Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01589
Date Filed2017-08-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Veterans Affairs Greater Los Angeles Healthcare System for records concerning the authorization permitting the Brentwood School to use a route through the VAGLAHS campus for hauling debris in connection with a construction project at the school. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-08-071COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5064083) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons Dept. of Veterans Affairs)(Burke, Lauren) (Entered: 08/07/2017)
2017-08-072LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Burke, Lauren) (Entered: 08/07/2017)
2017-08-08Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zsb) (Entered: 08/08/2017)
2017-08-083SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Form)(zsb) (Entered: 08/08/2017)
2017-08-164RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/14/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/13/2017.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 8/14/2017., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS served on 8/14/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Burke, Lauren) (Entered: 08/16/2017)
2017-09-135Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Answer or Other Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/13/2017)
2017-09-14MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's 5 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall file its responsive pleading on or before September 27, 2017. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 09/14/2017. (lcapm1) (Entered: 09/14/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff