Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCOMPETITIVE ENTERPRISE INSTITUTE v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01600
Date Filed2017-08-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffCOMPETITIVE ENTERPRISE INSTITUTE
Case DescriptionThe Competitive Enterprise Institute submitted a FOIA request to the Department of the Treasury for a copy of a 2014 letter from the Bank of England and Financial Stability Board head Mark Carney to Treasury Secretary Jacob Lew asking why Berkshire Hathaway's reinsurance operation was not included on the Financial Stability Board's provisional list of systemically important financial institutions. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, CEI filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-08-091COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5067632) filed by COMPETITIVE ENTERPRISE INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons for the Treasury Department, # 3 Summons for the US Attorney, # 4 Summons for the Attorney General)(Bader, Hans) (Entered: 08/09/2017)
2017-08-10Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zsb) (Entered: 08/10/2017)
2017-08-102SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Form)(zsb) (Entered: 08/10/2017)
2017-09-063RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/15/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/14/2017.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY served on 9/6/2017, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 8/15/2017. (Bader, Hans) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
2017-09-074NOTICE of Appearance by Wyneva Johnson on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY (Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 09/07/2017)
2017-09-145Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 09/14/2017)
2017-09-14MINUTE ORDER granting 5 Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before October 5, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 9/14/2017. (lcrc3) (Entered: 09/14/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff