Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleENERGY AND ENVIRONMENT LEGAL INSTITUTE v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01452
Date Filed2017-07-21
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ketanji Brown Jackson
PlaintiffENERGY AND ENVIRONMENT LEGAL INSTITUTE
Case DescriptionThe Energy and Environmental Legal Institute submitted two FOIA requests to the National Institute of Health Sciences for specifically-identified records, primarily pertaining to contract proposals. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, EELI filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-07-211COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5041849) filed by ENERGY AND ENVIRONMENT LEGAL INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons to Civil Process Clerk of US Attorney, # 3 Summons To Dept of Health and Human Services, # 4 Summons to Attorney General, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Mandelbaum, Chaim) (Entered: 07/21/2017)
2017-07-21Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (sth) (Entered: 07/21/2017)
2017-07-212SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(sth) (Entered: 07/21/2017)
2017-07-243GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Courts instructions for briefing motions and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 7/24/2017. (lckbj1) (Entered: 07/24/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff