Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBhalla v. Kelly et al
DistrictWestern District of Michigan
CitySouthern Division
Case Number1:2017cv00610
Date Filed2017-07-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Robert J. Jonker
PlaintiffLinda Bhalla
Case DescriptionLinda Bhalia, a naturalized U.S. citizen, filed a petition for alien finance with the Department of Homeland Security, which was denied. She then filed a petition for immediate alien relative, which was still pending. After the agency failed to act on her petition, Bhalia filed suit. This is not a FOIA suit.
Complaint issues: FOIA not mentioned

DefendantJohn F. Kelly
DefendantJohn F. Kelly Secretary of Department of Homeland Security
DefendantJames McCament United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
DefendantJames McCament
DefendantAndrew McCabe Federal Bureau of Investigations
DefendantAndrew McCabe
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-07-071COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Linda Bhalla (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10A, # 11 Exhibit 10B, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13) (Alvarez, Robert) (Entered: 07/07/2017)
2017-07-072APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (Alvarez, Robert) (Entered: 07/07/2017)
2017-07-07COMPLAINT RECEIVED; IFP Decision Pending (ns) (Entered: 07/11/2017)
2017-07-113NOTICE that this case has been assigned Robert J. Jonker (ns) (Entered: 07/11/2017)
2017-07-134ORDER denying 2 application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filing fee to be submitted by 8/10/2017 ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc) (Entered: 07/13/2017)
2017-07-27FILING FEE PAID re 1 by plaintiff Linda Bhalla in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-3902321 (Alvarez, Robert) (Entered: 07/27/2017)
2017-07-28SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendants John F. Kelly, Andrew McCabe, James McCament ; none provided (ns) (Entered: 07/28/2017)
2017-08-155PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re 1 (Alvarez, Robert) (Entered: 08/15/2017)
2017-08-156SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants John F. Kelly, Andrew McCabe, James McCament (cep) (Entered: 08/15/2017)
2017-08-17(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Victoria Lynn Smalley on behalf of plaintiff Linda Bhalla (Smalley, Victoria) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
2017-09-187NOTICE OF IMPENDING DISMISSAL; Plaintiff to complete service of process within 90 days after the filing of the complaint ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc) (Entered: 09/18/2017)
2017-10-048FIRST MOTION for extension of time to serve Complaint by plaintiff Linda Bhalla; (Alvarez, Robert) (Entered: 10/04/2017)
2017-10-049BRIEF in support of FIRST MOTION for extension of time to serve Complaint 8 filed by Linda Bhalla (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6) (Alvarez, Robert) (Entered: 10/04/2017)
2017-10-11(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Nicole Mazzocco (AUSA) on behalf of defendants John F. Kelly, Andrew McCabe, James McCament (Mazzocco (AUSA), Nicole) (Entered: 10/11/2017)
2017-10-1110PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER to Stay Proceedings by plaintiff Linda Bhalla (Alvarez, Robert) (Entered: 10/11/2017)
2017-10-1211ORDER granting STIPULATION to Stay Proceedings 10 ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb) (Entered: 10/12/2017)
2017-10-1212AMENDED ORDER granting stipulation to stay proceedings (to reflect "2018" on order); signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb) (Entered: 10/12/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff