Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON v. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01336
Date Filed2017-07-06
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ketanji Brown Jackson
PlaintiffCITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON
Case DescriptionCitizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington submitted two FOIA requests to the General Services Administration. The first FOIA request concerned records of communications to or from Acting GSA Administrator Tim Horne, as well as communications to or from former GSA Administrator Norman Dong from Jan. 20 to Jan. 24. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but told CREW that the request was too broad. CREW disagreed, but narrowed the scope of the request slightly. The agency told CREW it was processing several hundred emails. The second request concerned records related to Trump Old Post Office LLC, the company operating the Trump International Hotel. In response to CREW's request for a fee waiver, the agency told CREW that no charges would be incurred. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency pertaining to either request, CREW filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantGENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-07-061COMPLAINT against GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5020924) filed by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons General Services Administration, # 3 Summons Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Attorney)(Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 07/06/2017)
2017-07-062LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON (Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 07/06/2017)
2017-07-06Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (md) (Entered: 07/07/2017)
2017-07-073SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (md) (Entered: 07/07/2017)
2017-07-134GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Courts instructions for briefing motions and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 7/13/2017. (lckbj1) (Entered: 07/13/2017)
2017-07-135RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON served on 7/10/2017 (Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 07/13/2017)
2017-07-136RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 07/13/2017. (Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 07/13/2017)
2017-07-137RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/11/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/10/2017. (Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 07/13/2017)
2017-07-178NOTICE of Appearance by Johnny Hillary Walker, III on behalf of GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 07/17/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff