Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePalm v. Mueller et al
DistrictMiddle District of Florida
CityFt. Myers
Case Number2:2017cv00395
Date Filed2017-07-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge John E. Steele
PlaintiffCharlotte Bea Palm
Case DescriptionCharlotte Palm filed suit against former FBI Director Robert Mueller and a number of other former and present government officials for various alleged constitutional violations. However, she does not make a FOIA claim. This is not a FOIA case.
Complaint issues: FOIA not mentioned

DefendantRobert Swan Mueller, III Former Director of FBI
DefendantBarack Hussein Obama Former President of the United States
DefendantJohn Owen Brennan Former Director of CIA
DefendantPorter Johnston Goss Former Director of CIA
DefendantERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR. Former U.S. Attorney General
DefendantJohn E. Steele US District Court, Middle District of Florida
DefendantAnita Kelly Andrews HSU, Associate of Porter Goss
DefendantPatricia E. Andrews Trustee of Amethyst Trust
DefendantMark B. Andrews, Jr. Associate of Porter Goss
DefendantMark F. Hearne, II Trustee of Pillar Foundation
DefendantAmethyst Trust
DefendantPillar Foundation
DefendantChristopher A. Wray Nominee for Director of FBI
DefendantJames Brien Comey Former Director of FBI
DefendantGeorge W. Bush, Jr. Former President of the United States
DefendantGeorge John Tenet Former Director of CIA
DefendantJohn Mark Deutch Former Director of CIA
DefendantJim Ronsinski Agent, FBI
DefendantAdam Wilkinson US Marshal
DefendantMike J. Scott Sheriff of Lee County, Florida
DefendantKurt Graf Captain, Cape Coral Police Department
DefendantDana Costa Cape Coral Police Department
DefendantStephen Burkhart Cape Coral Police Department
DefendantJohn Szerlag City Manager of Cape Coral, Florida
DefendantDavid Newlan Chief of Police, Cape Coral Police Department
DefendantLisa Barnes Deputy Chief, Cape Coral Police Department
DefendantCape Coral Police Department
DefendantLee County Sheriff's Office
DefendantLee Health System
DefendantSaluscare, Inc.
DefendantJanice L. Stepnoski Social Worker
DefendantThe United States of America
DefendantThe Federal Bureau of Investigation
DefendantThe Central Intelligence Agency
DefendantThe United States Armed Services
DefendantThe Supreme Court of the United States of America
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-07-131COMPLAINT against Amethyst Trust, Anita Kelly Andrews, Mark B. Andrews, Jr, Patricia E. Andrews, Lisa Barnes, John Owen Brennan, Stephen Burkhart, George W. Bush, Jr, Cape Coral Police Department, James Brien Comey, Dana Costa, John Mark Deutch, Porter Johnston Goss, Kurt Graf, ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR, Mark F. Hearne, II, Lee County Sheriff's Office, Lee Health System, Robert Swan Mueller, III, David Newlan, Barack Hussein Obama, Pillar Foundation, Jim Ronsinski, Saluscare, Inc., Mike J. Scott, John E. Steele, Janice L. Stepnoski, John Szerlag, George John Tenet, The Central Intelligence Agency, The Federal Bureau of Investigation, The Supreme Court of the United States of America, The United States Armed Services, The United States of America, Adam Wilkinson, Christopher A. Wray with Jury Demand filed by Charlotte Bea Palm. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(RMT) (Entered: 07/14/2017)
2017-07-132MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency by Charlotte Bea Palm. (RMT) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando. (Entered: 07/14/2017)
2017-07-133APPLICATION to Proceed in District Court without prepaying fees or costs (Short Form) by Charlotte Bea Palm. (RMT) (Entered: 07/14/2017)
2017-07-144STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 7/14/2017. (MLS) (Entered: 07/14/2017)
2017-07-195RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 8/2/2017. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 7/19/2017. (jmc) (Entered: 07/19/2017)
2017-07-196INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 8/2/2017. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 7/19/2017. (jmc) (Entered: 07/19/2017)
2017-08-087ORDER denying 2 Plaintiff's Affidavit of Indigency, construed a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff may pay the filing fee and file an amended complaint in accordance with this Order on or before August 29, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando on 8/8/2017. (HJ) (Entered: 08/08/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff