Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNATIONAL WHISTLEBLOWER CENTER v. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01464
Date Filed2017-07-24
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffNATIONAL WHISTLEBLOWER CENTER
Case DescriptionThe National Whistleblower Center submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service for records concerning the Lacey Act Reward Fund. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and later listed the request as completed. However, after the Center contacted the FOIA office it found its request had not been completed. The Center filed an administrative appeal, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the Center filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Expedited processing, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
DefendantU.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-07-241COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5044186) filed by NATIONAL WHISTLEBLOWER CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons)(Colapinto, David) (Entered: 07/24/2017)
2017-07-24Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (jd) (Entered: 07/25/2017)
2017-07-252SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jd) (Entered: 07/25/2017)
2017-08-113NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca Anne Guiterman on behalf of NATIONAL WHISTLEBLOWER CENTER (Guiterman, Rebecca) (Entered: 08/11/2017)
2017-09-064NOTICE of Appearance by Melanie Dyani Hendry on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
2017-09-065ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE.(Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
2017-09-06MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of Local Civil Rule 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure appear to be inapplicable. Defendants shall file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of its production of documents to plaintiff, on or before October 6, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/6/2017. (lcabj3) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
2017-09-076NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen M. Kohn on behalf of NATIONAL WHISTLEBLOWER CENTER (Kohn, Stephen) (Entered: 09/07/2017)
2017-10-037STATUS REPORT and Proposed Schedule by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE. (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 10/03/2017)
2017-10-03MINUTE ORDER. The parties are ORDERED to file a joint status report by December 6, 2017, which should include a proposed schedule for further proceedings if necessary. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/03/2017. (lcabj3) (Entered: 10/03/2017)
2017-10-04Set/Reset Deadlines: The parties joint status report, which should include a proposed schedule for further proceedings if necessary, is due by 12/6/2017. (jth) (Entered: 10/04/2017)
2017-10-308NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to NATIONAL WHISTLEBLOWER CENTER. Attorney Rebecca Anne Guiterman terminated. (Guiterman, Rebecca) (Entered: 10/30/2017)
2017-12-069Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL WHISTLEBLOWER CENTER. (Colapinto, David) (Entered: 12/06/2017)
2017-12-07MINUTE ORDER. Based upon a review of the matters set forth in the status report, it is the Court's view that Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 56 provides the appropriate means for the resolution of any issues concerning the adequacy of the search and any claim by the plaintiff that there is a need for discovery. Therefore, defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment by February 1, 2018; plaintiff shall file its opposition (and its cross motion, if any, supported by a single memorandum of points and authorities) by March 1, 2018; defendant's reply (combined with its opposition to any cross motion) will be due on April 2, 2018; and plaintiff's cross-reply, if needed, will be due on April 16. The Court will address the question of whether the complaint may be amended if and when a motion for leave to amend that comports with Local Civil Rule 15.1 has been filed. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/07/2017. (lcabj3) (Entered: 12/07/2017)
2018-01-3110Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Summary Judgment Motion by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 01/31/2018)
2018-02-01MINUTE ORDER granting 10 Motion for Extension. Defendants' motion for summary judgment will be due February 15, 2018. Plaintiff's opposition (and cross motion, if any, shall be supported by the same memorandum of points and opinions) will be due March 15, 2018. Defendants' reply (combined with its cross opposition, if necessary) will be due by April 16, 2018. Plaintiff's cross reply, if any, will be due by April 30, 2018. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 02/01/2018. (lcabj3) (Entered: 02/01/2018)
2018-02-1511MOTION for Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Declaration of Carrie Hyde-Michaels)(Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 02/15/2018)
2018-03-1512Memorandum in opposition to re 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by NATIONAL WHISTLEBLOWER CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Exhibit Exhibits 1-9, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Colapinto, David) (Entered: 03/15/2018)
2018-03-1513MOTION for Discovery and Memorandum of Points and Authorities by NATIONAL WHISTLEBLOWER CENTER (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Colapinto, David) (Entered: 03/15/2018)
2018-04-0914Consent MOTION to Amend Briefing Schedule as to 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 13 MOTION for Discovery and Memorandum of Points and Authorities by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hendry, Melanie) Modified event title on 4/11/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 04/09/2018)
2018-04-13MINUTE ORDER granting 14 Motion to Amend Briefing Schedule. Defendants' opposition to plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment and reply to plaintiff's opposition to defendants' motion for summary judgment is due May 1, 2018. Plaintiff's reply to defendants' opposition to plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment is due May 15, 2018. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 04/13/2018. (lcabj3) (Entered: 04/13/2018)
2018-04-3015Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct Briefing Schedule by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE (Hendry, Melanie) Modified event title on 5/2/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 04/30/2018)
2018-05-01MINUTE ORDER granting 15 Consent Motion to Amend Briefing Schedule. Defendants' opposition to plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment and reply to plaintiff's opposition to defendants' motion for summary judgment is due May 23, 2018. Plaintiff's reply to defendants' opposition to plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment is due June 15, 2018. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 05/01/2018. (lcabj3) (Entered: 05/01/2018)
2018-05-2216MOTION to Stay Briefing Due to Supplemental Search by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 05/22/2018)
2018-05-23MINUTE ORDER. Defendants have until May 25, 2018 to comply with Local Rule 7(m) which requires parties to meet and confer before filing nondispositive motions. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 05/23/2018. (lcabj3) (Entered: 05/23/2018)
2018-05-2517Consent MOTION to Stay Briefing Due to Supplemental Search by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 05/25/2018)
2018-05-25MINUTE ORDER. The Court hereby grants the parties' 17 consent motion to stay the briefing schedule. The parties must file a joint status report by July 23, 2018 which should include a proposed schedule for further proceedings, if necessary. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 05/25/2018. (lcabj3) (Entered: 05/25/2018)
2018-05-25MINUTE ORDER finding as moot 16 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 05/25/2018. (lcabj3) (Entered: 05/25/2018)
2018-07-1718Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE. (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 07/17/2018)
2018-07-18MINUTE ORDER. The parties must submit an updated status report by August 23, 2018. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 07/18/2018. (lcabj3) (Entered: 07/18/2018)
2018-08-2219Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE. (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 08/22/2018)
2018-08-23MINUTE ORDER. The parties must submit an updated joint status report by September 24, 2018. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 08/23/2018. (lcabj3) (Entered: 08/23/2018)
2018-09-1920Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE. (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 09/19/2018)
2018-09-20MINUTE ORDER. The parties must file another joint status report by October 31, 2018. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 09/20/2018. (lcabj3) (Entered: 09/20/2018)
2018-09-28MINUTE ORDER. The case is hereby stayed pending the parties' ongoing settlement discussions. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 09/28/2018. (lcabj3) (Entered: 09/28/2018)
2018-10-2921Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE. (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 10/29/2018)
2018-10-29MINUTE ORDER. The parties must file an updated joint status report by November 30, 2018. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/29/2018. (lcabj3) (Entered: 10/29/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar