Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01650
Date Filed2017-08-15
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Customs and Border Protection for records concerning emails containing West Bank country-of-origin marking requirements sent between the agency and ten organizations that had criticized Israel's policies. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-08-151COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5074534) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons DHS)(Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 08/15/2017)
2017-08-152LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 08/15/2017)
2017-08-15Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zsb) (Entered: 08/15/2017)
2017-08-153SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Form)(zsb) (Entered: 08/15/2017)
2017-08-284RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/21/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/20/2017.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 8/21/2017., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 8/21/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 08/28/2017)
2017-09-195NOTICE of Appearance by Melanie Dyani Hendry on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 09/19/2017)
2017-09-196ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY.(Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 09/19/2017)
2017-09-19MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of LCvR 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil procedure appear to be inapplicable. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and propose a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule shall address the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, whether and when either party anticipates filing a dispositive motion, and any other pertinent issues. The parties shall file a joint status report that addresses these issues and that contains a proposed schedule and proposed order not later than 10/13/17. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 9/19/17. (DJS) (Entered: 09/19/2017)
2017-09-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/13/2017. (tb) (Entered: 09/20/2017)
2017-09-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/13/2017. (tb) (Entered: 09/20/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff