Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01282
Date Filed2017-06-29
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the U.S. Army Corps of Engineers for records concerning communications between the Corps and various environmental advocacy groups pertaining to the Dakota Access Pipeline or the Standing Rock Sioux Reservation. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-06-291COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5012607) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons DoD)(Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 06/29/2017)
2017-06-292LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 06/29/2017)
2017-06-29Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (sth) (Entered: 06/29/2017)
2017-06-293SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(sth) (Entered: 06/29/2017)
2017-07-114RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/10/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/9/2017.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE served on 7/10/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 07/11/2017)
2017-07-135NOTICE of Appearance by Shanna Laura Cronin on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE (Cronin, Shanna) (Entered: 07/13/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff