Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGizmodo Media Group, LLC v. Federal Bureau Of Investigation
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2017cv05814
Date Filed2017-08-01
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Edgardo Ramos
PlaintiffGizmodo Media Group, LLC
Case DescriptionDell Cameron, a reporter for Gizmodo Media Group, submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning Roger Ailes, former president of Fox News. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Gizmodo Media Group filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFederal Bureau Of Investigation
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-08-011COMPLAINT against Federal Bureau Of Investigation. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-13966001)Document filed by Gizmodo Media Group, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Novack, Daniel) (Entered: 08/01/2017)
2017-08-012CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Novack, Daniel) (Entered: 08/01/2017)
2017-08-013REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Federal Bureau of Investigation, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Gizmodo Media Group, LLC. (Novack, Daniel) (Entered: 08/01/2017)
2017-08-014RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Univision Interactive Media, Inc., Corporate Parent Univision Communications Inc., Other Affiliate La Fabrica LLC, Other Affiliate Story House Entertainment LLC, Other Affiliate Flama Media LLC, Other Affiliate Univision Digital Music LLC, Other Affiliate Uni-Labs LLC, Other Affiliate Univision Fantasy Sports LLC, Other Affiliate D2C LLC, Other Affiliate Uni-Leek LLC for Gizmodo Media Group, LLC. Document filed by Gizmodo Media Group, LLC.(Novack, Daniel) (Entered: 08/01/2017)
2017-08-02CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php . (pc) (Entered: 08/02/2017)
2017-08-02Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php . (pc) (Entered: 08/02/2017)
2017-08-02Case Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 08/02/2017)
2017-08-025ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Federal Bureau Of Investigation. (pc) (Entered: 08/02/2017)
2017-08-096AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (FOIA CASE) of Summons and Complaint served. Federal Bureau Of Investigation served on 8/8/2017, answer due 9/7/2017. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Gizmodo Media Group, LLC. (Novack, Daniel) (Entered: 08/09/2017)
2017-08-257NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lauren Almquist Lively on behalf of Federal Bureau Of Investigation. (Lively, Lauren) (Entered: 08/25/2017)
2017-08-258LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Lauren Almquist Lively dated August 25, 2017 re: Correction of Docket. Document filed by Federal Bureau Of Investigation.(Lively, Lauren) (Entered: 08/25/2017)
2017-08-289MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 8 Letter filed by Federal Bureau Of Investigation. ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to correct the FBI's answer deadline to September 18, 2017. The application is granted. (Federal Bureau Of Investigation answer due 9/18/2017.) (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 8/28/2017) (jwh) (Entered: 08/28/2017)
2017-09-1810ANSWER to 1 Complaint. Document filed by Federal Bureau Of Investigation.(Lively, Lauren) (Entered: 09/18/2017)
2017-12-1311LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Gizmodo Media Group LLC dated 12/13/2017 re: Joint Request for Scheduling Conference. Document filed by Gizmodo Media Group, LLC.(Novack, Daniel) (Entered: 12/13/2017)
2017-12-1512NOTICE OF INITIAL COURT CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 1/19/2018 at 11:45 AM in Courtroom 619, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Edgardo Ramos, as further set forth in this notice.(jwh) (Entered: 12/15/2017)
2018-01-19Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edgardo Ramos: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 1/19/2018. Plaintiff's counsel present. Defendant's counsel present. (Court Reporter Carol Ganley) (jar) (Entered: 01/19/2018)
2018-01-2913ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Daniel Novack dated 1/18/18 re: The parties are engaging in good faith discussions regarding the exclusion of the 34 withheld pages and the adequacy of the DOJ's search efforts. The parties will likely need the Court's determination of one or both factors. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 1/29/2018) (mro) (Entered: 01/30/2018)
2018-03-1914MOTION for Summary Judgment . Document filed by Federal Bureau Of Investigation.(Lively, Lauren) (Entered: 03/19/2018)
2018-03-1915MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 14 MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Federal Bureau Of Investigation. (Lively, Lauren) (Entered: 03/19/2018)
2018-03-1916DECLARATION of Lauren Almquist Lively in Support re: 14 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Federal Bureau Of Investigation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lively, Lauren) (Entered: 03/19/2018)
2018-03-1917DECLARATION of David M. Hardy in Support re: 14 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Federal Bureau Of Investigation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Lively, Lauren) (Entered: 03/19/2018)
2018-04-1918MOTION for Summary Judgment . Document filed by Gizmodo Media Group, LLC. Responses due by 5/3/2018(Novack, Daniel) (Entered: 04/19/2018)
2018-04-1919MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Gizmodo Media Group, LLC. (Novack, Daniel) (Entered: 04/19/2018)
2018-05-0220REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 14 MOTION for Summary Judgment . and in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment . Document filed by Federal Bureau Of Investigation. (Lively, Lauren) (Entered: 05/02/2018)
2018-05-1621REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Gizmodo Media Group, LLC. (Novack, Daniel) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
2018-09-0722LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Lauren Almquist Lively dated September 7, 2018 re: Recent Development. Document filed by Federal Bureau Of Investigation.(Lively, Lauren) (Entered: 09/07/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar