Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLEOPOLD et al v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01525
Date Filed2017-07-28
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffJASON LEOPOLD
PlaintiffBUZZFEED, INC.
Case DescriptionReporter Jason Leopold and Buzzfeed submitted FOIA requests the FBI, EOUSA, and the Criminal Division at the Justice Department for records concerning investigations into the death of Mikhail Lesin, an advisor to Vladamir Putin. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further concerning the status of their request, Leopold and Buzzfeed filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
DefendantU.S. DOJ CRIMINAL DIVISION
DefendantU.S. DOJ EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR U.S. ATTORNEYS
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-07-281COMPLAINT against ALL DEFENDANTS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5051867), filed by JASON LEOPOLD, BUZZFEED, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons, # 8 Summons, # 9 Summons)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 07/28/2017)
2017-07-282REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE for the Attorney General of the United States filed by JASON LEOPOLD, BUZZFEED, INC..(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 07/28/2017)
2017-07-283REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE for the United States Attorney's Office filed by JASON LEOPOLD, BUZZFEED, INC..(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 07/28/2017)
2017-07-314REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE for the U.S. Department of Justice filed by JASON LEOPOLD, BUZZFEED, INC..(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 07/31/2017)
2017-07-315REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE for the Federal Bureau of Investigation filed by JASON LEOPOLD, BUZZFEED, INC..(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 07/31/2017)
2017-07-316REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE for the U.S. DOJ Criminal Division filed by JASON LEOPOLD, BUZZFEED, INC..(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 07/31/2017)
2017-07-317REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE for the U.S. DOJ Executive Office for U.S. Attorneys filed by JASON LEOPOLD, BUZZFEED, INC..(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 07/31/2017)
2017-07-318REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE for the Attorney General of the United States filed by JASON LEOPOLD, BUZZFEED, INC..(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 07/31/2017)
2017-07-319REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE for the United States Attorney's Office filed by JASON LEOPOLD, BUZZFEED, INC..(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 07/31/2017)
2017-07-31Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (md) (Entered: 08/02/2017)
2017-08-0210SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DOJ CRIMINAL DIVISION, U.S. DOJ EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR U.S. ATTORNEYS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (md) (Entered: 08/02/2017)
2017-08-1711RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION served on 8/9/2017 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
2017-08-1712RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 8/7/2017 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
2017-08-1713RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DOJ CRIMINAL DIVISION served on 8/7/2017 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
2017-08-1714RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DOJ EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR U.S. ATTORNEYS served on 8/7/2017 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
2017-08-1715RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/7/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/6/2017. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
2017-08-1716RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 8/7/2017. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
2017-08-18NOTICE OF ERROR re 11 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant; emailed to matt@loevy.com, cc'd 2 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Please refile document, 2. Document scanned incorrectly; Please rescan and refile as an attachment to an Errata. (znmw, ) (Entered: 08/18/2017)
2017-08-2117RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION served on 8/9/2017. (Topic, Matthew) Modified to add party served on 8/22/2017 (znmw). (Entered: 08/21/2017)
2017-08-2318NOTICE of Appearance by William Mark Nebeker on behalf of FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DOJ CRIMINAL DIVISION, U.S. DOJ EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR U.S. ATTORNEYS (Nebeker, William) (Entered: 08/23/2017)
2017-08-2319AMENDED COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DOJ CRIMINAL DIVISION, U.S. DOJ EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR U.S. ATTORNEYS, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE filed by JASON LEOPOLD, BUZZFEED, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 08/23/2017)
2017-08-2320REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE for the U.S. Department of State filed by JASON LEOPOLD, BUZZFEED, INC..(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 08/23/2017)
2017-08-2421SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (znmw) (Entered: 08/24/2017)
2017-08-2422MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Nabiha Syed, :Firm- Buzzfeed, Inc., :Address- 111 East 18th Street, 13th Floor, New York, NY 10003. Phone No. - 6566009617. Fax No. - 2124317461 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5088976. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by BUZZFEED, INC., JASON LEOPOLD (Attachments: # 1 Declaration In Support Of Motion To Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 08/24/2017)
2017-08-2523ERRATA (Signed version of declaration) by BUZZFEED, INC., JASON LEOPOLD 22 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Nabiha Syed, :Firm- Buzzfeed, Inc., :Address- 111 East 18th Street, 13th Floor, New York, NY 10003. Phone No. - 6566009617. Fax No. - 2124317461 Filing fee $ 100, receipt nu filed by BUZZFEED, INC., JASON LEOPOLD. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 08/25/2017)
2017-08-25MINUTE ORDER granting the 22 Motion for Leave of Nabiha Syed to Appear Pro Hac Vice only upon the condition that the lawyer admitted, or at least one member of the lawyer's firm, undergo CM/ECF training, obtain a CM/ECF username and password, and agree to file papers electronically. No court papers will be mailed to any lawyer. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/25/2017. (lcabj3) (Entered: 08/25/2017)
2017-09-0624Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 19 Amended Complaint, by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DOJ CRIMINAL DIVISION, U.S. DOJ EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR U.S. ATTORNEYS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nebeker, William) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
2017-09-07MINUTE ORDER granting 24 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Court will set a specific date by which all defendants must file a responsive pleading once notice has been filed that service is complete. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/7/2017. (lcabj2) (Entered: 09/07/2017)
2017-09-1425REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE (Alias Summons) filed by JASON LEOPOLD, BUZZFEED, INC..(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 09/14/2017)
2017-09-1526SUMMONS (1) Reissued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (znmw) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
2017-09-2927RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 9/26/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 09/29/2017)
2017-10-02MINUTE ORDER. All defendants must file a responsive pleading by October 26, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/2/2017. (lcabj2) (Entered: 10/02/2017)
2017-10-2628ANSWER to 19 Amended Complaint, by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. DOJ CRIMINAL DIVISION, U.S. DOJ EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR U.S. ATTORNEYS. Related document: 19 Amended Complaint, filed by BUZZFEED, INC., JASON LEOPOLD.(Nebeker, William) (Entered: 10/26/2017)
2017-10-2629ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of Local Civil Rule 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure appear to be inapplicable. Defendants shall file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of its production of documents to plaintiffs on or before November 27, 2017. See Order for details. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/26/2017. (lcabj2) (Main Document 29 replaced on 10/27/2017) (ztb). (Entered: 10/26/2017)
2017-11-2730Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. DOJ CRIMINAL DIVISION, U.S. DOJ EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR U.S. ATTORNEYS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nebeker, William) (Entered: 11/27/2017)
2017-11-28MINUTE ORDER granting 30 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of its production of documents to plaintiffs on or before December 5, 2017. SO ORDERED.Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/28/2017. (lcabj2) (Entered: 11/28/2017)
2017-12-05Case directly reassigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. Judge Amy Berman Jackson is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) (Entered: 12/05/2017)
2017-12-0531STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. DOJ CRIMINAL DIVISION, U.S. DOJ EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR U.S. ATTORNEYS. (Nebeker, William) (Entered: 12/05/2017)
2018-03-0532STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. DOJ CRIMINAL DIVISION, U.S. DOJ EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR U.S. ATTORNEYS. (Nebeker, William) (Entered: 03/05/2018)
2018-04-03MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the 32 Status Report, it hereby is ORDERED that Defendants shall continue to make proposed monthly rolling productions on the 26th of each month, with production from the Criminal Division starting again on April 26, 2018. In addition, the parties shall confer and submit a joint status report on or before May 25, 2018. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on April 3, 2018. (JK) (Entered: 04/03/2018)
2018-05-2533Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. DOJ CRIMINAL DIVISION, U.S. DOJ EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR U.S. ATTORNEYS. (Nebeker, William) (Entered: 05/25/2018)
2018-05-25MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 33 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the defendants' rolling releases shall continue, where necessary, to be made on the 26th of each month and the parties shall submit a joint status report on or before July 9, 2018. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on May 25, 2018. (JK) (Entered: 05/25/2018)
2018-07-0934Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. DOJ CRIMINAL DIVISION, U.S. DOJ EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR U.S. ATTORNEYS. (Nebeker, William) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
2018-07-10MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 34 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the defendants' rolling releases shall continue, where necessary, to be made on or about the 26th of each month and the parties shall submit a joint status report on or before September 10, 2018. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on July 10, 2018. (JK) (Entered: 07/10/2018)
2018-08-2735Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Conduct Processing of Next Set of Documents by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DOJ CRIMINAL DIVISION, U.S. DOJ EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR U.S. ATTORNEYS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nebeker, William) (Entered: 08/27/2018)
2018-08-28MINUTE ORDER granting the Department of Justice's 35 Consent Motion for an Enlargement of Time. Accordingly, the Department of Justice's next production shall be made on or before September 28, 2018. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on August 28, 2018. (JK) (Entered: 08/28/2018)
2018-09-1036Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. DOJ CRIMINAL DIVISION, U.S. DOJ EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR U.S. ATTORNEYS. (Nebeker, William) (Entered: 09/10/2018)
2018-09-10MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 36 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the defendants' rolling releases shall continue, where necessary, to be made on or about the 26th of each month and the parties shall submit a joint status report on or before November 9, 2018. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on September 10, 2018. (JK) (Entered: 09/10/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar