Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSierra Club v. Department of Energy
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2017cv04663
Date Filed2017-08-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeHon. Vince Chhabria
PlaintiffSierra Club
Case DescriptionThe Sierra Club submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Energy for records concerning a study of wholesale markets and reliability requested by Secretary of Energy Rick Perry. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told the Sierra Club that it would begin processing its request. After several email exchanges concerning the status of its request did not provide any further progress, the Sierra Club filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Energy
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-08-141COMPLAINT for declaratory and injunctive relief against United States Department of Energy ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-11627313.). Filed bySierra Club. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Roberts, Casey) (Filed on 8/14/2017) (Entered: 08/14/2017)
2017-08-142Proposed Summons. (Roberts, Casey) (Filed on 8/14/2017) (Entered: 08/14/2017)
2017-08-143Certificate of Interested Entities by Sierra Club (Roberts, Casey) (Filed on 8/14/2017) (Entered: 08/14/2017)
2017-08-144Case assigned to Hon. Vince Chhabria. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2017) (Entered: 08/14/2017)
2017-08-155Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras Case Management Statement due by 11/14/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/21/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2017) (Entered: 08/15/2017)
2017-08-156Summons Issued as to United States Department of Energy and U.S. Attorney General (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2017) Modified on 8/18/2017 (farS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/15/2017)
2017-08-187Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2017) (Entered: 08/18/2017)
2017-08-228NOTICE of Appearance by Casey Austin Roberts for Gregory E. Wannier (Roberts, Casey) (Filed on 8/22/2017) (Entered: 08/22/2017)
2017-08-229CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sierra Club (Roberts, Casey) (Filed on 8/22/2017) (Entered: 08/22/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff