Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAsian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2017cv04388
Date Filed2017-08-02
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte
PlaintiffAsian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus
Case DescriptionAsian Americans Advancing Justice and the Asian Law Caucus submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning the agency's immigration bond system. The agency disclosed records with redactions under Exemption 6 (invasion of privacy) and Exemption 7(C) (invasion of privacy concerning law enforcement records). The organizations filed an administrative appeal, which was denied. Asian Americans Advancing Justice and the Asian Law Caucus then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Homeland Security
DefendantUnited States Immigration & Customs Enforcement
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
Complaint attachment 17
Complaint attachment 18
Complaint attachment 19
Complaint attachment 20
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-08-021COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief Under The Freedom of Information Act (FOIA), 5 U.S.C. Section 552 against All Defendants, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-11598335). Filed by Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stark, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/2/2017) (Entered: 08/02/2017)
2017-08-032Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/17/2017. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2017) (Entered: 08/03/2017)
2017-08-033Proposed Summons. (Stark, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/3/2017) (Entered: 08/03/2017)
2017-08-034Proposed Summons. (Stark, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/3/2017) (Entered: 08/03/2017)
2017-08-035Certification of Interested Entities or Persons filed by Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus re 1 Complaint (Stark, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/3/2017) (Entered: 08/03/2017)
2017-08-036Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/30/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/6/2017 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #(1) Standing Order for Mag. Judge Sallie Kim, #(2) Standing Order for All Judges) (tnS) (Filed on 8/3/2017) (Entered: 08/03/2017)
2017-08-037Summons Issued as to Defendant United States Department of Homeland Security. (tnS) (Filed on 8/3/2017) (Entered: 08/03/2017)
2017-08-038Summons Issued as to Defendant United States Immigration & Customs Enforcement. (tnS) (Filed on 8/3/2017) (Entered: 08/03/2017)
2017-08-039ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 8/3/2017. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2017) (Entered: 08/03/2017)
2017-08-0310ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by the Executive Committee on 8/3/17. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2017) (Entered: 08/03/2017)
2017-08-1411CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus re 2 Case Assigned by Intake,,, 5 Certificate of Interested Entities, 9 Order of Recusal, 10 Order Reassigning Case,, Case Assigned/Reassigned, 8 Summons Issued, 1 Complaint,, 7 Summons Issued (Stark, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/14/2017) (Entered: 08/14/2017)
2017-08-1412CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus.. (Stark, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/14/2017) (Entered: 08/14/2017)
2017-08-1513CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus re 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, (Stark, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/15/2017) (Entered: 08/15/2017)
2017-08-1714CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus re 10 Order Reassigning Case, Case Assigned/Reassigned, Standing Order, 12 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge (Stark, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/17/2017) Modified on 8/18/2017 (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/17/2017)
2017-08-2415CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United States Immigration & Customs Enforcement.. (Davis, Julie) (Filed on 8/24/2017) (Entered: 08/24/2017)
2017-08-25Electronic filing error. Counsel is reminded to put the Case Number on all filings. Re: 15 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge filed by United States Immigration & Customs Enforcement. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/25/2017)
2017-08-2516CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus re 2 Case Assigned by Intake,,, 11 Certificate of Service, 5 Certificate of Interested Entities, 9 Order of Recusal, 10 Order Reassigning Case,, Case Assigned/Reassigned, 8 Summons Issued, 1 Complaint,, 7 Summons Issued (Stark, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/25/2017) (Entered: 08/25/2017)
2017-08-28Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. The correct event is found under Civil Filings > Initial Pleadings and Service > Service of Process > Summons Returned Executed. [err101]Please re-file in its entirety. Re: 16 Certificate of Service, filed by Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/28/2017)
2017-08-2817SUMMONS Returned Executed by Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus. United States Immigration & Customs Enforcement served on 8/21/2017, answer due 10/20/2017. (Stark, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/28/2017) Modified on 8/29/2017 (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/28/2017)
2017-09-0518Defendant's ANSWER to 1 Complaint byUnited States Immigration & Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Davis, Julie) (Filed on 9/5/2017) Modified on 9/6/2017 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/05/2017)
2017-09-1319CLERK'S NOTICE: The parties are hereby notified that a Case Management Conference is set for 11/7/2017 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. And a Case Management Statement is due by 10/31/2017. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2017) (Entered: 09/13/2017)
2017-10-1620NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Stark, Jennifer) (Filed on 10/16/2017) (Entered: 10/16/2017)
2017-10-1621ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Stark, Jennifer) (Filed on 10/16/2017) (Entered: 10/16/2017)
2017-10-1622ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Davis, Julie) (Filed on 10/16/2017) (Entered: 10/16/2017)
2017-10-1623ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on October 31, 2017 at 11:00 AM Pacific time. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2017) (Entered: 10/16/2017)
2017-10-1624ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Davis, Julie) (Filed on 10/16/2017) (Entered: 10/16/2017)
2017-10-1925STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 19 Clerk's Notice, filed by Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus. (Stark, Jennifer) (Filed on 10/19/2017) (Entered: 10/19/2017)
2017-10-2026Order by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting 25 Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 2/13/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/20/2018 10:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco.(tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2017) (Entered: 10/20/2017)
2017-10-3127ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held on 10/31/2017 by Howard Herman. A further ADR Phone Conference is scheduled for February 14, 2018, at 10:00 AM Pacific time. The call-in information remains the same. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2017) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 10/31/2017)
2018-02-0828STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus. (Stark, Jennifer) (Filed on 2/8/2018) (Entered: 02/08/2018)
2018-02-0829ORDER granting Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting 28 Stipulation. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2018) (Entered: 02/08/2018)
2018-02-1330ADR Remark: The further ADR Phone Conference scheduled on 2/14/2018 at 10:00 AM Pacific time is rescheduled to 4/10/2018 at 10:30 AM. The call-in information remains the same. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2018) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 02/13/2018)
2018-04-0531STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus. (Stark, Jennifer) (Filed on 4/5/2018) (Entered: 04/05/2018)
2018-04-1032ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held on 4/10/2018 by Howard Herman. A further ADR Phone Conference is scheduled for 7/12/2018 at 10:30 AM. The call-in information remains the same. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2018) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 04/10/2018)
2018-04-1033JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT [PROPOSED] ORDER; filed by Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus. (Stark, Jennifer) (Filed on 4/10/2018) Modified on 4/11/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/10/2018)
2018-04-1034ORDER granting Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting 31 Stipulation. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2018) (Entered: 04/10/2018)
2018-06-1535CLERK'S NOTICE: The parties are hereby notified that the Case Management Conference is rescheduled to 7/16/2018 at 2:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2018) (Entered: 06/15/2018)
2018-07-0936CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus. (Stark, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/9/2018) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
2018-07-1637ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held on 7/12/2018 by Howard Herman. A further ADR Phone Conference is scheduled for 9/17/2018, at 11:30 AM Pacific time. The call-in information remains the same. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2018) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 07/16/2018)
2018-07-1638Minute Entry for case management conference held on 7/16/2018 before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Counsel inform the Court that the parties are close to reaching a settlement. A Further Case Management Conference set for 9/11/2018 03:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. An updated case management statement is due by 9/4/2018. FTR Time: 2:32 - 2:34. Plaintiff Attorney: Jennifer Stark. Defendant Attorney: Julie Davis. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/16/2018) (Entered: 07/18/2018)
2018-07-3139ADR Remark: The further ADR Phone Conference scheduled on 9/17/2018, at 11:30 AM Pacific time, is advanced to 9/4/2018 at 11:30 AM Pacific time. The call-in information remains the same. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2018) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 07/31/2018)
2018-09-0440ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held on 9/4/2018 by Howard Herman. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2018) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 09/04/2018)
2018-09-0441JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus. (Stark, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/4/2018) (Entered: 09/04/2018)
2018-09-0642CLERK'S NOTICE: The parties are hereby notified that the Further Case Management Conference is rescheduled to 10/9/2018 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. An updated Case Management Statement is due by 10/2/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2018) (Entered: 09/06/2018)
2018-09-1743First MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER to Appear by Telephone; filed by Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus. (Stark, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/17/2018) Modified on 9/18/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/17/2018)
2018-09-1844ORDER granting Motion to Appear at Case Management Conference by Telephone signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting as modified 43 Motion. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2018) (Entered: 09/18/2018)
2018-10-0245CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT JOINT filed by United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration & Customs Enforcement. (Davis, Julie) (Filed on 10/2/2018) (Entered: 10/02/2018)
2018-10-0946Minute Entry for further case management conference held on 10/9/2018 before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Counsel advise the Court that the parties have reached a settlement in principal on all of the substantive issues. Counsel intend to commence with fee negotiations. The parties to submit a written update on or before 11/8/2018. FTR Time: 10:13 - 10:15 Plaintiff Attorney: Jennifer Stark (telephonic appearance) Defendant Attorney: Julie Davis (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/9/2018) (Entered: 10/11/2018)
2018-11-0847NOTICE by United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration & Customs Enforcement JOINT UPDATE (Davis, Julie) (Filed on 11/8/2018) (Entered: 11/08/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar