Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJAMES MADISON PROJECT et al v. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01281
Date Filed2017-06-29
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffJAMES MADISON PROJECT
PlaintiffNOAH SHACHTMAN
PlaintiffBETSY WOODRUFF
Case DescriptionThe James Madison Project and Daily Beast reporters Noah Shachtman and Betsy Woodruff submitted FOIA requests to U.S. Customs and Border Protection, the Transportation Safety Administration, and U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services for records concerning instructions for implementing the recently reinstated travel ban. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agencies, the James Madison Project, Shachtman, and Woodruff filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-06-291COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5012498) filed by THE JAMES MADISON PROJECT, BETSY WOODRUFF, NOAH SHACHTMAN. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit Rule 7.1 certification, # 3 Summons DHS, # 4 Summons USADC, # 5 Summons USAG)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 06/29/2017)
2017-06-29Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (sth) (Entered: 06/29/2017)
2017-06-292SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(sth) (Entered: 06/29/2017)
2017-08-083NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Leon Drezner on behalf of All Defendants (Drezner, Michael) (Entered: 08/08/2017)
2017-08-084Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Drezner, Michael) (Entered: 08/08/2017)
2017-08-09MINUTE ORDER GRANTING 4 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The Court ORDERS that Defendant shall file any Answer/Response to the Complaint on or before August 23, 2017. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 8/9/2017. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 08/09/2017)
2017-08-09Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 8/23/2017. (nbn) (Entered: 08/10/2017)
2017-08-235ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY.(Drezner, Michael) (Entered: 08/23/2017)
2017-08-24MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a joint proposed briefing schedule by September 7, 2017. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 8/24/2017. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 08/24/2017)
2017-08-24Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 9/7/2017 (lsj) (Entered: 08/24/2017)
2017-09-076Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Drezner, Michael) (Entered: 09/07/2017)
2017-09-07MINUTE ORDER: Per the parties' 6 Joint Status Report, the Court ORDERS that the parties shall submit a joint status report on or before October 7, 2017, updating the Court as to the status of the case, and shall submit a subsequent joint status report on or before November 6, 2017. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 9/7/2017. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 09/07/2017)
2017-10-107Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Drezner, Michael) (Entered: 10/10/2017)
2017-10-11MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to the parties' 7 Joint Status Report, the Court ORDERS that: 1) Defendant shall provide its first production on or before November 6, 2017; 2) Defendant shall provide its second production on or before December 7, 2017, if needed; 3) the parties shall file a Joint Status Report on or before November 6, 2017; and 4) the parties shall file additional Joint Status Reports every 60 days thereafter. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 10/11/2017. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 10/11/2017)
2017-10-11Set/Reset Deadlines: First production due by 11/6/2017. Second production due by 12/7/2017. Joint Status Report due by 11/6/2017. (nbn) (Entered: 10/11/2017)
2017-11-068Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Drezner, Michael) (Entered: 11/06/2017)
2018-01-059Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Drezner, Michael) (Entered: 01/05/2018)
2018-01-05MINUTE ORDER: Per the parties' 9 Joint Status Report, the Court ORDERS that they shall file a further Joint Status Report on or before February 2, 2018. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/5/2018. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 01/05/2018)
2018-01-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/2/2018. (nbn) (Entered: 01/05/2018)
2018-02-0110Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Drezner, Michael) (Entered: 02/01/2018)
2018-02-01MINUTE ORDER: Per the parties' suggestion, the Court ORDERS that they shall file a further Joint Status Report on or before April 13, 2018. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 2/1/2018. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 02/01/2018)
2018-02-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/13/2018 (lsj) (Entered: 02/02/2018)
2018-04-1311Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Drezner, Michael) (Entered: 04/13/2018)
2018-04-13MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, the Court ORDERS that: 1) Defendant shall file its Motion for Summary Judgment on or before June 15, 2018; 2) Plaintiffs shall file their Response on or before July 16, 2018; and 3) Defendant shall file its Reply on or before August 17, 2018. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 4/13/2018. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 04/13/2018)
2018-04-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motions due by 6/15/2018. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 7/16/2018. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 8/17/2018. (znbn) (Entered: 04/13/2018)
2018-06-1512MOTION for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Viker Declaration, # 4 Viker Decl. Exhibit 1, # 5 Viker Decl. Exhibit 2, # 6 Viker Decl. Exhibit 3, # 7 Howard Declaration, # 8 Howard Decl. Ex. 1, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Drezner, Michael) (Entered: 06/15/2018)
2018-07-1613Memorandum in opposition to re 12 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by JAMES MADISON PROJECT, NOAH SHACHTMAN, BETSY WOODRUFF. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Moss Declaration, # 2 Statement of Facts Response, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 07/16/2018)
2018-08-1714REPLY to opposition to motion re 12 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Drezner, Michael) (Entered: 08/17/2018)
2018-10-01MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that a conference call in Chambers is hereby set for Wednesday, October 3, 2018, at 9:30 a.m. to discuss the status of the narrowed dispute. The Court ORDERS that the parties shall dial into Chambers' toll-free conference-call number, (877) 402-9753, at this time (in Chambers). Chambers will contact the parties via email with the dial-in code. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 10/1/2018. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 10/01/2018)
2018-10-01Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 10/3/2018 at 09:30 AM in Chambers before Judge James E. Boasberg. (znbn) (Entered: 10/01/2018)
2018-10-0515Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Drezner, Michael) (Entered: 10/05/2018)
2018-10-05MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 15 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a proposed production schedule on or before October 19, 2018. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 10/5/2018. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 10/05/2018)
2018-10-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Production Schedule due by 10/19/2018 (lsj) (Entered: 10/05/2018)
2018-10-1916Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Drezner, Michael) (Entered: 10/19/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar