Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLAF et al v. Department of Veterans Affairs
DistrictNorthern District of Illinois
CityChicago
Case Number1:2017cv05035
Date Filed2017-07-06
Date Closed2017-10-11
JudgeHonorable Ruben Castillo
PlaintiffLAF
PlaintiffRebecca Moss
Case DescriptionRebecca Moss, a veteran, and LAF, an advocacy organization providing legal services for people living in poverty, submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Veterans Affairs for records concerning Moss's claims file. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Moss and LAF filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDepartment of Veterans Affairs
810 Vermont Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20420
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-07-071COMPLAINT filed by LAF, Rebecca Moss; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-13349997. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(Socha, Kathryn) (Entered: 07/07/2017)
2017-07-072DECLARATION of LAF Corporate Disclosure Statement (Socha, Kathryn) (Entered: 07/07/2017)
2017-07-07CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Ruben Castillo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. (meg, ) (Entered: 07/10/2017)
2017-07-073NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes the MIDP Standing Order. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (mma, ) (Entered: 07/10/2017)
2017-07-134CIVIL Cover Sheet (Socha, Kathryn) (Entered: 07/13/2017)
2017-07-135Attorney Appearance Form by LAF, Rebecca Moss (Socha, Kathryn) (Entered: 07/13/2017)
2017-07-27SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Department of Veterans Affairs (pg, ) (Entered: 07/27/2017)
2017-08-10SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Department of Veterans Affairs (pg, ) (Entered: 08/10/2017)
2017-08-286CERTIFICATE of Service by Kathryn Alexis Socha on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Socha, Kathryn) (Entered: 08/28/2017)
2017-09-147DESIGNATION of Susan Willoughby Anderson as U.S. Attorney for Defendant Department of Veterans Affairs (Anderson, Susan) (Entered: 09/14/2017)
2017-09-148MOTION by Defendant Department of Veterans Affairs for extension of time VA's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint (Anderson, Susan) (Entered: 09/14/2017)
2017-09-149NOTICE of Motion by Susan Willoughby Anderson for presentment of extension of time 8 before Honorable Ruben Castillo on 9/19/2017 at 09:45 AM. (Anderson, Susan) (Entered: 09/14/2017)
2017-09-1410MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ruben Castillo:Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time to respond to the complaint 8 is granted. Defendant to answer or otherwise plead to the complaint by 9/29/2017. The parties are directed to file a joint status report by 10/5/2017. The Court will hold a status hearing in open court on 10/11/2017 at 9:45 a.m. The motion hearing set for 9/19/2017 is stricken.Mailed notice (rao, ) (Entered: 09/14/2017)
2017-09-2911MOTION by Defendant Department of Veterans Affairs to dismiss (Anderson, Susan) (Entered: 09/29/2017)
2017-09-2912NOTICE of Motion by Susan Willoughby Anderson for presentment of motion to dismiss 11 before Honorable Ruben Castillo on 10/11/2017 at 09:45 AM. (Anderson, Susan) (Entered: 09/29/2017)
2017-09-2913MEMORANDUM by Department of Veterans Affairs in support of motion to dismiss 11 (Attachments: # 1 Ivy Affidavit)(Anderson, Susan) (Entered: 09/29/2017)
2017-10-0314ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs LAF, Rebecca Moss by Catherine Schur (Schur, Catherine) (Entered: 10/03/2017)
2017-10-0415STATUS Report by LAF, Rebecca Moss (Socha, Kathryn) (Entered: 10/04/2017)
2017-10-1116MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ruben Castillo: Status hearing held. Motion hearing held. Defendant's motion to dismiss 11 is granted. This case is dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiffs are given leave to file an amended complaint by 11/13/2017. Defendant shall answer, move, or otherwise respond to the amended complaint by 12/4/2017. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (ntf, ) (Entered: 10/11/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff