Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01622
Date Filed2017-08-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted two FOIA requests to the Department of the Treasury. The first request asked for ecords concerning communications with the House Financial Services Committee on proposed legislation or administrative actions. The other request asked for records concerning Rep. Jeb Hensarling's comments that agency records provided to his committee should be considered congressional records, not agency records. American Oversight asked for expedited processing for the first request, which was granted by the agency. However, after hearing nothing further about either request, American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-08-111COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5070632) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons)(Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 08/11/2017)
2017-08-112LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 08/11/2017)
2017-08-11Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (sth) (Entered: 08/11/2017)
2017-08-113SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(sth) (Entered: 08/11/2017)
2017-08-154ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 08/15/17.(DM) (Entered: 08/15/2017)
2017-08-175RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/15/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/14/2017.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY served on 8/15/2017, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 08/15/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
2017-09-146NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn Celia Davis on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY (Davis, Kathryn) (Entered: 09/14/2017)
2017-09-147ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY.(Davis, Kathryn) (Entered: 09/14/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff