Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01502
Date Filed2017-07-26
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffPUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY
Case DescriptionPubic Employees for Environmental Responsibility submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Land Management for all Cooperative Law Enforcement Agreements currently in effect between BLM and local law enforcement agencies. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, PEER filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
DefendantBUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
1845 C Street, NW
Washington, DC 20240
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-07-261COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5048931) filed by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Corporate Disclosure, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons Bureau of Land Management, # 4 Summons US Attorney General, # 5 Summons US Attorney's Office DC)(Dinerstein, Paula) (Entered: 07/26/2017)
2017-07-262LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (md) (Entered: 07/28/2017)
2017-07-26Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (md) (Entered: 07/28/2017)
2017-07-283SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (md) (Entered: 07/28/2017)
2017-07-314STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 07/31/17. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibit 1) (mac) (Entered: 07/31/2017)
2017-08-095RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/7/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/6/2017. (Dinerstein, Paula) (Entered: 08/09/2017)
2017-08-10NOTICE OF ERROR re 5 Summons Returned Executed in FOIA as to U.S. Attorney; emailed to pdinerstein@peer.org, cc'd 1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Please refile document, 2. Also file as a Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney General, and as a Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant. (znmw, ) (Entered: 08/10/2017)
2017-08-146NOTICE of Appearance by Wyneva Johnson on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT (Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 08/14/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff