Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01261
Date Filed2017-06-27
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted two FOIA requests. The first FOIA request was for records concerning Administrator Scott Pruitt's appointment calendars. The second FOIA request was for records concerning contacts with investor Carl Icahn and/or Valero Energy. The agency acknowledged receipt of both requests. It asked American Oversight for clarification of its request pertaining to Icahn. American Oversight provided clarification and the agency agreed to begin processing the request. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency, American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-06-271COMPLAINT against U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5008822) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons)(Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 06/27/2017)
2017-06-272LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 06/27/2017)
2017-06-27Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (sth) (Entered: 06/27/2017)
2017-06-273SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(sth) (Entered: 06/27/2017)
2017-07-204NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth France on behalf of AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (France, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/20/2017)
2017-07-205RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/3/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/2/2017.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY served on 7/3/2017, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 7/3/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(France, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/20/2017)
2017-08-026ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY.(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 08/02/2017)
2017-08-17MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by August 31, 2017. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 8/17/2017. (lccrc1) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
2017-08-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Brief due by 8/31/2017. (nbn) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
2017-08-317Joint STATUS REPORT AND PROPOSED SCHEDULE by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (France, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/31/2017)
2017-09-06MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 7 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall confer and submit a joint status report and proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by October 2, 2017. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 9/6/2017. (lccrc1) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
2017-09-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule and Status Report due by 10/2/2017 (lsj) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
2017-10-028Joint STATUS REPORT AND PROPOSED SCHEDULE by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (France, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/02/2017)
2017-10-279NOTICE of Appearance by Sara Kaiser Creighton on behalf of AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 10/27/2017)
2017-12-1410Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 12/14/2017)
2017-12-18MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 10 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report by February 23, 2018. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 12/18/2017. (lccrc1) (Entered: 12/18/2017)
2017-12-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/23/2018 (lsj) (Entered: 12/18/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff