Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01595
Date Filed2017-08-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffCENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY
Case DescriptionThe Center for Biological Diversity submitted two FOIA requests to the Department of Interior. The first request was for communication records of Secretary Ryan Zinke. The second request was for Secretary Zinke's schedules. The Center for Biological Diversity submitted a third FOIA request for records concerning presidential monument designations since 1996. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the Center for Biological Diversity filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-08-091COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5066842) filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons (Proposed) for U.S. Dept. of Interior), # 3 Summons (Proposed) for U.S. Attorney, # 4 Summons (Proposed) for Attorney General)(Townsend, Margaret) (Entered: 08/09/2017)
2017-08-092Corporate Disclosure Statement by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Townsend, Margaret) (Entered: 08/09/2017)
2017-08-09Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (sth) (Entered: 08/09/2017)
2017-08-093SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(sth) (Entered: 08/09/2017)
2017-09-064AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Attachments: # 1 Redline Comparison to Complaint, # 2 Summons (Proposed) for U.S. Dep. of Interior, # 3 Summons (Proposed) for U.S. Attorney, # 4 Summons (Proposed) for Attorney General)(Townsend, Margaret) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
2017-09-085SUMMONS (3) Reissued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General. (znmw) (Entered: 09/08/2017)
2017-09-086NOTICE of Appearance by Amy R. Atwood on behalf of CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY (Atwood, Amy) (Entered: 09/08/2017)
2017-09-217RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/19/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/19/2017. (Atwood, Amy) Modified dates on 9/22/2017 (znmw). (Entered: 09/21/2017)
2017-09-218RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 09/21/2017. (Atwood, Amy) Modified date of service on 9/22/2017 (znmw). (Entered: 09/21/2017)
2017-09-219RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR served on 9/20/2017 (Atwood, Amy) Modified date of service on 9/22/2017 (znmw). (Entered: 09/21/2017)
2017-09-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 10/19/2017. (znmw) (Entered: 09/22/2017)
2017-10-1910ANSWER to 4 Amended Complaint, by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR. Related document: 4 Amended Complaint, filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY.(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 10/19/2017)
2017-10-20MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a proposed briefing schedule on or before November 3, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/20/2017. (lcrc3) (Entered: 10/20/2017)
2017-10-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 11/3/2017 (tj) (Entered: 10/23/2017)
2017-11-0311Joint STATUS REPORT and PROPOSED SCHEDULE by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Townsend, Margaret) (Entered: 11/03/2017)
2017-11-06MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 11 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall be permitted to complete the processing and production of responsive records and that the parties shall submit a joint status report every 60 days following this Order. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/6/2017. (lcrc3) (Entered: 11/06/2017)
2017-11-0712ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . .STATUS REPORT by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Townsend, Margaret) Modified on 11/8/2017 (td). (Entered: 11/07/2017)
2017-11-08NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 12 Status Report was entered in error PER COUNSEL and counsel refiled said pleading in the correct case. (td) (Entered: 11/08/2017)
2018-01-0513Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Townsend, Margaret) (Entered: 01/05/2018)
2018-01-08MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 13 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit a joint status report on March 6, 2018 and once every 60 days thereafter to report on the progress of the processing and production of records responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA requests. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 1/8/2018. (lcrc3) (Entered: 01/08/2018)
2018-03-0614Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Townsend, Margaret) (Entered: 03/06/2018)
2018-03-07MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 14 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit a joint status report on or before May 5, 2018, providing an update on the status of the matter and stating whether briefing will be necessary and, if so, proposing a schedule. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/7/2018. (lcrc3) (Entered: 03/07/2018)
2018-03-08Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 5/5/2018. (tj) (Entered: 03/08/2018)
2018-05-0415Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Townsend, Margaret) (Entered: 05/04/2018)
2018-05-04MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 15 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit a joint status report on July 3, 2018 providing an update on the status of the matter and stating whether briefing will be necessary and, if so, proposing a schedule. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on May 4, 2018. (lcrc3) (Entered: 05/04/2018)
2018-07-0316Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Townsend, Margaret) (Entered: 07/03/2018)
2018-07-05MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 16 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before September 3, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on July 5, 2018. (lcrc3) (Entered: 07/05/2018)
2018-07-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/3/2018 (hs) (Entered: 07/06/2018)
2018-09-0417Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Atwood, Amy) (Entered: 09/04/2018)
2018-09-05MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 17 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before October 4, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on September 5, 2018. (lcrc3) (Entered: 09/05/2018)
2018-09-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 10/4/2018 (tj) (Entered: 09/12/2018)
2018-10-0418Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Townsend, Margaret) (Entered: 10/04/2018)
2018-10-09MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 18 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before November 6, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on October 9, 2018. (lcrc3) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
2018-11-0619Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Townsend, Margaret) (Entered: 11/06/2018)
2018-11-06MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 19 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before December 7, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on November 6, 2018. (lcrc3) (Entered: 11/06/2018)
2018-12-0720Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Townsend, Margaret) (Entered: 12/07/2018)
2018-12-08MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 20 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before January 9, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on December 7, 2018. (lcrc3) (Entered: 12/08/2018)
2018-12-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 1/9/2019 (tj) (Entered: 12/10/2018)
2019-01-0421MOTION to Stay , MOTION for Extension of Time to in Light of Lapse of Appropriations by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hudak, Brian) (Entered: 01/04/2019)
2019-01-23MINUTE ORDER granting 21 Defendant's Motion to Stay. It is hereby ORDERED that this action is stayed until appropriations are restored to the Department of Justice and the Department of Interior. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the joint status report previously due on January 9, 2019 shall now be due within 7 days of Congress restoring appropriations. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on January 23, 2019. (lcrc3) (Entered: 01/23/2019)
2019-02-0122Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Townsend, Margaret) (Entered: 02/01/2019)
2019-02-01MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 22 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before February 8, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on February 1, 2019. (lcrc3) (Entered: 02/01/2019)
2019-02-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 2/8/2019 (tj) (Entered: 02/05/2019)
2019-02-0823Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Townsend, Margaret) (Entered: 02/08/2019)
2019-02-08MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 23 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before March 8, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on February 8, 2019. (lcrc3) (Entered: 02/08/2019)
2019-03-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 3/8/2019 (tj) (Entered: 03/01/2019)
2019-03-0524NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Christopher Charles Hair on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR Substituting for attorney Benton Peterson (Hair, Christopher) (Entered: 03/05/2019)
2019-03-0825Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Townsend, Margaret) (Entered: 03/08/2019)
2019-03-08MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 25 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a proposed case management order on or before March 22, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on March 8, 2019. (lcrc3) (Entered: 03/08/2019)
2019-03-2226Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Townsend, Margaret) (Entered: 03/22/2019)
2019-03-2227MOTION to Compel Production of Records Responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA Requests by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Townsend, Margaret) (Entered: 03/22/2019)
2019-03-22MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 26 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before May 1, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on March 22, 2019. (lcrc3) (Entered: 03/22/2019)
2019-04-0528Memorandum in opposition to re 27 MOTION to Compel Production of Records Responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA Requests filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Clarice Julka)(Hair, Christopher) (Entered: 04/05/2019)
2019-04-09Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 5/1/2019 (tj) (Entered: 04/09/2019)
2019-04-2629Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Townsend, Margaret) (Entered: 04/26/2019)
2019-04-26MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 29 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before June 30, 2019, and every 60 days thereafter. In the meantime, the Court is considering Plaintiff's motion to accelerate the production schedule. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on April 26, 2019. (lcrc3) (Entered: 04/26/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar