Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01293
Date Filed2017-06-30
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffDEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION
Case DescriptionThe Democracy Forward Foundation submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Transportation for records concerning the use of encrypted and ephemeral social media applications by the agency to avoid creating and retaining public records. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the Democracy Forward Foundation filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Adequacy - Search, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-06-301COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5014537) filed by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Civil Summons, # 3 Exhibit Corporate Disclosure)(Guzman, Javier) (Entered: 06/30/2017)
2017-06-302NOTICE Substitution of Summons by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION (Guzman, Javier) (Entered: 06/30/2017)
2017-06-303LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION (md) (Main Document 3 replaced on 7/5/2017) (ztd). (Entered: 06/30/2017)
2017-06-30Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (md) (Entered: 06/30/2017)
2017-07-034NOTICE Summons by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION (Guzman, Javier) (Entered: 07/03/2017)
2017-07-035NOTICE Summons by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION (Guzman, Javier) (Entered: 07/03/2017)
2017-07-036SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Form)(zsb) (Entered: 07/03/2017)
2017-07-03SUMMONS Not Issued as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION.....INCORRECT SUMMONS FILED AT THE TIME COMPLAINT WAS FILED.(zsb) (Entered: 07/03/2017)
2017-07-057STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 7/5/2017. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 07/05/2017)
2017-07-068MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Karianne M. Jones, :Firm- Democracy Forward Foundation, :Address- P.O. Box 34553, Washington, D.C. 20043. Phone No. - (202) 448-9090. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5020763. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Guzman, Javier) (Entered: 07/06/2017)
2017-07-069SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION. (td) (Entered: 07/06/2017)
2017-07-06MINUTE ORDER: To the extent Karianne M. Jones merely seeks leave to have her name appear on a brief signed by a member of the bar of this Court or to be heard in open court, that motion, Dkt. 8 , is GRANTED. To the extent Ms. Jones seeks leave to sign filings or otherwise to participate in this matter, she is referred to Local Civil Rule 83.2, which states that "[a]n attorney who engages in the practice of law from an office located in the District of Columbia must be a member of the District of Columbia Bar and the Bar of this Court to file papers in this Court." Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 7/6/2017. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 07/06/2017)
2017-07-1110NOTICE of Appearance by Karianne M. Jones on behalf of Plaintiff by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION (Guzman, Javier) (Main Document 10 replaced on 7/12/2017) (znmw). (Entered: 07/11/2017)
2017-07-1411RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION served on 7/13/2017, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 07/10/2017., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/10/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/9/2017.) (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Guzman, Javier) (Entered: 07/14/2017)
2017-08-0712NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Todd Cohen on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 08/07/2017)
2017-08-0813Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 08/08/2017)
2017-08-08MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 13 , the motion is hereby GRANTED. Defendant is hereby ORDERED to respond to Plaintiff's complaint on or before September 8, 2017. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 8/8/2017. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 08/08/2017)
2017-08-09Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to complaint due by 9/8/2017. (kt) (Entered: 08/09/2017)
2017-09-0814ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION.(Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 09/08/2017)
2017-09-08MINUTE ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to appear for a status conference on September 13, 2017, at 10:15 a.m. in Courtroom 21. The parties are further ORDERED to meet and confer prior to the status conference to discuss scheduling for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 9/8/2017. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 09/08/2017)
2017-09-08Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 9/13/2017 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 21 before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (dot) (Entered: 09/11/2017)
2017-09-13Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Status Conference held on 9/13/2017. A further Status Conference is set for 10/25/2017, at 10:15 AM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (Court Reporter: Jeff Hook.) (kt) (Entered: 09/13/2017)
2017-10-25Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Status Conference held on 10/25/2017. A further Status Conference is set for 11/28/2017, at 10:15 AM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (Court Reporter: Jeff Hook.) (kt) (Entered: 10/25/2017)
2017-11-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/11/2018. (kt) (Entered: 11/28/2017)
2017-11-28Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Status Conference held on 11/28/2017. Joint Status Report due by 1/19/2018. (Court Reporter: Jeff Hook.) (kt) (Entered: 11/28/2017)
2018-01-1915Joint STATUS REPORT by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Guzman, Javier) (Entered: 01/19/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff