Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleColeman v. CCI et al
DistrictNorthern District of Texas
CityDallas
Case Number3:2017cv01866
Date Filed2017-07-14
Date Closed2017-08-16
JudgeSenior Judge Sam R Cummings
PlaintiffAlvester Coleman
Case DescriptionAlvester Coleman filed suit against a number of companies for failing to disclose royalty payments stemming from a trust. This is not a FOIA case.
Complaint issues: FOIA not mentioned

DefendantCCI
DefendantMinton & Brown PLLC
DefendantRobert M Minton
DefendantDavid P Brown
DefendantLee A Gearheart CPA
DefendantPenny Gearheart CPA
DefendantCharles Stevenson Landman
DefendantAdrian Butler Landman
DefendantTerry Nicholas Lineman
DefendantDavid Grantham Attorney at Law
DefendantRodger Cunningham
DefendantRusk County Appraisal District
DefendantTerry W Decker Chief Appraiser, RPA, RTA
DefendantCitzens National Bank
DefendantDistrict #6 of Texas Railroad Commision
DefendantSouthwestern Electric Power Company
DefendantUnion Pacific
DefendantBP Ameria Production Company
DefendantANADARKO
DefendantTXU Generation CO LP
DefendantVerado Energy Inc
DefendantXTO Energy
DefendantExxon Mobile
DefendantDiamond S Energy Company
DefendantHigh Mark Energy
DefendantEnergen Resources
DefendantNFR Energy
DefendantGoodrich Petroleom
DefendantEastman Gas Company
DefendantSand Ridge Energy Inc
DefendantGolf Sooth Pipline Company LP
DefendantCenter Point Energy Gas Trans Co
DefendantARCO Oil and Gas Company
DefendantCastle Texas Production LP
DefendantLand Services LLC Triad
DefendantBarrow Energy Corp
DefendantTorch Energy Services Inc
DefendantLargo Oil Company
DefendantEnbride Pipelines EX LP
DefendantSamson
DefendantDouphrate & Associates Inc
DefendantState & Local Tax Department
DefendantRusk County County Clerck Office
DefendantVendera Resources TX LA LLC
DefendantRusk Couny ELECTRIC Coop Inc
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Opinion/Order [13]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-07-141New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. SCREEN case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Horan (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter/electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the national and circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (rekc) (Entered: 07/14/2017)
2017-07-142Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (rekc) (Entered: 07/14/2017)
2017-07-143COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Alvester Coleman. (CD on file in records department.) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit on CD) (rekc) (Entered: 07/14/2017)
2017-07-14***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1, 2. Fri Jul 14 16:22:41 CDT 2017 (crt) (Entered: 07/14/2017)
2017-07-144MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Alvester Coleman. (rekc) (Entered: 07/14/2017)
2017-07-145CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Alvester Coleman. (rekc) (Entered: 07/14/2017)
2017-07-176ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to 3 Complaint by Plaintiff Alvester Coleman. (rekc) (Entered: 07/17/2017)
2017-07-177Notice of Manual Filing of Rusk Permit Area Draft Environmental Impact Statement by Alvester Coleman. Exhibit filed in support of 3 Complaint. (Book on file in records department.) (rekc) (Entered: 07/17/2017)
2017-07-178ORDER granting 4 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Service of process shall not issue, if at all, until the Court completes its screening of this action pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 7/17/2017) (axm) (Entered: 07/17/2017)
2017-07-17***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:8. Mon Jul 17 15:18:07 CDT 2017 (crt) (Entered: 07/17/2017)
2017-07-189FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: The Court should dismiss this action with prejudice as to the claim under the Freedom of Information Act and without prejudice, for lack of jurisdiction, as to any state law claim asserted. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 7/18/2017) (ran) (Entered: 07/18/2017)
2017-07-18***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:9. Tue Jul 18 15:58:53 CDT 2017 (crt) (Entered: 07/18/2017)
2017-07-2010ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to 3 Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Alvester Coleman. (ran) (Entered: 07/20/2017)
2017-08-0711ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to 3 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Alvester Coleman. (aaa) (Entered: 08/08/2017)
2017-08-0912Court Request for Recusal: Judge Sidney A Fitzwater recused. Pursuant to instruction in Special Order 3-249, the Clerk has reassigned the case to Senior Judge Sam R Cummings for all further proceedings. Future filings should indicate the case number as: 3:17-cv-1866-C. (axm) (Entered: 08/09/2017)
2017-08-09***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:12. Wed Aug 9 08:34:50 CDT 2017 (crt) (Entered: 08/09/2017)
2017-08-1613Order Adopting 9 Findings and Recommendations The Court has reviewed the Findings, Conclusions, and Recommendation for clear error and finds none. It is therefore ORDERED that the Findings, Conclusions, and Recommendation are hereby ADOPTED as the findings and conclusions of the Court. Plaintiff's FOIA claim is DISMISSED with prejudice, and the remainder of Plaintiff's claims are DISMISSED without prejudice for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 8/16/2017) (ndt) (Entered: 08/16/2017)
2017-08-1614JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the above-styled and -numbered civil action is DISMISSED with prejudice as to Plaintiff's FOIA claim and DISMISSED without prejudice for lark of subject-matter jurisdiction as to all other claims. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 8/16/2017) (ndt) (Entered: 08/16/2017)
2017-08-16***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:13,14. Wed Aug 16 10:10:52 CDT 2017 (crt) (Entered: 08/16/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff