wishnie on behalf of Council on American-Islamic Relations - Connecticut, Make the Road New York (Wishnie, Michael) (Entered: 07/14/2017)
2017-07-147SUMMONS Returned Executed by Council on American-Islamic Relations - Connecticut, Make the Road New York. U.S. Customs and Border Protection served on 7/14/2017, answer due 8/13/2017; U.S. Department of State served on 7/14/2017, answer due 8/13/2017; US Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 7/14/2017, answer due 8/13/2017. (Ahmad, Muneer) (Entered: 07/14/2017)
2017-08-088NOTICE of Appearance by Michael L. Drezner on behalf of U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of State, US Citizenship and Immigration Services (Drezner, Michael) (Entered: 08/08/2017)
2017-08-089Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until September 13, 2017 to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of State, US Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Drezner, Michael) (Entered: 08/08/2017)
2017-08-1010ORDER granting 9 motion for extension of time. The time for the defendants to respond to the plaintiffs' complaint is extended to and including September 13, 2017. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on August 10, 2017. (Modzelewski, C.) (Entered: 08/10/2017)
2017-09-0811Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until October 13, 2017 to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of State, US Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Drezner, Michael) (Entered: 09/08/2017)
2017-09-1212ORDER granting 11 motion for extension of time. The time for the defendants to respond to the plaintiffs' complaint is extended to and including October 13, 2017. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on September 12, 2017. (Modzelewski, C.) (Entered: 09/12/2017)
2017-09-1813MOTION for Attorney(s) Justin B. Cox to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4536777) by Council on American-Islamic Relations - Connecticut, Make the Road New York. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Affidavit)(Ahmad, Muneer) (Entered: 09/18/2017)
2017-09-1814MOTION for Attorney(s) Mariko Hirose to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4536831) by Council on American-Islamic Relations - Connecticut, Make the Road New York. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Ahmad, Muneer) (Entered: 09/18/2017)
2017-09-1815MOTION for Attorney(s) Stephen Poellot to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4536844) by Council on American-Islamic Relations - Connecticut, Make the Road New York. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Ahmad, Muneer) (Entered: 09/18/2017)
2017-09-1916MOTION for Attorney(s) 1 to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4538798) by Council on American-Islamic Relations - Connecticut, Make the Road New York. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit Certificate of standing, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Ahmad, Muneer) (Entered: 09/19/2017)
2017-09-1917MOTION for Attorney(s) Esther Sung to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4538799) by Council on American-Islamic Relations - Connecticut, Make the Road New York. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit Certificate of standing, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Ahmad, Muneer) (Entered: 09/19/2017)
2017-09-1918MOTION for Attorney(s) Melissa Keaney to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4538800) by Council on American-Islamic Relations - Connecticut, Make the Road New York. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit Certificate of standing, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Ahmad, Muneer) (Entered: 09/19/2017)
2017-09-1919MOTION for Attorney(s) Nicholas Espiritu to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4538801) by Council on American-Islamic Relations - Connecticut, Make the Road New York. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit Certificate of standing, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Ahmad, Muneer) (Entered: 09/19/2017)
2017-09-2820ORDER granting 13 motion to appear; granting 14 motion to appear; granting 15 motion to appear; granting 16 motion to appear; granting 17 motion to appear; granting 18 motion to appear; granting 19 motion to appear Certificate of Good Standing due by 11/27/2017. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 09/28/17. (Covello, Alfred) (Entered: 09/28/2017)
2017-10-0221NOTICE of Appearance by Mariko Hirose on behalf of Council on American-Islamic Relations - Connecticut, Make the Road New York (Hirose, Mariko) (Entered: 10/02/2017)
2017-10-0422NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Poellot on behalf of Council on American-Islamic Relations - Connecticut, Make the Road New York (Poellot, Stephen) (Entered: 10/04/2017)
2017-10-1023MOTION for Extension of Time and Entry of Briefing Schedule by U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of State, US Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Drezner, Michael) (Entered: 10/10/2017)
2017-10-1124ORDER granting in part and denying in part 23 motion for extension of time. The time for the defendants to respond to the plaintiffs' complaint is hereby extended to and including November 17, 2017. The defendants' motion is denied in all other respects. The response and reply, if any, shall be filed in accordance with the federal and local rules of civil procedure. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on October 11, 2017. (Kontyko, K.) (Entered: 10/11/2017)
2017-11-04Answer deadline updated for All Defendants. The time for the defendants to respond to the plaintiffs' complaint is hereby extended to and including November 17, 2017 (Alexander, R.) (Entered: 11/04/2017)
2017-11-0925Joint MOTION to Stay Briefing Schedule by Council on American-Islamic Relations - Connecticut, Make the Road New York.Responses due by 11/30/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ahmad, Muneer) (Entered: 11/09/2017)
2017-11-1326ORDER granting in part and denying in part 25 motion to stay. The briefing schedule is hereby stayed to and including December 28, 2017. Any future motions for an extension of the stay shall include a specific articulation of the basis of the need for additional time. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on November 13, 2017. (Kontyko, K.) (Entered: 11/13/2017)
2017-12-0127Joint STATUS REPORT by Council on American-Islamic Relations - Connecticut, Make the Road New York. (Ahmad, Muneer) (Entered: 12/01/2017)
2017-12-2828ANSWER to 1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of State, US Citizenship and Immigration Services.(Drezner, Michael) (Entered: 12/28/2017)
2017-12-2829Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of State, US Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Drezner, Michael) (Entered: 12/28/2017)
2018-01-2630Joint STATUS REPORT by Council on American-Islamic Relations - Connecticut, Make the Road New York. (Ahmad, Muneer) (Entered: 01/26/2018)
2018-02-0231MOTION for Attorney(s) Joshua T. Stehlik to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-4705454) by Council on American-Islamic Relations - Connecticut, Make the Road New York. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ahmad, Muneer) (Entered: 02/02/2018)
2018-02-0232MOTION for Attorney(s) Linda B. Evarts to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-4705519) by Council on American-Islamic Relations - Connecticut, Make the Road New York. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Appendix Certificate of Good Standing)(Ahmad, Muneer) (Entered: 02/02/2018)
2018-02-0633ORDER granting 31 Motion for Attorney Joshua T. Stehlik to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 4/7/2018. Signed by Clerk on 2/6/2018. (Bozek, M.) (Entered: 02/06/2018)
2018-02-0634ORDER granting 32 Motion for Attorney Linda B. Evarts to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 2/6/2018. (Bozek, M.) (Entered: 02/06/2018)
2018-02-2835NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua T. Stehlik on behalf of Council on American-Islamic Relations - Connecticut, Make the Road New York (Stehlik, Joshua) (Entered: 02/28/2018)
2018-02-2836NOTICE of Appearance by Linda B. Evarts on behalf of Council on American-Islamic Relations - Connecticut, Make the Road New York (Evarts, Linda) (Entered: 02/28/2018)
2018-03-0537CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re 31 MOTION for Attorney(s) Joshua T. Stehlik to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-4705454) by Council on American-Islamic Relations - Connecticut, Make the Road New York. (Stehlik, Joshua) (Entered: 03/05/2018)
2018-03-2738Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of State, US Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Drezner, Michael) (Entered: 03/27/2018)
2018-04-0939ORDER for production of documents. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on April 9, 2018. (Kontyko, K.) (Entered: 04/09/2018)
2018-05-2540Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of State, US Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Drezner, Michael) (Entered: 05/25/2018)
2018-06-2541Joint STATUS REPORT (Amended) by U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of State, US Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Drezner, Michael) (Entered: 06/25/2018)
2018-07-2442Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of State, US Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Drezner, Michael) (Entered: 07/24/2018)
2018-09-2443Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of State, US Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Drezner, Michael) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
2018-09-2544STATUS REPORT (Corrected Signature Line) by Council on American-Islamic Relations - Connecticut, Make the Road New York. (Ahmad, Muneer) (Entered: 09/25/2018)
2018-11-2645Joint STATUS REPORT by Council on American-Islamic Relations - Connecticut, Make the Road New York. (Ahmad, Muneer) (Entered: 11/26/2018)
2019-01-0946MOTION to Stay Production Schedule by U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of State, US Citizenship and Immigration Services.Responses due by 1/30/2019 (Drezner, Michael) (Entered: 01/09/2019)
2019-01-2347ORDER granting 46 motion to stay. Counsel shall notify the court within 10 days after congress has restored appropriations to the department of justice. The court will address the issue of appropriate deadlines and extensions after it is notified by counsel that appropriations have been restored. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 1/23/19. (Hall, Gregory) (Entered: 01/23/2019)
2019-01-23Case Stayed per 47 Order. (Bozek, M.) (Entered: 01/24/2019)
2019-02-0148NOTICE by U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of State, US Citizenship and Immigration Services (Drezner, Michael) (Entered: 02/01/2019)
2019-02-0649Consent MOTION to Modify Production Schedule by U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of State, US Citizenship and Immigration Services.Responses due by 2/27/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Drezner, Michael) (Entered: 02/06/2019)
2019-02-1950ORDER granting 49 motion to modify production schedule. It is hereby ordered that defendants U.S. Department of State and U.S. Customs and Border Protection will make their next production of those non-exempt, fully processed documents which require the use of electronic search terms, on 3/8/19. Thereafter, the U.S. Department of State and U.S. Customs and Border Protection will continue to make such productions on a rolling basis every 8 weeks. The parties will submit the next joint status report on 2/22/19, and every 60 days thereafter. The stay shall be lifted. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 2/19/19. (Hall, Gregory) (Entered: 02/19/2019)
2019-02-19Set Deadline: Status Report due by 2/22/2019 per 50 Order. (Bozek, M.) (Entered: 02/20/2019)
2019-02-2251Joint STATUS REPORT by Council on American-Islamic Relations - Connecticut, Make the Road New York. (Ahmad, Muneer) (Entered: 02/22/2019)
2019-03-2052NOTICE of Appearance by Reena Parikh on behalf of Council on American-Islamic Relations - Connecticut, Make the Road New York (Parikh, Reena) (Entered: 03/20/2019)
2019-04-2353Joint STATUS REPORT by Council on American-Islamic Relations - Connecticut, Make the Road New York. (Parikh, Reena) (Entered: 04/23/2019)
2019-05-1654NOTICE by Council on American-Islamic Relations - Connecticut, Make the Road New York OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL BY MELISSA S. KEANEY (Keaney, Melissa) (Entered: 05/16/2019)
2019-05-2955MOTION for Melissa S. Keaney to Withdraw as Attorney by Council on American-Islamic Relations - Connecticut, Make the Road New York. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Keaney, Melissa) (Entered: 05/29/2019)
2019-05-3056ORDER granting 55 motion to withdraw as attorney for the plaintiffs. Attorney Melissa Keaney terminated. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 5/30/19. (Hall, Gregory) (Entered: 05/30/2019)
2019-06-2457Joint STATUS REPORT by Council on American-Islamic Relations - Connecticut, Make the Road New York. (Parikh, Reena) (Entered: 06/24/2019)
2019-07-0158MOTION for Leave to File Law Student Appearance of Alexandra Vaughn by Council on American-Islamic Relations - Connecticut, Make the Road New York. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - law student and supervising attorney authorization, # 2 Exhibit B - Plaintiffs' authorization, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Parikh, Reena) (Entered: 07/01/2019)
2019-07-1659MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order or Refer to Magistrate Judge for Mediation by Council on American-Islamic Relations - Connecticut, Make the Road New York.Responses due by 8/6/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Parikh, Reena) (Entered: 07/16/2019)
2019-07-1760ORDER granting 58 motion for leave to file; granting in part and denying in part 59 motion. The scheduling order is hereby amended as follows: discovery due by 8/14/19; dispositive motions due by 9/11/19; trial brief due by 10/9/19; trial ready date 11/6/19. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 7/17/19. (Hall, Gregory) (Entered: 07/17/2019)
2019-07-17Set Deadlines/Hearings: Discovery due by 8/14/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 9/11/2019. Trial Brief due by 10/9/2019. Trial Ready Date 11/6/2019. (Murphy, Tatihana) Modified on 7/22/2019 to correct discovery deadline (Bozek, M.). (Entered: 07/18/2019)
2019-07-17Set Deadline per 60 Order : Discovery due by 8/14/2019. (Bozek, M.) (Entered: 07/22/2019)
2019-08-0561Joint MOTION to Stay Schedule and for Referral to Magistrate Judge for All Matters by U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of State, US Citizenship and Immigration Services.Responses due by 8/26/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Drezner, Michael). Added MOTION to Transfer Judge on 8/9/2019 (Bozek, M.). (Entered: 08/05/2019)
2019-08-0962ORDER granting 61 joint motion to transfer the case "in its entirety, to a Magistrate Judge for final resolution." Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 8/9/2019. (Sondergeld, C.) (Entered: 08/09/2019)
2019-08-1563CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Spector. This matter has been transferred to a magistrate judge. All non-efiled submissions should be filed at the seat of court where the magistrate judge presides. The case number will remain the same, but must be followed by the magistrate judge's initials. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 8/15/2019.(Bozek, M.) (Entered: 08/15/2019)
2019-08-1664NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. A TELEPHONIC Status and Scheduling Conference is set for 8/29/2019 at 12:00 PM before Judge Robert M. Spector. Please use the following dial in for this call: (877) 873-8017, access code: 7040261. (Watson, M.) (Entered: 08/16/2019)
2019-08-1665Joint STIPULATION and [Proposed] Scheduling Order by Council on American-Islamic Relations - Connecticut, Make the Road New York. (Parikh, Reena) (Entered: 08/16/2019)
2019-08-2066ORDER: The 65 Joint Stipulation and Proposed Scheduling Order filed by Council on American-Islamic Relations - Connecticut, Make the Road New York is SO ORDERED. The scheduling of a settlement conference will be discussed during the call with the Court, scheduled for 12:00pm on August 29, 2019. Signed by Judge Robert M. Spector on 8/20/2019.(Watson, M.) (Entered: 08/20/2019)
2019-08-2067ORDER finding as moot 61 Motion to Stay in light of Doc. Nos. 62-63, 65-66. Signed by Judge Robert M. Spector on 8/20/2019. (Watson, M.) (Entered: 08/20/2019)
2019-08-2268Consent MOTION to Reschedule Status Conference by U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of State, US Citizenship and Immigration Services.Responses due by 9/12/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Drezner, Michael) (Entered: 08/22/2019)
2019-08-2369ORDER granting 68 Consent Motion to Reschedule Status Conference. The telephonic conference is rescheduled to August 30, 2019 at noon. Signed by Judge Robert M. Spector on 8/23/2019. (Watson, M.) (Entered: 08/23/2019)
2019-08-2370NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. RESET FROM 8/29/2019 at Noon At the request of counsel: Rescheduled Telephonic Status Conference is set for 8/30/2019 at 12:00 PM before Judge Robert M. Spector. Please use the following dial in for this call: (877) 873-8017, access code 7040261. (Watson, M.) (Entered: 08/23/2019)
2019-08-3071Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert M. Spector: Telephonic Status Conference held on 8/30/2019. 30 minutes (Watson, M.) (Entered: 08/30/2019)
2019-08-3072ORDER: As agreed upon by counsel during the telephonic status conference held today, counsel shall file a Joint Proposed Scheduling Order by September 6, 2019. Signed by Judge Robert M. Spector on 8/30/2019.(Watson, M.) (Entered: 08/30/2019)
2019-09-0673Joint STIPULATION and Proposed Joint Scheduling Order by U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of State, US Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Drezner, Michael) (Entered: 09/06/2019)
2019-09-0974ORDER: 73 The Joint Stipulation and Joint Scheduling Order is SO ORDERED in large part. The pretrial conference pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 is set for October 16, 2019 at 10 a.m. . Signed by Judge Robert M. Spector on 9/9/2019.(Watson, M.) (Entered: 09/09/2019)
2019-09-0975NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. A Rule 16 Conference is set for 10/16/2019 at 10:00 AM in Chambers Room 303, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Robert M. Spector. (Watson, M.) (Entered: 09/09/2019)
2019-09-1776MOTION for Esther H. Sung to Withdraw as Attorney by Council on American-Islamic Relations - Connecticut, Make the Road New York. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sung, Esther) (Entered: 09/17/2019)
2019-09-1877ORDER granting 76 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Esther Sung terminated. Signed by Judge Robert M. Spector on 9/18/2019. (Watson, M.) (Entered: 09/18/2019)
2019-10-1578Joint MOTION for Telephonic Status Conference by U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of State, US Citizenship and Immigration Services.Responses due by 11/5/2019 (Drezner, Michael) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
2019-10-1579MOTION for Attorney(s) Adam T. Bates to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5483779) by Council on American-Islamic Relations - Connecticut, Make the Road New York. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Adam T. Bates, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ahmad, Muneer) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
2019-10-1580ORDER granting 78 Motion For Telephonic Conference in lieu of appearing in person for the October 16, 2019 Conference. Counsel shall use the following conference dial in for this call: (877) 873-8017, access code: 7040261. Signed by Judge Robert M. Spector on 10/15/2019. (Watson, M.) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
2019-10-1581ORDER granting 79 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 10/15/19. (Campbell, A) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
2019-10-1682Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert M. Spector: Telephonic Status Conference held on 10/16/2019. 15 minutes (Watson, M.) (Entered: 10/16/2019)
2019-10-1683NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. A TELEPHONIC Status Conference is set for 10/28/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Robert M. Spector. Please use the following dial in for this call: (877) 873-8017, access code: 7040261. (Watson, M.) (Entered: 10/16/2019)
2019-10-1684NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Bates on behalf of Council on American-Islamic Relations - Connecticut, Make the Road New York (Bates, Adam) (Entered: 10/16/2019)
2019-10-2885Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert M. Spector: Telephonic Status Conference held on 10/28/2019. 20 minutes (Watson, M.) (Entered: 10/28/2019)
2019-10-2886NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. A Telephonic Status Conference is set for 11/6/2019 at 09:30 AM before Judge Robert M. Spector. Please use the following dial in for this call: (877) 873-8017, access code: 7040261. (Watson, M.) (Entered: 10/28/2019)
2019-11-0687Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert M. Spector: Telephonic Status Conference held on 11/6/2019. 10 minutes. As discussed on this call, the parties will file a stipulation or joint status report on November 15, 2019. (Watson, M.) (Entered: 11/06/2019)
2019-11-1588Joint STIPULATION and Proposed Order by U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of State, US Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Drezner, Michael) (Entered: 11/15/2019)
2019-11-1889ORDER: The 88 Joint Stipulation filed by U.S. Department of State, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, US Citizenship and Immigration Services is SO ORDERED. The parties shall file a stipulation or joint status report by March 31, 2020. Signed by Judge Robert M. Spector on 11/18/2019.(Watson, M.) (Entered: 11/18/2019)
2019-11-2790Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until December 6, 2019 to Propose Date for Draft Sample Vaughn Index by U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of State, US Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Drezner, Michael) (Entered: 11/27/2019)
2019-12-0291ORDER granting 90 Consented to Motion for Extension of Time until December 6, 2019. Signed by Judge Robert M. Spector on 12/2/2019. (Watson, M.) (Entered: 12/02/2019)
2020-04-0192NOTICE re 89 Order issued on November 18, 2019: On November 18, 2019, the Court issued an order directing the parties to file a stipulation or joint status report by March 31, 2020. Counsel shall file their stipulation of joint status report in compliance with this order. Signed by Judge Robert M. Spector on 4/1/2020.(Watson, M.) (Entered: 04/01/2020)
2020-04-0193Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of State, US Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Drezner, Michael) (Entered: 04/01/2020)
2020-04-0294MOTION to Stay and Extend Production Schedule by U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of State, US Citizenship and Immigration Services.Responses due by 4/23/2020 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- Declaration of Eric Stein, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Drezner, Michael) (Entered: 04/02/2020)
2020-04-0395ORDER GRANTING IN PART 94 MOTION TO STAY AND TO EXTEND PRODUCTION SCHEDULE: The production schedule is extended for one week, to April 10, 2020, with regard to Defendant U.S. Customs and Border Patrol ["CBP"] and CBP's obligation to process 1,500 pages each production period is also extended to that date. Further CBP productions will continue to occur every six weeks, with the next production occurring on or before May 22, 2020, and a temporary stay concerning the U.S. Department of State's production schedule is granted to April 30, 2020. A telephonic status conference is set for April 27, 2020 at 12:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Robert M. Spector on 4/3/2020. (Watson, M.) (Entered: 04/03/2020)
2020-04-0396NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. A TELEPHONIC Status Conference is set for 4/27/2020 at 12:00 PM before Judge Robert M. Spector. Please use the following dial in for this call: (877) 873-8017, access code: 7040261. (Watson, M.) (Entered: 04/03/2020)
2020-04-2297NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. RESET FROM April 27, 2020 at 12:00 PM Please Note the Change in Time: A Telephonic Status Conference is set for 4/27/2020 at 03:00 PM before Judge Robert M. Spector. Please use the following dial in for this call: (877) 873-8017, access code: 7040261. (Watson, M.) (Entered: 04/22/2020)
2020-04-2798Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert M. Spector: Telephonic Status Conference held on 4/27/2020. 15 minutes (Watson, M.) (Entered: 04/27/2020)
2020-04-2799ORDER re 94 MOTION to Stay: The temporary stay concerning the U.S. Department of State's production schedule is continued to May 31, 2020. A telephonic status conference is set for May 27, 2020 at 4:30 p.m. Signed by Judge Robert M. Spector on 4/27/2020.(Watson, M.) (Entered: 04/27/2020)
2020-04-27100NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. A Telephonic Status Conference is set for 5/27/2020 at 04:30 PM before Judge Robert M. Spector. Please use the following dial in for this call: (877) 873-8017, access code: 7040261. (Watson, M.) (Entered: 04/27/2020)
2020-05-21101Consent MOTION to Modify Production Order by U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of State, US Citizenship and Immigration Services.Responses due by 6/11/2020 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Drezner, Michael) (Entered: 05/21/2020)
2020-05-22102ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendant's Consent Motion to Modify Production Order 101 , it is hereby: ORDERED that the consent motion is GRANTED, and it is further ORDERED that CBP will continue to process the remaining potentially responsive pages in this matter, and produce those potentially responsive pages that have been fully processed, including completing any appropriate third party review, every six weeks. CBP is not required to process any set amount of pages per six weeks in this modified schedule, and it is further ORDERED that this schedule applies to the production date of May 22, 2020, going forward, and it is further ORDERED that CBP will keep Plaintiffs informed concerning where potentially responsive pages have been referred, and of any estimated timetables for responses, and it is further ORDERED that the parties will meet and confer on or before June 5, 2020 to discuss potential next steps with regard to CBP in this matter, and the parties will file a joint status report on or before June 19, 2020, setting forth any proposed next steps with regard to CBP in this matter. Signed by Judge Robert M. Spector on 5/22/2020. (Watson, M.) (Entered: 05/22/2020)
2020-05-27103Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert M. Spector: Telephonic Status Conference held on 5/27/2020. 10 minutes (Watson, M.) (Entered: 05/27/2020)
2020-05-27104ORDER re 94 MOTION to Stay: The temporary stay concerning the U.S. Department of State's production schedule is continued to June 30, 2020. A telephonic status conference is set for June 24, 2020 at 4:30 p.m. Signed by Judge Robert M. Spector on 5/27/2020.(Watson, M.) (Entered: 05/27/2020)
2020-05-27105NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. A Telephonic Status Conference is set for 6/24/2020 at 04:30 PM before Judge Robert M. Spector. Please use the following dial in for this call: 877-873-8017, access code: 7040261. (Watson, M.) (Entered: 05/27/2020)
2020-05-28Set Deadlines/Hearings: Status Report due by 6/19/2020. (Murphy, Tatihana) (Entered: 05/28/2020)
2020-06-18106Joint STATUS REPORT by Council on American-Islamic Relations - Connecticut, Make the Road New York. (Bates, Adam) (Entered: 06/18/2020)
2020-06-24107Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert M. Spector: Telephonic Status Conference held on 6/24/2020. 30 minutes (Watson, M.) (Entered: 06/24/2020)
2020-06-24108ORDER re 94 MOTION to Stay: The temporary stay concerning the U.S. Department of State's production schedule is continued to July 14, 2020. The Court will hold a telephonic status conference on July 20, 2020 at 4:00 p.m. to discuss the status of the State Department's production, the schedule for the referred documents in CBP's possession, and the parties' proposals regarding the Vaughn Index. Counsel shall file a joint status report in advance of this telephonic conference, not later than July 17, 2020. Signed by Judge Robert M. Spector on 6/24/2020.(Watson, M.) (Entered: 06/24/2020)
2020-07-17109Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of State, US Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Eric Stein)(Drezner, Michael) (Entered: 07/17/2020)
2020-07-20110Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert M. Spector: Telephonic Status Conference held on 7/20/2020. 25 minutes (Watson, M.) (Entered: 07/20/2020)
2020-07-20111ORDER: As discussed during the telephonic status conference held today, the parties will file their proposed Stipulation regarding the Department of State documents by July 27, 2020. A telephonic status conference is set for August 31, 2020 at 4:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Robert M. Spector on 7/20/2020.(Watson, M.) (Entered: 07/20/2020)
2020-07-20112NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. A Telephonic Status Conference is set for 8/31/2020 at 04:00 PM before Judge Robert M. Spector. Counsel shall use the following dial in for this call: 877-873-8017, access code: 7040261. (Watson, M.) (Entered: 07/20/2020)
2020-07-27113Joint STIPULATION by Council on American-Islamic Relations - Connecticut, Make the Road New York. (Bates, Adam) (Entered: 07/27/2020)
2020-07-28114ORDER: The Joint Stipulation 113 is SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Robert M. Spector on 7/28/2020.(Watson, M.) (Entered: 07/28/2020)
2020-07-31115Consent MOTION for Reena Parikh to Withdraw as Attorney by Council on American-Islamic Relations - Connecticut, Make the Road New York. (Parikh, Reena) (Entered: 07/31/2020)
2020-08-03116ORDER granting 115 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Reena Parikh terminated. Signed by Judge Robert M. Spector on 8/3/2020. (Watson, M.) (Entered: 08/03/2020)
2020-08-31117Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert M. Spector: Telephonic Status Conference held on 8/31/2020. 10 minutes (Watson, M.) (Entered: 08/31/2020)
2020-08-31118NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. A Telephonic Status Conference is set for 9/24/2020 at 04:30 PM before Judge Robert M. Spector. Please use the following dial in for this call: 877-873-8017, access code: 7040261. (Watson, M.) (Entered: 08/31/2020)
2020-08-31Set Deadlines/Hearings: Status Report due by 9/14/2020 (Watson, M.) (Entered: 08/31/2020)
2020-09-14119Joint STATUS REPORT by Council on American-Islamic Relations - Connecticut, Make the Road New York. (Bates, Adam) (Entered: 09/14/2020)
2020-09-24120Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert M. Spector: Telephonic Status Conference held on 9/24/2020. 6 minutes. (Watson, M.) (Entered: 09/24/2020)
2020-09-24121ORDER: As discussed during the telephonic conference call held today, counsel shall submit their proposed order regarding the Vaughn index by Tuesday, September 29, 2020. A telephonic status conference will be held on October 23, 2020 at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Robert M. Spector on 9/24/2020.(Watson, M.) (Entered: 09/24/2020)
2020-09-24122NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. A Telephonic Status Conference is set for 10/23/2020 at 09:30 AM before Judge Robert M. Spector. Please use the following dial-in for this call: 877-873-8017, access code: 7040261. (Watson, M.) (Entered: 09/24/2020)
2020-09-29123STIPULATION and Proposed Order by U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of State, US Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Drezner, Michael) (Entered: 09/29/2020)
2020-09-30124ORDER re 123 : The attached Stipulation and Order regarding the production of the draft Vaughn index is SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Robert M. Spector on 9/30/2020.(Watson, M.) (Entered: 09/30/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar