Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLEOPOLD et al v. OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01524
Date Filed2017-07-28
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffJASON LEOPOLD
PlaintiffBUZZFEED, INC.
Case DescriptionReporter Jason Leopold and Buzzfeed submitted three FOIA requests to the Department of Treasury for draft and final copies of Attorney General guidelines for the Office of Intelligence and Analysis and guidelines for the Office of Terrorism and Financial Intelligence. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but had not responded to any request when Leopold and Buzzfeed filed suit. Leopold and Buzzfeed submitted a request to the Office of the Director of National Intelligence for records concerning Intelligence Community Inspector General investigations of FinCen. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and indicated it had started a search. Leopold and Buzzfeed also submitted a request to the Office of Special Counsel for records concerning whistleblower retaliation at Treasury's Financial Crimes Enforcement Network. OCS responded that it found no records, and affirmed that decision on appeal. Leopold and Buzzfeed filed suit against all three agencies.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
DefendantOFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE
Washington, DC 20511
DefendantUS Department of the Treasury
DefendantOFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE
DefendantOFFICE OF SPECIAL COUNSEL
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-07-281COMPLAINT against OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, OFFICE OF SPECIAL COUNSEL, US Department of the Treasury ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5051724), CIVIL COVER SHEET by JASON LEOPOLD, BUZZFEED, INC. filed by JASON LEOPOLD, BUZZFEED, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet, # 7 Summons, # 8 Summons, # 9 Summons)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 07/28/2017)
2017-07-282REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE for the Attorney General of the United States filed by BUZZFEED, INC., JASON LEOPOLD.(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 07/28/2017)
2017-07-283REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE for the United States Attorney's Office filed by BUZZFEED, INC., JASON LEOPOLD.(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 07/28/2017)
2017-07-314REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE for the Office of Special Counsel filed by BUZZFEED, INC., JASON LEOPOLD.(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 07/31/2017)
2017-07-315REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE for the Office of the Director of National Intelligence filed by BUZZFEED, INC., JASON LEOPOLD.(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 07/31/2017)
2017-07-316REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE for the U.S. Department of the Treasury filed by BUZZFEED, INC., JASON LEOPOLD.(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 07/31/2017)
2017-07-317REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE for the United States Attorney's Office filed by BUZZFEED, INC., JASON LEOPOLD.(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 07/31/2017)
2017-07-318REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE for the Attorney General of the United States filed by BUZZFEED, INC., JASON LEOPOLD.(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 07/31/2017)
2017-07-31Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zsb) (Entered: 07/31/2017)
2017-07-319SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to OFFICE OF SPECIAL COUNSEL, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Form)(zsb) (Entered: 07/31/2017)
2017-08-0410NOTICE of Appearance by Damon William Taaffe on behalf of All Defendants (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 08/04/2017)
2017-08-1511RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 8/04/2017. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 08/15/2017)
2017-08-1512RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/3/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/2/2017. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 08/15/2017)
2017-08-1713RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE served on 8/8/2017 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
2017-08-1714RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY served on 8/3/2017 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
2017-08-1715RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 8/4/2017. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
2017-08-1716RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. OFFICE OF SPECIAL COUNSEL served on 8/4/2017 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
2017-08-1717RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/3/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/2/2017. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
2017-08-2418MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Nabiha Syed, :Firm- Buzzfeed, Inc., :Address- 111 East 18th Street, 13th Floor, New York, NY 10003. Phone No. - 6566009617. Fax No. - 2124317461 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5088971. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by BUZZFEED, INC., JASON LEOPOLD (Attachments: # 1 Declaration In Support Of Motion To Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 08/24/2017)
2017-08-2519ERRATA (Signed version of declaration) by BUZZFEED, INC., JASON LEOPOLD 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Nabiha Syed, :Firm- Buzzfeed, Inc., :Address- 111 East 18th Street, 13th Floor, New York, NY 10003. Phone No. - 6566009617. Fax No. - 2124317461 Filing fee $ 100, receipt nu filed by BUZZFEED, INC., JASON LEOPOLD. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 08/25/2017)
2017-08-28MINUTE ORDER granting 18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Nabiha Syed is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter on behalf of Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 08/28/2017. (lcapm3) (Entered: 08/28/2017)
2017-09-0520Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,, Cover Sheet, by OFFICE OF SPECIAL COUNSEL, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 09/05/2017)
2017-09-05MINUTE ORDER granting 20 Defendants' Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. Defendants shall file their Response on or before October 5, 2017. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 09/05/2017. (lcapm3) (Entered: 09/05/2017)
2017-10-0521ANSWER to Complaint by OFFICE OF SPECIAL COUNSEL, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY.(Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 10/05/2017)
2017-10-0622ORDER: Both a Complaint and an Answer are now before the court in this FOIA case. It is hereby ordered that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before October 20, 2017. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 10/06/2017. (lcapm3) (Entered: 10/06/2017)
2017-10-06Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 10/20/2017. (zcdw) (Entered: 10/07/2017)
2017-10-2023Joint STATUS REPORT by OFFICE OF SPECIAL COUNSEL, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 10/20/2017)
2017-10-23MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report no later than November 20, 2017, which (1) details Defendants' search and production efforts, and (2) addresses whether further litigation will be required to resolve this matter and, if so, proposes a briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 10/23/2017. (lcapm3) (Entered: 10/23/2017)
2017-10-23Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 11/20/2017. (cdw) (Entered: 10/23/2017)
2017-11-2024Joint STATUS REPORT by OFFICE OF SPECIAL COUNSEL, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 11/20/2017)
2017-11-21MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 24 Joint Status Report, the parties shall file on or before December 18, 2017, a subsequent Joint Status Report that advises the court of their progress and addresses whether further litigation will be required to resolve this matter and, if so, proposes a briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/21/2017. (lcapm3) (Entered: 11/21/2017)
2017-11-21Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 12/18/2017. (zcdw) (Entered: 11/22/2017)
2017-12-1825Joint STATUS REPORT by OFFICE OF SPECIAL COUNSEL, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 12/18/2017)
2017-12-18MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 25 Joint Status Report, the parties shall file a subsequent Joint Status Report no later than February 16, 2018. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 12/18/2017. (lcapm3) (Entered: 12/18/2017)
2017-12-18Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 2/16/2018. (zcdw) (Entered: 12/19/2017)
2018-02-1626Joint STATUS REPORT by OFFICE OF SPECIAL COUNSEL, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 02/16/2018)
2018-02-16MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report no later than April 17, 2018, that advises the court of their progress and addresses whether further litigation will be required to resolve this matter and, if so, proposes a briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 02/16/2018.(lcapm3) (Entered: 02/16/2018)
2018-02-16Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 4/17/2018. (zcdw) (Entered: 02/20/2018)
2018-04-0327ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Appearance by Sherri L. Morgan on behalf of OFFICE OF SPECIAL COUNSEL, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY (Morgan, Sherri) Modified on 4/4/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 04/03/2018)
2018-04-1728Joint STATUS REPORT by OFFICE OF SPECIAL COUNSEL, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Morgan, Sherri) (Entered: 04/17/2018)
2018-04-1729MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties 28 Joint Status Report, the parties shall file a subsequent status report no later than June 18, 2018, that advises the court of their progress and, if necessary, proposes a briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 04/17/2018. (lcapm3) (Entered: 04/17/2018)
2018-04-17Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 6/18/2018. (zcdw) (Entered: 04/18/2018)
2018-06-1830Joint STATUS REPORT by OFFICE OF SPECIAL COUNSEL, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Morgan, Sherri) (Entered: 06/18/2018)
2018-06-20MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 30 Joint Status Report, the parties shall file a subsequent Joint Status Report describing their progress in resolving this case, or, if necessary, proposing a briefing schedule, on or before August 20, 2018. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 06/20/2018. (lcapm3) (Entered: 06/20/2018)
2018-06-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/20/2018. (zjd) (Entered: 06/20/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar