Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01326
Date Filed2017-07-05
Date Closed2017-11-06
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffFEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM ("FAIR")
Case DescriptionThe Federation for American Immigration Reform submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Defense for records concerning communications with the Southern Poverty Law Center and/or the Anti-Defamation League pertaining to hate crimes. FAIR also requested records pertaining to agency policies on how to deal with hate crimes. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, FAIR filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-07-051COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5018856) filed by FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM ("FAIR"). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 LCvR 7.1 Certificate, # 3 Summons for US Attorney General, # 4 Summons for U.S. Department of Defense, # 5 Summons for US Attorney)(Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 07/05/2017)
2017-07-052LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM ("FAIR") (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 07/05/2017)
2017-07-05Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (md) (Entered: 07/06/2017)
2017-07-063SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (md) (Entered: 07/06/2017)
2017-07-184RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 07/14/2017. (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 07/18/2017)
2017-07-185RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/14/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/13/2017. (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 07/18/2017)
2017-07-186RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE served on 7/13/2017 (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 07/18/2017)
2017-08-037NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Field on behalf of All Defendants (Field, Brian) (Entered: 08/03/2017)
2017-08-038Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Field, Brian) (Entered: 08/03/2017)
2017-08-03MINUTE ORDER granting defendant's 8 consent motion for an extension of time. Defendant shall file a responsive pleading by September 13, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/3/2017.(lcabj3) (Entered: 08/03/2017)
2017-08-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's responsive pleading due by 9/13/2017. (tg) (Entered: 08/03/2017)
2017-09-139ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE.(Field, Brian) (Entered: 09/13/2017)
2017-09-13MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of Local Civil Rule 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure appear to be inapplicable. Defendant shall file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of its production of documents to plaintiff, on or before October 11, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/13/2017. (lcabj3) (Entered: 09/13/2017)
2017-10-1110Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 10/11/2017)
2017-10-12MINUTE ORDER. The parties are ORDERED to file a joint status report by November 13, 2017, which should include a proposed schedule for further proceedings if necessary. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/12/2017. (lcabj3) (Entered: 10/12/2017)
2017-11-0611STIPULATION of Dismissal and Notice of Settlement by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 11/06/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff