Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleRUDISILL v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01264
Date Filed2017-06-23
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ketanji Brown Jackson
PlaintiffMICAH RUDISILL
Case DescriptionMicah Rudisill submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco and Firearms for records concerning the agency's involvement in United States v. Harrell. He provided a Privacy Act waiver signed by Harrell. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Rudisill filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Recovery of Costs

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantBUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS, AND EXPLOSIVES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-06-231COMPLAINT against BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS, AND EXPLOSIVES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616085709) filed by MICAH RUDISILL. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jf) (Entered: 06/28/2017)
2017-06-23SUMMONS (4) Issued as to BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS, AND EXPLOSIVES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jf) (Entered: 06/28/2017)
2017-06-282GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Courts instructions for briefing motions and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 6/28/2017. (lckbj1) (Entered: 06/28/2017)
2017-08-013NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Leeson Sroka on behalf of BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS, AND EXPLOSIVES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 08/01/2017)
2017-08-074MOTION for CM/ECF Password by MICAH RUDISILL (jf) (Entered: 08/09/2017)
2017-08-09MINUTE ORDER granting 4 Motion for CM/ECF Password. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 08/09/2017. (lckbj1) (Entered: 08/09/2017)
2017-08-175Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS, AND EXPLOSIVES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
2017-08-17MINUTE ORDER granting, for good cause shown, 5 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before 10/23/2017. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 08/17/2017. (lckbj1) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
2017-10-236MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS, AND EXPLOSIVES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 10/23/2017)
2017-11-067MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment by BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS, AND EXPLOSIVES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss or, In the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Declaration of Peter Chisholm)(Sroka, Scott). Added MOTION for Summary Judgment on 11/7/2017 (znmw). (Entered: 11/06/2017)
2017-11-078RESPONSE re 7 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment MOTION for Summary Judgment Consent to Dismissal filed by MICAH RUDISILL. (RUDISILL, MICAH) (Entered: 11/07/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff