Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01297
Date Filed2017-06-30
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Trevor N. McFadden
PlaintiffDEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION
Case DescriptionThe Democracy Forward Foundation submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Transportation for records concerning attachments and other documents sent to several informal advisors of the Trump administration. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the Democracy Forward Foundation filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-06-301COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5014640) filed by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit Corporate Disclosure, # 3 Summons)(Guzman, Javier) (Entered: 06/30/2017)
2017-06-302LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION. (md) (Entered: 06/30/2017)
2017-07-03Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (md) (Entered: 07/03/2017)
2017-07-033SUMMONS Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (md) (Entered: 07/03/2017)
2017-07-03SUMMONS Not Issued as to non-party U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General. (FOIA SUUMONS WERE NOT SUBMITTED AT THE TIME COMPLAINT WAS FILED) (md) (Entered: 07/03/2017)
2017-07-034REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION.(Guzman, Javier) (Entered: 07/03/2017)
2017-07-035REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION.(Guzman, Javier) (Entered: 07/03/2017)
2017-07-056SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (znmw) (Entered: 07/05/2017)
2017-07-067MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Karianne Jones, :Firm- Democracy Forward Foundation, :Address- P.O. Box 34553, Washington, D.C. 20043. Phone No. - (202) 448-9090. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration)(Guzman, Javier) (Entered: 07/06/2017)
2017-07-108ORDER. Upon 7 the motion of Javier M. Guzman, a member in good standing of this Court, to admit Karianne M. Jones pro hac vice, and being fully advised in the premises, it is hereby, ORDERED, that such motion is GRANTED, and it is further, ORDERED, that Karianne M. Jones is admitted to the bar of this Court pro hac vice as counsel and representative of Democracy Forward Foundation in this case. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 7/7/2017. (jth) (Entered: 07/10/2017)
2017-07-149RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION served on 7/13/2017, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 7/10/2017., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/10/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/9/2017.) (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Guzman, Javier) (Entered: 07/14/2017)
2017-08-0410NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy S. Simon on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 08/04/2017)
2017-08-0811Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 08/08/2017)
2017-08-1412ORDER granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. Answer due by 9/7/2017. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 8/9/17. (lsj) (Entered: 08/14/2017)
2017-09-0713ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION.(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/07/2017)
2017-11-02Case directly reassigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. Judge Royce C. Lamberth is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) (Entered: 11/02/2017)
2017-11-22MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are Plaintiff's Complaint and Defendant's Answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall MEET AND CONFER and file a Joint Status Report proposing a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule should address, among other things, the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, and a briefing schedule for dispositive motions, if required. The parties shall file the schedule no later than December 22, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 11/22/2017. (lctnm3) (Entered: 11/22/2017)
2017-11-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/22/2017. (hmc) (Entered: 11/22/2017)
2017-12-2114Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 12/21/2017)
2017-12-21MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 14 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer in an effort to resolve the matter without further litigation. If dispositive motions briefing is necessary, the Defendant's motion for summary judgment shall be due on or before January 31, 2018; Plaintiff's cross-motion and opposition to Defendant's motion for summary judgment shall be due on or before March 2, 2018; Defendant's reply and opposition to Plaintiff's cross-motion shall be due on or before March 28, 2018; and Plaintiff's reply shall be due on or before April 25, 2018. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 12/21/2017. (lctnm3) (Entered: 12/21/2017)
2017-12-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment due by 1/31/2018. Plaintiff's opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and Cross-Motion due by 3/2/2018. Defendant's reply in support of its Motion for Summary Judgment and opposition to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion due by 3/28/2018. Plaintiff's reply in support of its Cross-Motion due by 4/25/2018. (hmc) (Entered: 12/22/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff