Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01586
Date Filed2017-08-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffPUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY
Case DescriptionPublic Employees for Environmental Responsibility submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Interior for records concerning the relocation of staff from the South Interior Building to the Main Interior Building. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, PEER filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-08-071COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5063857) filed by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Corporate Disclosure, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons Department of Interior, # 4 Summons Jefferson Beauregard Sessions III, # 5 Summons US AO)(Dinerstein, Paula) (Entered: 08/07/2017)
2017-08-082LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (md) (Entered: 08/08/2017)
2017-08-08Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (md) (Entered: 08/08/2017)
2017-08-083SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (md) (Entered: 08/08/2017)
2017-08-284NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua L. Rogers on behalf of All Defendants (Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 08/28/2017)
2017-08-315RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/15/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/14/2017. (Dinerstein, Paula) (Entered: 08/31/2017)
2017-09-146ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY.(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 09/14/2017)
2017-09-147ORDER: Both a Complaint and an Answer are now before the court in this FOIA case. It is hereby ordered that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before September 28, 2017. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 09/14/2017. (lcapm3) (Entered: 09/14/2017)
2017-09-14Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 9/28/2017. (zcdw) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff