Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWright v. U.S. Department of Justice et al
DistrictSouthern District of California
CitySan Diego
Case Number3:2017cv01451
Date Filed2017-07-18
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Larry Alan Burns
PlaintiffRoderic Mack Wright
Case DescriptionRoderic Wright submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Justice and the IRS for records concerning the government's prosecution of him on tax-related matters. The FBI uncovered more than 3,500 pages. The IRS found 110 responsive pages, but disclosed only five pages. After appealing various denials, Wright finally filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Department of Justice
DefendantU.S. Department of the Treasury
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Opinion/Order [5]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-07-181COMPLAINT against U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Department of the Treasury ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-10258411.), filed by Roderic Mack Wright. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Case Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3) The new case number is 3:17-cv-01451-LAB-MDD. Judge Larry Alan Burns and Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin are assigned to the case. (Hasso-Najm, Jennifer J)(anh). (jao). (Entered: 07/18/2017)
2017-07-182Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (anh) (jao). (Entered: 07/18/2017)
2017-12-153ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Order to Show Cause Brief due by 12/20/2017. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 12/15/2017.(acc) (Entered: 12/15/2017)
2017-12-184MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend for Service of Complaint by Roderic Mack Wright. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Hasso-Najm, Jennifer). QC Mail - Reminder to use "s/" signature (jdt). (Entered: 12/18/2017)
2017-12-215ORDER granting 4 Additional Time to Serve Complaint. The Court exercises its discretion to allow Wright to serve his complaint by 12/29/2017. If he doesn't, this action will be dismissed. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 12/20/2017. (jdt) (Entered: 12/21/2017)
2017-12-286SUMMONS Returned Executed by Roderic Mack Wright. All Defendants served. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service, # 2 Proof of Service, # 3 Proof of Service, # 4 Proof of Service, # 5 Proof of Service, # 6 Proof of Service)(Hasso-Najm, Jennifer) (jdt). (Entered: 12/28/2017)
2018-01-167Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Department of the Treasury. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Church, Rebecca)Attorney Rebecca Grace Church added to party U.S. Department of Justice(pty:dft), Attorney Rebecca Grace Church added to party U.S. Department of the Treasury(pty:dft) (jdt). Modified on 1/17/2018 to change event type (jdt). (Entered: 01/16/2018)
2018-01-178ORDER granting 7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer U.S. Department of Justice answer due 2/9/2018; U.S. Department of the Treasury answer due 2/9/2018. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 1/17/2018. (jdt) (Entered: 01/17/2018)
2018-02-099ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by U.S. Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Church, Rebecca) (jdt). (Entered: 02/09/2018)
2018-02-0910ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by U.S. Department of the Treasury.(McMonagle, Ryan)Attorney Ryan O. McMonagle added to party U.S. Department of the Treasury(pty:dft) (jdt). (Entered: 02/09/2018)
2018-03-1211NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference. An Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference will be held on 4/9/2018 at 9:30 AM in the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 3/12/2018.(jdt) (Entered: 03/13/2018)
2018-03-2612ORDER: On the Court's own motion, the parties and/or party representatives are excused from appearing at the Early Neutral Evaluation/Case Management Conference currently scheduled for April 9, 2018. 11 . Only counsel are required to personally appear. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 03/26/2018.(no document attached) (atk) (Entered: 03/26/2018)
2018-04-0213Ex Parte MOTION Department of Treasury to Appear by Phone at ENE by U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Department of the Treasury. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Church, Rebecca) (jdt). (Entered: 04/02/2018)
2018-04-0314ORDER granting 13 Department of the Treasury's Motion for Telephonic Appearance at the Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. The Court finds good cause to allow counsel for the Department of the Treasury to participate telephonically at the ENE Conference. Counsel for the Department of the Treasury must send an email with a phone number where counsel can be reached to efile_dembin@casd.uscourts.gov not later than April 6, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 04/03/2018. (no document attached) (atk) (Entered: 04/03/2018)
2018-04-0515Ex Parte MOTION to Continue Early Neutral Evaluation (ENE) and Case Management Conference by Plaintiff Roderic Mack Wright. (Hasso-Najm, Jennifer). QC mail - wrong event selected. Modified on 4/6/2018 to change to motion and correct docket type (jdt). (Entered: 04/05/2018)
2018-04-0816ORDER granting in part and denying in part 15 Ex Parte Motion to Continue Early Neutral Evaluation/Case Management Conference: The Court declines to continue the ENE/CMC beyond April 9, 2018, rather, the ENE/CMC will be converted to a TELEPHONIC ATTORNEYS ONLY conference and will be moved from the Court's morning calendar to the afternoon calendar at 2:45PM. Counsel are ordered to use the dial-in information filed as a separate notice to access the Court's teleconference service. (The teleconference information sheet can be accessed through ECF using the login information assigned to an attorney of record in the case and then selecting the report option. On the next screen, the docket sheet option should be selected, prompting the user for a PACER login (assigned to the attorney of record). Once the PACER login is completed, the case number can be entered which will display the docket sheet for the case and allow the user to open the teleconference information sheet.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 04/08/2018. (no document attached) (atk) (Entered: 04/08/2018)
2018-04-0817NOTICE of Teleconference Information Sheet. Teleconference set for 04/09/2018 at 2:45PM. (atk) (Entered: 04/08/2018)
2018-04-0918Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin: A telephonic Early Neutral Evaluation/Case Management Conference was held on 4/9/2018. Order to follow.(Plaintiff Attorney: Jennifer Hasso-Najm). (Defendant Attorneys: Rebecca Church, Dept of Justice; Ryan McMonagle, Dept of Treasury). (no document attached) (atk) (Entered: 04/09/2018)
2018-04-1119ORDER: The ENE/CMC was held April 9, 2018. Accordingly, the deadline to file summary judgment motions is August 31, 2018. No discovery is authorized at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 04/11/2018.(no document attached) (atk) (Entered: 04/11/2018)
2018-08-3120MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Complaint for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief by U.S. Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Declaration Kornmeier, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Declaration Hardy, # 9 Exhibit A, # 10 Exhibit B, # 11 Exhibit C, # 12 Exhibit D, # 13 Exhibit E, # 14 Exhibit F, # 15 Exhibit G, # 16 Exhibit H, # 17 Exhibit I, # 18 Exhibit J, # 19 Exhibit K, # 20 Exhibit L, # 21 Proof of Service)(Church, Rebecca) (jdt). (Entered: 08/31/2018)
2018-08-3121MOTION for Summary Judgment of the Department of Justice, Tax Division by U.S. Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Declaration of Carmen M. Banerjee, # 3 Declaration of Christopher P. Valvardi, # 4 Exhibit A to Declaration of Christopher P. Valvardi, # 5 Exhibit B o Declaration of Christopher P. Valvardi)(McMonagle, Ryan)Attorney Ryan O. McMonagle added to party U.S. Department of Justice(pty:dft) (jdt). (Entered: 08/31/2018)
2018-08-3122MOTION for Summary Judgment by U.S. Department of the Treasury. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Declaration of Ryan Law, # 3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Ryan Law)(McMonagle, Ryan) (jdt). (Entered: 08/31/2018)
2018-10-1923Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply summary judgment motion by Roderic Mack Wright. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Hasso-Najm, Jennifer) Modified on 10/22/2018 - QC Mail: Missing proof of service. Instructed to file proof of service separately. Reminder to registered user to use "s/" (jdt). (Entered: 10/19/2018)
2018-10-1924ORDER granting 23 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment of the Department of Justice, Tax Division , 22 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 20 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Complaint for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief Responses due by 12/3/2018 Replies due by 12/10/2018. Hearings on Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment set for 12/17/2018 11:30 AM in Courtroom 14A before Judge Larry Alan Burns.. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 10-19-2018. (ceh) (Entered: 10/19/2018)
2018-10-2225CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Roderic Mack Wright re 23 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply summary judgment motion (Hasso-Najm, Jennifer) (jdt). (Entered: 10/22/2018)
2018-12-0326Ex Parte MOTION to Continue DEADLINES TO OPPOSE & REPLY TO A SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION by Roderic Mack Wright. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit)(Hasso-Najm, Jennifer) (jdt). (Entered: 12/03/2018)
2018-12-0327ORDER Granting Extension (Dkt. 26 ). Plaintiff's opposition is due 12/5/2018. Defendants' replies are due 12/12/2018. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 12/3/2018. (jdt) (Entered: 12/03/2018)
2018-12-0528RESPONSE in Opposition re 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment of the Department of Justice, Tax Division , 22 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 20 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Complaint for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief OPPOSITIONS TO SJMS filed by Roderic Mack Wright. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities Opposition SJM Dept. of Justice Tax Division, # 2 Memo of Points and Authorities Opposition SJM Dept. of Treasury, # 3 Declaration Seth E. Wright, # 4 Declaration Roderic M. Wright, # 5 Notice of Lodgment, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit, # 17 Exhibit, # 18 Exhibit)(Hasso-Najm, Jennifer) (jdt). (Entered: 12/05/2018)
2018-12-1229REPLY to Response to Motion re 20 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Complaint for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief filed by U.S. Department of Justice. (Church, Rebecca) (Entered: 12/12/2018)
2018-12-1230REPLY to Response to Motion re 22 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by U.S. Department of the Treasury. (McMonagle, Ryan) (Entered: 12/12/2018)
2018-12-1231REPLY to Response to Motion re 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment of the Department of Justice, Tax Division filed by U.S. Department of Justice. (McMonagle, Ryan) (Entered: 12/12/2018)
2018-12-1232MINUTE ORDER. Currently on calendar for 12/17/2018 at 11:30 a.m. is a hearing on Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment (Dkt. Nos. 20 , 21 , 22 ). The Court finds these motions suitable for decision without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearing on these motions is taken off calendar and this matter is taken under submission. No appearances will be required in this matter on 12/17/2018. Signed by the Chambers of Judge Larry Alan Burns on 12/12/2018.(jdt) (Entered: 12/12/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar