Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSustainable Modular Management Inc v. United States Department of the Navy, Navy Facilities Engineering Command
DistrictNorthern District of Texas
CityDallas
Case Number3:2017cv01890
Date Filed2017-07-17
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn
PlaintiffSustainable Modular Management Inc
Case DescriptionSustainable Modular Management, Inc. submitted a FOIA request to the Department of the Navy Facilities Engineering Command for records concerning communications between the agency and CT JV, TolTest, Inc. or Custom Mechanical Systems regarding damages claimed by the Navy under a contract. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Sustainable Modular Management filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of the Navy, Navy Facilities Engineering Command
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-07-171COMPLAINT against United States Department of the Navy, Navy Facilities Engineering Command filed by Sustainable Modular Management, Inc.. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-8539007) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 2017 12 06 FOIA Request, # 2 Cover Sheet) (Alfred, Michael) (Entered: 07/17/2017)
2017-07-172Request for Clerk to issue Summonses filed by Sustainable Modular Management, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Summons to Attorney General-DOJ, # 2 Summons to U.S. Attorney General) (Alfred, Michael) (Entered: 07/17/2017)
2017-07-173New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (axm) (Entered: 07/17/2017)
2017-07-174Summons issued as to United States Department of the Navy, Navy Facilities Engineering Command, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (axm) (Entered: 07/17/2017)
2017-07-205Request for Clerk to issue Summons to Naval Defense Services - DC filed by Sustainable Modular Management Inc. (Alfred, Michael) (Entered: 07/20/2017)
2017-07-206Summons Reissued as to United States Department of the Navy, Navy Facilities Engineering Command. (svc) (Entered: 07/20/2017)
2017-07-257CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sustainable Modular Management Inc. (Alfred, Michael) (Entered: 07/25/2017)
2017-07-258CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sustainable Modular Management Inc. (Alfred, Michael) (Entered: 07/25/2017)
2017-08-189ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,, filed by United States Department of the Navy, Navy Facilities Engineering Command. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Ann Cruce-Haag-DOJ added to party United States Department of the Navy, Navy Facilities Engineering Command(pty:dft) (Cruce-Haag-DOJ, Ann) (Entered: 08/18/2017)
2017-08-1810CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by United States Department of the Navy, Navy Facilities Engineering Command. (Cruce-Haag-DOJ, Ann) (Entered: 08/18/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff