Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01607
Date Filed2017-08-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffPROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC.
Case DescriptionThe Protect Democracy Project submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Justice, the Department of Treasury, and OMB for records concerning raising the debt ceiling. The Protect Democracy Project also requested a fee waiver. All three agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests. DOJ and Treasury granted the organization's request for a fee waiver. Both agencies told the Protect Democracy Project that its requests were being put on the complex track. The Protect Democracy Project then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
DefendantOFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-08-101COMPLAINT against ALL DEFENDANTS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5070181) filed by PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhs. A-H, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons)(Florence, Justin) (Entered: 08/10/2017)
2017-08-10Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (md) (Entered: 08/11/2017)
2017-08-112NOTICE of Corrected Summonses by PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC. re 1 Complaint, (Attachments: # 1 Summons AG, # 2 Summons DOJ, # 3 Summons OMB, # 4 Summons Treasury)(Florence, Justin) (Entered: 08/11/2017)
2017-08-143STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 08/14/17. (Attachment: Exhibit 1) (mac) (Entered: 08/14/2017)
2017-08-154Corporate Disclosure Statement by PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC.. (Florence, Justin) (Entered: 08/15/2017)
2017-08-155SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(nmw) (Entered: 08/15/2017)
2017-09-086RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/28/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/27/2017. (Florence, Justin) (Entered: 09/08/2017)
2017-09-087RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 08/28/2017. (Florence, Justin) (Entered: 09/08/2017)
2017-09-088RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET served on 8/28/2017; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 8/28/2017; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY served on 8/28/2017 (Florence, Justin) (Entered: 09/08/2017)
2017-09-279NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn Celia Davis on behalf of OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY (Davis, Kathryn) (Entered: 09/27/2017)
2017-09-2710ANSWER to Complaint by OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY.(Davis, Kathryn) (Entered: 09/27/2017)
2017-10-06MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff brings this action pursuant to the Freedom of Information Act, 5 U.S.C. § 552. The parties are directed to meet and confer and propose a joint scheduling order for further proceedings in this case by no later than November 1, 2017. The parties' joint proposed scheduling order shall address the following: (1) The status of plaintiff's FOIA request; (2) The anticipated number of documents responsive to plaintiff's FOIA request; (3) The anticipated date(s) for release of documents responsive to plaintiff's FOIA request; (4) Whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case; (5) Whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case; (6) Whether this case would benefit from referral to a magistrate judge or the District Court Mediation Program for purposes of settlement; and (7) A proposed briefing schedule for dispositive motions, if applicable. If the parties are unable to agree on a joint recommendation, the proposed scheduling order shall include each party's individual recommendations. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on October 6, 2017. (lcegs2) (Entered: 10/06/2017)
2017-10-06Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Proposed Joint Scheduling Order due by 11/1/2017. (zcdw) (Entered: 10/07/2017)
2017-11-0111Joint STATUS REPORT by OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Davis, Kathryn) (Entered: 11/01/2017)
2017-11-2912Joint STATUS REPORT by OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Davis, Kathryn) (Entered: 11/29/2017)
2017-11-30MINUTE ORDER. In view of 7 the parties' joint status report, the parties are directed to file a further joint status report, including a recommendation for further proceedings by no later than January 29, 2018. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on November 30, 2017. (lcegs2) (Entered: 11/30/2017)
2017-12-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/29/2018. (mac) (Entered: 12/01/2017)
2018-01-2913Joint STATUS REPORT by OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Davis, Kathryn) (Entered: 01/29/2018)
2018-02-02MINUTE ORDER. In view of 13 the parties' joint status report, the parties are directed to file a further joint status report, including a recommendation for further proceedings by no later than March 29, 2018. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on February 2, 2018. (lcegs2) (Entered: 02/02/2018)
2018-02-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/29/2018. (mac) (Entered: 02/05/2018)
2018-03-2914Joint STATUS REPORT by OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Davis, Kathryn) (Entered: 03/29/2018)
2018-04-09MINUTE ORDER. In view of 14 the parties' joint status report, the parties are directed to file a further joint status report, including a recommendation for further proceedings by no later than June 29, 2018. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on April 9, 2018. (lcegs2) (Entered: 04/09/2018)
2018-04-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/29/2018. (mac) (Entered: 04/10/2018)
2018-06-2915Joint STATUS REPORT by OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Davis, Kathryn) (Entered: 06/29/2018)
2018-06-29MINUTE ORDER. In view of 15 the parties' joint status report, the parties are directed to submit a further status report with a recommendation for further proceedings, if any, by no later than December 31, 2018. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on June 29, 2018. (lcegs2) (Entered: 06/29/2018)
2018-07-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/31/2018. (mac) (Entered: 07/02/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar