Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWHITE COAT WASTE PROJECT v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01592
Date Filed2017-08-08
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffWHITE COAT WASTE PROJECT
Case DescriptionThe White Coat Waste Project, an animal rights organization, submitted a FOIA request to the FDA for records concerning an approved funding application for a National Center for Toxicological Research project entitled "Aspects of Nicotine Self-Administration in a Nonhuman Primate." The agency disclosed 64 pages and withheld four pages under Exemption 4 (confidential business information). White Coat Waste Project filed an administrative appeal, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, White Coat Waste Project filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-08-081COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5065160) filed by WHITE COAT WASTE PROJECT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons to U.S. Attorney General, # 3 Summons to United States Attorney, # 4 Summons to U.S. Department of Health and Human Services)(Strugar, Matthew) (Entered: 08/08/2017)
2017-08-082LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by WHITE COAT WASTE PROJECT (Strugar, Matthew) Modified on 8/18/2017 (sth). (Entered: 08/08/2017)
2017-08-08Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (sth) (Entered: 08/08/2017)
2017-08-083STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 8/8/2017. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 08/08/2017)
2017-08-084NOTICE of Corrected Summonses by WHITE COAT WASTE PROJECT (Attachments: # 1 Summons (corrected) to Dept. of Health and Human Services, # 2 Summons (corrected) to U.S. Attorney General)(Strugar, Matthew) (Entered: 08/08/2017)
2017-08-095SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(sth) (Entered: 08/09/2017)
2017-08-306RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/14/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/13/2017. (Strugar, Matthew) (Entered: 08/30/2017)
2017-09-067NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Field on behalf of All Defendants (Field, Brian) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
2017-09-068Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Field, Brian) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
2017-09-06MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Consent Motion for Extension of Time 8 , the motion is hereby GRANTED. Defendant is hereby ORDERED to respond to Plaintiff's complaint on or before October 4, 2017. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 9/6/2017. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
2017-09-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Complaint due by 10/4/2017. (kt) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff