Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY v. UNITED STATES FOREST SERVICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01277
Date Filed2017-06-29
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffPUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY
Case DescriptionPublic Employees for Environmental Responsibility submitted a FOIA request to the U.S. Forest Service for records concerning a news release issued by the agency after it issued a report on timber sales in the Tongass National Forest as well as how the agency addressed various issues identified in the report. After hearing nothing further from the agency, PEER filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE
DefendantUNITED STATES FOREST SERVICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-06-291COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES FOREST SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5012048) filed by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Attachments: # 1 Corporate Disclosure, # 2 Summons Attorney General, # 3 Summons US Attorney's Office, # 4 Summons US Forest Service, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dinerstein, Paula) (Entered: 06/29/2017)
2017-06-292LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (md) (Entered: 06/29/2017)
2017-06-29Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (md) (Entered: 06/29/2017)
2017-06-293SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES FOREST SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (md) (Entered: 06/29/2017)
2017-08-024NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Todd Cohen on behalf of UNITED STATES FOREST SERVICE (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 08/02/2017)
2017-08-045Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Cover Sheet,, Complaint, by UNITED STATES FOREST SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 08/04/2017)
2017-08-04MINUTE ORDER GRANTING Consent 5 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The Court ORDERS that Defendant shall respond to the Complaint on or before September 5, 2017. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 8/4/17. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 08/04/2017)
2017-08-04Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 9/5/2017. (znbn) (Entered: 08/04/2017)
2017-08-076RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/5/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/4/2017. (Dinerstein, Paula) (Entered: 08/07/2017)
2017-08-077RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES FOREST SERVICE served on 7/3/2017, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 7/5/2017. (See Docket Entry 6 to view document). (znmw) (Entered: 08/08/2017)
2017-09-058ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE.(Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 09/05/2017)
2017-09-05MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a joint proposed briefing schedule by September 19, 2017. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 9/5/2017. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 09/05/2017)
2017-09-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Brief due by 9/19/2017. (nbn) (Entered: 09/05/2017)
2017-09-119Joint STATUS REPORT by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Dinerstein, Paula) (Entered: 09/11/2017)
2017-09-12MINUTE ORDER: Per the parties' 9 Joint Status Report, the Court ORDERS that the parties shall submit a further joint status report on or before October 16, 2017. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 9/12/2017. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 09/12/2017)
2017-09-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/16/2017. (nbn) (Entered: 09/12/2017)
2017-10-1310Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE. (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 10/13/2017)
2017-10-16MINUTE ORDER: Per the parties' 10 Joint Status Report, the Court ORDERS that the parties shall file a further Joint Status Report and proposed schedule on or before November 1, 2017. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 10/16/2017.(lcjeb2) (Entered: 10/16/2017)
2017-10-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 11/1/2017. Joint Status Report due by 11/1/2017. (nbn) (Entered: 10/16/2017)
2017-11-1711MINUTE ORDER: As the parties have failed to timely file their status report, the Court ORDERS that they shall do so by November 21, 2017. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 11/17/2017. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 11/17/2017)
2017-11-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 11/21/2017 (lsj) (Entered: 11/17/2017)
2017-11-1712Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE. (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 11/17/2017)
2017-11-20MINUTE ORDER: Per the parties' 12 Joint Status Report, the Court ORDERS that the parties shall file a further Joint Status Report and proposed schedule on or before December 1, 2017. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 11/20/2017. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 11/20/2017)
2017-11-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/1/2017. (nbn) (Entered: 11/20/2017)
2017-12-21MINUTE ORDER: As the parties have missed their deadline to file a Joint Status Report, the Court ORDERS that such Report shall be filed by December 27, 2017. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 12/21/2017. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 12/21/2017)
2017-12-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/27/2017. (nbn) (Entered: 12/22/2017)
2017-12-2213Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE. (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 12/22/2017)
2018-01-02MINUTE ORDER: Per the parties' 13 Joint Status Report, the Court ORDERS that the parties shall file a further Joint Status Report on or before February 2, 2018. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/02/2018. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 01/02/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff