Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE v. WHITE HOUSE OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01601
Date Filed2017-08-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffCAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE
Case DescriptionCause of Action Institute submitted a FOIA request to OMB for records concerning the processing of two petitions for rulemaking previously submitted by Cause of Action Institute. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Cause of Action Institute filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantWHITE HOUSE OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-08-091COMPLAINT against WHITE HOUSE OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5067837) filed by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Summons OMB, # 5 Summons AG, # 6 Summons Clerk, # 7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Valvo, Russel) (Entered: 08/09/2017)
2017-08-092ENTERED IN ERROR.....Corporate Disclosure Statement by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE. (Valvo, Russel) Modified on 8/9/2017 (sth). (Entered: 08/09/2017)
2017-08-093Corporate Disclosure Statement by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE. (Valvo, Russel) (Entered: 08/09/2017)
2017-08-094NOTICE of Appearance by Lee A. Steven on behalf of CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE (Steven, Lee) (Entered: 08/09/2017)
2017-08-09Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (sth) (Entered: 08/09/2017)
2017-08-095SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to WHITE HOUSE OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(sth) (Entered: 08/09/2017)
2017-08-176RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/17/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/16/2017. (Valvo, Russel) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
2017-08-177RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 08/15/2017. (Valvo, Russel) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
2017-08-178RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. WHITE HOUSE OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET served on 8/15/2017 (Valvo, Russel) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
2017-09-189NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Todd Cohen on behalf of WHITE HOUSE OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 09/18/2017)
2017-09-1810MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by WHITE HOUSE OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 09/18/2017)
2017-09-18MINUTE ORDER granting 10 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint: It is hereby ORDERED that the time for Defendant to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint shall be extended up to and including October 18, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 09/18/2017. (lcrc1) (Entered: 09/18/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff