Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC. v. OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01445
Date Filed2017-07-20
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffPROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC.
Case DescriptionThe Protect Democracy Project submitted two FOIA requests to OMB for records concerning the Congressional Budget Office. The agency acknowledged receipt of both requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the Protect Democracy Project filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantOFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-07-201COMPLAINT against OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET. (Fee Status: Paid, Receipt #: 0090-5039264, $400.00) filed by PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - February Request, # 2 Exhibit 2 - April Request, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons)(Barnett, Kevin) Modified on 7/20/2017 to add in payment information.(ztnr) (Entered: 07/20/2017)
2017-07-202Corporate Disclosure Statement by PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC.. (Barnett, Kevin) (Entered: 07/20/2017)
2017-07-20Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (md) (Entered: 07/20/2017)
2017-07-203SUMMONS Issued Electronically as to OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (md) (Entered: 07/20/2017)
2017-07-20SUMMONS Not Issued as to non party U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General. (FOIA SUMMONS WERE NOT SUBMITTED AT THE TIME COMPLAINT WAS FILED) (md) (Entered: 07/20/2017)
2017-07-204REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re 1 Complaint, filed by PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC.. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC..(Barnett, Kevin) (Entered: 07/20/2017)
2017-07-205REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re 1 Complaint, filed by PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC.. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC..(Barnett, Kevin) (Entered: 07/20/2017)
2017-07-216SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (znmw) (Entered: 07/21/2017)
2017-07-257STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on July 25, 2017. (lcbah2) (Entered: 07/25/2017)
2017-08-018RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/31/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/30/2017. (Barnett, Kevin) (Main Document 8 replaced on 8/2/2017) (znmw). (Entered: 08/01/2017)
2017-08-02NOTICE OF ERROR re 8 Summons Returned Executed in FOIA as to U.S. Attorney; emailed to kbarnett@cov.com, cc'd 0 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Please refile document, 2. No proof of delivery by certified mail provided; File Errata with delivery confirmation attached; Also refile as a Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General, and as to Federal Defendant. (znmw, ) (Entered: 08/02/2017)
2017-08-039RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/31/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/30/2017. (Barnett, Kevin) (Main Document 9 replaced on 8/4/2017) (znmw). (Entered: 08/03/2017)
2017-08-0310RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 7/31/2017. (Barnett, Kevin) (Main Document 10 replaced on 8/4/2017) (znmw). (Entered: 08/03/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff