Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY v. UNITED STATES FOREST SERVICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01587
Date Filed2017-08-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge John D. Bates
PlaintiffPUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY
Case DescriptionPublic Employees for Environmental Responsibility submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Forest Service concerning commercial stewardship timber sales in the Tongass National Forest. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, PEER filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES FOREST SERVICE of the United States Department of Agriculture
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-08-071COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES FOREST SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5063894) filed by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Corporate Disclosure, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons Jefferson Beauregard Sessions III, # 4 Summons US AO, # 5 Summons USFS)(Dinerstein, Paula) (Entered: 08/07/2017)
2017-08-082LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (md) (Entered: 08/08/2017)
2017-08-08Case Assigned to Judge John D. Bates. (md) (Entered: 08/08/2017)
2017-08-083SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES FOREST SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (md) (Entered: 08/08/2017)
2017-08-314RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/15/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/14/2017. (Dinerstein, Paula) (Entered: 08/31/2017)
2017-09-145ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES FOREST SERVICE.(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 09/14/2017)
2017-09-156ORDER. See text of Order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 09/15/17. (lcjdb1) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
2017-09-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 10/13/2017. (tb) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff