Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJAMES MADISON PROJECT et al v. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01328
Date Filed2017-07-05
Date Closed2018-06-08
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffJAMES MADISON PROJECT
PlaintiffSHANE HARRIS
Case DescriptionThe James Madison Project and reporter Shane Harris submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Justice for records concerning discussions of firing or terminating former FBI Director James Comey. The James Madison Project and Harris also requested expedited processing. The agency acknowledged the requests and granted expedited processing. The agency also invoked unusual circumstances and told the James Madison Project and Harris that it would take more time to respond to their request. The James Madison Project and Harris then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-07-051COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5019456) filed by THE JAMES MADISON PROJECT, SHANE HARRIS. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit Rule 7.1 certification, # 3 Summons DOJ, # 4 Summons USADC, # 5 Summons USAG)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 07/05/2017)
2017-07-05Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (sth) (Entered: 07/06/2017)
2017-07-062SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(sth) (Entered: 07/06/2017)
2017-07-183STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 7/18/2017.(Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (lcegs1) (Entered: 07/18/2017)
2017-07-244RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/10/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/9/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit (certified mail receipt))(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 07/24/2017)
2017-08-095ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Bitran, Eva) (Entered: 08/09/2017)
2017-08-10MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiffs bring this action pursuant to the Freedom of Information Act (FOIA), 5 U.S.C. § 552. The parties are directed to meet and confer and propose a joint scheduling order for further proceedings in this case by no later than August 31, 2017. The parties' joint proposed scheduling order shall address the following: (1) the status of plaintiffs' FOIA request; (2) the anticipated number of documents responsive to plaintiffs' FOIA request; (3) the anticipated date(s) for release of documents responsive to plaintiffs' FOIA request; (4) whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case; (5) whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case; (6) whether this case would benefit from referral to a Magistrate Judge or the District Court Mediation Program for purposes of settlement; and (7) a proposed briefing schedule for dispositive motions, if applicable. If the parties are unable to agree on a joint recommendation, the joint proposed scheduling order shall include each partys individual recommendations. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 08/10/2017. (lcegs3) (Entered: 08/10/2017)
2017-08-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Scheduling Order due by 8/31/2017. (mac) (Entered: 08/10/2017)
2017-08-176NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Danielle Wolfson Young on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE Substituting for attorney Eva Bitran (Young, Danielle) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
2017-08-237NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Edward Bensing on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Bensing, Daniel) (Entered: 08/23/2017)
2017-08-318Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Proposed Scheduling Order by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bensing, Daniel) (Entered: 08/31/2017)
2017-08-31MINUTE ORDER granting 8 defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time to file joint proposed scheduling order. The parties shall file their Joint Proposed Scheduling Order by September 21, 2017. Parties are reminded to move for extensions of time at least three business days prior to the scheduled deadline. See 3 Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 8/31/2017. (lcegs3) (Entered: 08/31/2017)
2017-09-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Scheduling Order due by 9/21/2017. (mac) (Entered: 09/01/2017)
2017-09-219NOTICE of Proposed Order (Scheduling Order) by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE re Order,,,, Set/Reset Deadlines (Bensing, Daniel) (Entered: 09/21/2017)
2017-09-22MINUTE ORDER. In light of 9 joint proposed scheduling order advising the Court that the government needs more time to review the request, the Court directs the parties to submit an updated joint scheduling order within fourteen days after defendant provides a response to plaintiff's request. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 9/22/2017. (lcegs3) (Entered: 09/22/2017)
2017-12-08MINUTE ORDER ordering the parties to file a joint status report updating the Court as to the status of the government's production to the plaintiff by January 5, 2018. The parties are further ordered to file monthly joint status reports updating the Court as to the status of the case by the 5th of every month until it is appropriate to enter a briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 12/8/2017. (lcegs3) (Entered: 12/08/2017)
2017-12-08Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/5/2018. (mac) (Entered: 12/08/2017)
2018-01-0410PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER Joint Proposed Scheduling by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Bensing, Daniel) Modified event title on 1/5/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 01/04/2018)
2018-01-04MINUTE ORDER in view of 10 joint proposed scheduling order, it is hereby ordered that the parties shall adhere to the following briefing schedule. Defendant shall file a motion for summary judgment by February 15, 2018. Plaintiffs shall file an opposition to defendant's motion by March 8, 2018. Defendant shall file its reply in support of summary judgment by March 22, 2018. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 1/4/2018. (lcegs3) (Entered: 01/04/2018)
2018-01-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant Motion For Summary Judgment due by 2/15/2018. Plaintiff Opposition To Defendant's Motion due by 3/8/2018. Defendant Reply In Support Of Summary Judgment due by 3/22/2018. (mac) (Entered: 01/05/2018)
2018-02-1511MOTION for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Affidavit, # 4 Exhibit)(Bensing, Daniel) (Entered: 02/15/2018)
2018-03-0512Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by SHANE HARRIS, JAMES MADISON PROJECT (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 03/05/2018)
2018-03-07MINUTE ORDER granting 12 plaintiffs' unopposed motion for extension of time to file response to defendant's motion for summary judgment. Plaintiffs shall therefore file their opposition by March 15, 2018. by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 3/7/2018. (lcegs3) (Entered: 03/07/2018)
2018-03-07Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff Opposition due by 3/15/2018. (mac) (Entered: 03/07/2018)
2018-03-1513NOTICE of Concession by SHANE HARRIS, JAMES MADISON PROJECT (Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 03/15/2018)
2018-03-20MINUTE ORDER in view of 13 plaintiffs' notice of concession, in which plaintiffs state that they "concede" to defendant's motion for summary judgment, 11 defendant's motion for summary judgment is hereby GRANTED. The parties are directed to file a joint status report with recommendations for further proceedings by April 23, 2018. The case is hereby STAYED pending the parties' recommendations. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 3/20/2018. (lcegs3) (Entered: 03/20/2018)
2018-04-2314Joint STATUS REPORT by SHANE HARRIS, JAMES MADISON PROJECT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 04/23/2018)
2018-04-26MINUTE ORDER in view of 14 joint status report, the parties are directed to file a notice of dismissal or, alternatively, a joint status report by no later than May 14, 2018. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 4/26/2018. (lcegs3) (Entered: 04/26/2018)
2018-04-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/14/2018. (mac) (Entered: 04/27/2018)
2018-05-1415Joint STATUS REPORT by SHANE HARRIS, JAMES MADISON PROJECT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 05/14/2018)
2018-05-16MINUTE ORDER in view of 15 joint status report, the parties are directed to file a notice of dismissal or, alternatively, a joint status report by no later than June 4, 2018. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 5/16/2018. (lcegs3) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
2018-05-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Notice Of Dismissal Or Joint Status Report due by 6/4/2018. (mac) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
2018-06-0716STIPULATION of Dismissal by SHANE HARRIS, JAMES MADISON PROJECT. (Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 06/07/2018)
2018-06-08MINUTE ORDER in light of 16 plaintiffs' stipulation of dismissal, this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 6/8/2018. (lcegs3) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar