Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. FEDERAL COMMUNICATIONS COMMISSION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01492
Date Filed2017-07-26
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted two FOIA requests to the Federal Communications Commission for records concerning net neutrality. One request asked for records of meetings FCC staff held pertaining to net neutrality. The second FOIA request asked for records of communications between the office of Chairman Ajit Pai and members of Congress. American Oversight requested expedited processing for both requests, which the agency granted. The agency asked for a one-month extension, which American Oversight granted. However, after the agency asked for a second extension, American Oversight refused. It then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Expedited processing, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFEDERAL COMMUNICATIONS COMMISSION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-07-261COMPLAINT against FEDERAL COMMUNICATIONS COMMISSION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5047580) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons)(France, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/26/2017)
2017-07-262LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (France, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/26/2017)
2017-07-26Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (jd) (Entered: 07/27/2017)
2017-07-273SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL COMMUNICATIONS COMMISSION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Forms)(jd) (Entered: 07/27/2017)
2017-08-094RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/1/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/31/2017.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL COMMUNICATIONS COMMISSION served on 8/1/2017, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 8/1/17. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(France, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/09/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff