Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleKibbe v. United States
DistrictEastern District of Michigan
CityDetroit
Case Number2:2017cv12288
Date Filed2017-07-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeDistrict Judge Victoria A. Roberts
PlaintiffDean R. Kibbe
Case DescriptionDean Kibbe sued the U.S. government alleging violations of law pertaining to the Covert Action Program, which Kibbe indicated was run by the U.S. Marines, and "Crack and Splatter," a covert program run by the CIA. Kibbe does not appear to make any FOIA claim. This is not a FOIA case.
Complaint issues: FOIA not mentioned

DefendantUnited States
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-07-111COMPLAINT filed by Dean R. Kibbe against United States; Receipt No: 105467 - Fee: $ 400. (DPer) (Entered: 07/14/2017)
2017-07-112SUMMONS Issued for *United States* (General Robert B. Nellor, U.S. Marine Corps) (DPer) (Entered: 07/14/2017)
2017-07-113SUMMONS Issued for *United States* (Attachments: # 1 Document Continuation) (DPer)(issued for U.S. Attorney General and U.S. Attorney) Modified on 7/14/2017 (DPer). (Entered: 07/14/2017)
2017-07-194CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dean R. Kibbe. (Ahmed, N) (Entered: 07/20/2017)
2017-08-015Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (KCas) (Entered: 08/01/2017)
2017-08-166Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by United States. (Toomey, Zak) (Entered: 08/16/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff